Emerson Electric Co. v. Han et al
Plaintiff: Emerson Electric Co.
Defendant: Henry Han and ABB Holdings Inc.
Case Number: 4:2023cv01579
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Ronnie L White
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Account Receivable
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 1, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 1, 2024 Filing 40 NOTICE of Change of Address filed by T. Christopher Bailey. (Bailey, T.) (Attorney instructed to update address details through PACER as required. Instructions sent via email on 2/1/2024.) (CBL).
January 8, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall make an entry in the docket record reflecting the dismissal of Defendant ABB Holdings, Inc. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). Each party shall bear its own costs. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 01/08/2024. (KCD)
December 27, 2023 Filing 38 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Henry Han. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Bailey, T.)
December 26, 2023 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Emerson Electric Co. of Defendant ABB Holdings Inc. (Comerford, John)
December 22, 2023 Filing 36 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Emerson Electric Co. ABB Holdings Inc. served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. (Comerford, John) Modified on 12/26/2023 (TMT).
December 22, 2023 Filing 35 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendant Henry Han. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (TMT)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER DENYING TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.'s Amended Motion for Temporary Restraining Order against Defendant Henry Han is DENIED. (ECF No. #27 ). Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/21/2023. (KCD)
December 21, 2023 Filing 33 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant ABB Holdings Inc. Amendment to #23 Disclosure Statement. (McGovern, Brian) Modified on 12/22/2023 (TMT).
December 21, 2023 Filing 32 DELETED FOR FILING ERROR; DOCUMENT REFILED - SEE ECF #36 - SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Emerson Electric Co.. ABB Holdings Inc. served on 12/13/2023, answer due 1/3/2024. (Comerford, John) Modified on 12/26/2023 (TMT).
December 19, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Docket Text Order: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ECF No. #2 Motion for TRO, filed by Plaintiff, is DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 19, 2023. (SLS)
December 19, 2023 Filing 30 ELECTRONIC MINUTE ENTRY (no pdf attached) for proceedings held before District Judge Ronnie L. White: Motion Hearing held on 12/19/2023 re #27 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Defendant Henry Han filed by Emerson Electric Co. The hearing is held in chambers. Counsel for ABB Holdings Inc. are present. However, ABB Holdings Inc. is not part of the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and do not participate in the arguments. The Court hears arguments from counsel for Emerson Electric Co. and Abb Holdings Inc. The Court takes the matter under submission. Order to issue. (proceedings started: 2:29 PM) (proceedings ended: 2:55 PM) (Appearance for Plaintiff: John Comerford, James Martin)(Appearance for Defendant: T. Christopher Bailey, Kenneth H. Kirschner, Joseph Raffetto) (Court Reporter Not Present) (BRP)
December 19, 2023 Filing 29 REPLY to Response to Motion re #27 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Defendant Henry Han filed by Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - ABB Ltd 2022 Form 20-F)(Comerford, John)
December 19, 2023 Filing 28 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #27 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Defendant Henry Han filed by Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.. (Comerford, John)
December 19, 2023 Filing 27 Amended MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order Against Defendant Henry Han by Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.. (Comerford, John)
December 19, 2023 Filing 26 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #23 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. Named Party must disclose its state of incorporation/formation and the state of its primary place of business in section 2 of the form. Parents and affiliates must be entered into cm/ecf where prompted. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (ANR)
December 18, 2023 Filing 25 ENTRY of Appearance by Kenneth H. Kirschner for Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (Kirschner, Kenneth)
December 18, 2023 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph James Raffetto for Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (Raffetto, Joseph)
December 18, 2023 Filing 23 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by ABB Holdings Inc... (McGovern, Brian)
December 18, 2023 Filing 22 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A Declaration of Michael Gray)(McGovern, Brian)
December 18, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text Order: ORDER granting #19 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph J. Raffetto; granting #20 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth Kirschner. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 18, 2023. (SLS)
December 18, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Kenneth Kirschner. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10333370) by Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Kirschner, Kenneth)
December 18, 2023 Filing 19 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Joseph J. Raffetto. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10333324) by Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Raffetto, Joseph)
December 18, 2023 Filing 18 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Defendant Henry Han. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F)(Bailey, T.)
December 18, 2023 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by Bryan M. Kaemmerer for Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (Kaemmerer, Bryan)
December 18, 2023 Filing 16 ENTRY of Appearance by T. Christopher Bailey for Defendant Henry Han. (Bailey, T.)
December 18, 2023 Filing 15 ENTRY of Appearance by Brian E. McGovern for Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (McGovern, Brian)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 [DUPLICATE ENTRY-Document was refiled due to a filing error. See doc. #15 for corrected Entry of Appearance.] ENTRY of Appearance by S. Jay Dobbs for Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (Dobbs, S.) Modified on 12/20/2023 (BRP).
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by S. Jay Dobbs for Defendant ABB Holdings Inc.. (Dobbs, S.)
December 14, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the hearing on Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.'s Motion for Temporary Restraining Order (ECF No. #2 ) is set for Tuesday, December 19, 2023 at 2:30 p.m. The hearing will be held in person in the chambers of the undersigned. Only counsel shall appear for the hearing on the Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. (Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order set for 12/19/2023 at 02:30 PM in Chambers before District Judge Ronnie L. White.) Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on December 14, 2023. (BRP)
December 11, 2023 Filing 11 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Emerson Electric Co.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Comerford, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co. Process Server: Notice of Intent to Use Process Server (Comerford, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE Amended Notice Requesting Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: by Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co. re #3 Memorandum in Support of Motion, #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order (Comerford, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 FINAL NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re 6 Electronic Notice of Filing Deficiency, #1 Complaint,,. The filing deficiency previously identified has not been corrected by the filing attorney as to the Notice of Process Server. Case to proceed to judge assignment and further review by the Clerks Office Exec. Team. (JWD) Modified on 12/11/2023 (JWD). [Clerk's note: deficiency cured on 12/11/2023]
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 NOTICE Notice Requesting Hearing on Motion for Temporary Restraining Order: by Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co. (Comerford, John)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Notice of Process Server form not filed and Notice of Hearing Form not filed. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
December 11, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Ronnie L. White. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
December 11, 2023 Summons Issued as to defendant ABB Holdings Inc., Henry Han. The summonses were emailed to attorneys James F. Bennett, James B. Martin, and John Comerford. (JWD)
December 8, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James B. Martin for Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.. (Martin, James)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.. (Bennett, James)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.. (Comerford, John)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff Emerson Electric Co.. (Comerford, John)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Verified Complaint against defendant ABB Holdings Inc., Henry Han with receipt number AMOEDC-10316762, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Emerson Electric Co.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Verified Complaint, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Verified Complaint, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Verified Complaint, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Verified Complaint, #5 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Case Cover Sheet, #6 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #7 Summons Summons re Henry Han, #8 Summons Summons re ABB Holdings Inc.)(Comerford, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Emerson Electric Co. v. Han et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emerson Electric Co.
Represented By: James B. Martin
Represented By: John D. Comerford
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Han
Represented By: T. Christopher Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABB Holdings Inc.
Represented By: Brian E. McGovern
Represented By: Bryan M. Kaemmerer
Represented By: Joseph James Raffetto
Represented By: Kenneth H. Kirschner
Represented By: S. Jay Dobbs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?