Travaglini v. Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP
Plaintiff: Susan Travaglini
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, d/b/a Walmart #3061 and Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP doing business as Walmart #3061
Case Number: 4:2023cv01525
Filed: November 29, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 21 NOTICE: The Court has granted the motion for leave to file an amended document re #18 . Therefore, counsel should now file a clean copy of the amended document in CM/ECF. (HMA)
January 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Docket Text ORDER: Re #18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Susan Travaglini; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 1/26/2024. (HMA)
January 24, 2024 Filing 19 MOTION for Protective Order by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Protective Order)(Rahoy, John)
January 23, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Susan Travaglini. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 - First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 - Proposed Order)(Drazen, Andrew) (Attachment 1 replaced on 1/24/2024) (JEB).
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Alternative Dispute Resolution. This case is referred to: Mediation. Designation of Lead Counsel: Andrew T. Drazen. ADR Completion Deadline due by 8/15/2024. ADR Compliance Report Deadline due by 8/29/2024. Designation of Neutral/Conference Report due by 7/5/2024. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/15/2023. (HMA)
December 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (See Full Order). This case is assigned to Track: 2 Standard. Motion to Join Parties due by 5/30/2024. Discovery Completion due by 10/30/2024. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 11/10/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 12/2/2024. Pretrial Compliance due by 3/31/2025. Motion in Limine due by 3/31/2025. Jury Trial set for 4/14/2025 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10N - St. Louis before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/15/2023. (HMA)
December 13, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the scheduling conference pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 16, is vacated. The Case Management Order will be issued based on the dates provided by the parties in their Joint Proposed Scheduling Plan. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 12/13/2023. (HMA)
December 12, 2023 Filing 14 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Susan Travaglini. . (Drazen, Andrew)
December 2, 2023 Filing 13 NOTICE Contact Information for Rule 16 Conference: by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP (Rahoy, John)
December 1, 2023 Filing 12 NOTICE contact for Rule 16 Conference: by Plaintiff Susan Travaglini (Drazen, Andrew)
November 30, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE. This case is assigned to Track: 2 (Standard). Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/12/2023. Rule 16 Conference set for 12/19/2023 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10N - St. Louis before District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/30/2023. (HMA)
November 30, 2023 Filing 10 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Susan Travaglini. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Drazen, Andrew)
November 30, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Andrew T, Drazen for Plaintiff Susan Travaglini. (Drazen, Andrew)
November 30, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP.. (Rahoy, John)
November 30, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Disclosure Statement not filed as a separate docket entry. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
November 30, 2023 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by Susan Travaglini.(JBH)
November 30, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Henry Edward Autrey. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
November 29, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, d/b/a Walmart #3061 Sent To: Plaintiff (Rahoy, John)
November 29, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, d/b/a Walmart #3061 Sent To: State Court - Executed (Rahoy, John)
November 29, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, d/b/a Walmart #3061.(Rahoy, John)
November 29, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by John P. Rahoy for Defendant Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, d/b/a Walmart #3061. (Rahoy, John)
November 29, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 23SL-CC03710, with receipt number AMOEDC-10296587, in the amount of $402 Jury Demand,, filed by Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, d/b/a Walmart #3061. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Attachment Disclosure Statement, #4 Attachment State Court Complete File)(Rahoy, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Travaglini v. Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Travaglini
Represented By: Andrew T, Drazen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP, d/b/a Walmart #3061
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East I, LP doing business as Walmart #3061
Represented By: John P. Rahoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?