Langston v. QuikTrip Corporation
Plaintiff: Regina Langston
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation doing business as Quicktrip #610R
Case Number: 4:2023cv01569
Filed: December 7, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Stephen R Welby
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 26, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 26, 2024 Filing 20 ENTRY of Appearance by Nicholas Giaviano Cova for Defendant QuikTrip Corporation. (Cova, Nicholas)
January 25, 2024 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #15 Disclosure Statement filed by Plaintiff Regina Langston. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual party. The Disclosure Statement must include the party's state of citizenship at the time the complaint was filed AND at the time the case was removed to Federal Court. An Amended Disclosure Statement must be filed. (CBL)
January 24, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following schedule shall apply in this case, and will be modified only upon a showing of exceptional circumstances... This case is assigned to Track 2. Motion to Join Parties due by 3/1/2024. Discovery Completion due by 11/1/2024. Non-Dispositive Motions due by 11/12/2024. ADR Future Reference 6/17/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 11/15/2024. Jury Trial set for 4/21/2025 09:00 AM in Courtroom 17S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby. Pretrial Conference set for 4/17/2025 10:00 AM in Courtroom 17S - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby... SEE ORDER FOR FULL DETAILS. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 01/24/2024. (ANR)
January 24, 2024 Filing 17 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby:Rule 16 Conference held on 1/24/2024. Conference held by phone. CMO to issue. (Notice only, no.pdf attached.). (proceedings started: 10:29 am) (proceedings ended: 10:33 am) (Appearance for Plaintiff: Brady McAninch)(Appearance for Defendant: John Cooney) (ANR)
January 24, 2024 Filing 16 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Regina Langston, Defendant QuikTrip Corporation. (ANR)
January 24, 2024 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Regina Langston. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (McAninch, Brady)
January 18, 2024 Filing 14 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiff Regina Langston - SECOND NOTICE. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, Every non-governmental party, including individuals, or intervenors must file a Disclosure Statement in this case. Individual parties must list their name and state of citizenship in Section 2. Non individuals must include the state of incorporation/formation and state of primary state of business in section 2. LLCs, LLPs must include all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations and his/her/its state of citizenship (see above) in Section 2. These entities must be entered into cm/ecf where prompted.Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (CBL)
January 18, 2024 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Regina Langston, Defendant QuikTrip Corporation to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 1/25/2024. (CBL)
January 17, 2024 Filing 13 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Regina Langston. . (McAninch, Brady)
January 10, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 12 Docket Text ORDER: The Rule 16 conference is rescheduled for January 24, 2024, at 10:30 a.m. by telephone. The Joint Scheduling Plan is due no later than January 17, 2024. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 01/10/24. (MCC)
January 2, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Docket Text ORDER: The Rule 16 conference scheduled for January 3, 2024, is VACATED, to be rescheduled at a later date. So Ordered by Judge Stephen R. Welby on 01/02/24. (MCC)
January 2, 2024 Filing 10 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Brady McAninch. Review of case shows that Attorney Brady McAninch is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (CBL)
December 11, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE This case is assigned to Track: Track 2 - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: [SEE FULL ORDER FOR DETAILS.](Joint Scheduling Plan due by 12/27/2023. Rule 16 Conference set for 1/3/2024 10:00 AM in Telephone Conference in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Stephen R. Welby on 12/11/2023. (JMP)
December 7, 2023 Filing 8 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
December 7, 2023 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis City, filed by Regina Langston.(JBH)
December 7, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by John D. Cooney for Defendant QuikTrip Corporation d/b/a QuikTrip #610R. (Cooney, John)
December 7, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant QuikTrip Corporation d/b/a QuikTrip #610R Sent To: Plaintiff (Kinder, Jacqueline)
December 7, 2023 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by QuikTrip Corporation d/b/a QuikTrip #610R. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
December 7, 2023 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) filed by Defendant QuikTrip Corporation d/b/a QuikTrip #610R. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
December 7, 2023 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Jacqueline M. Kinder for Defendant QuikTrip Corporation d/b/a QuikTrip #610R. (Kinder, Jacqueline)
December 7, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Louis City, case number 2322-CC09492, with receipt number AMOEDC-10312952, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by QuikTrip Corporation d/b/a QuikTrip #610R. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B)(Kinder, Jacqueline)
December 7, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Stephen R. Welby. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Langston v. QuikTrip Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Regina Langston
Represented By: Brady McAninch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: QuikTrip Corporation doing business as Quicktrip #610R
Represented By: Jacqueline M. Kinder
Represented By: John D. Cooney
Represented By: Nicholas Giaviano Cova
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?