Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Wright et al
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company and First Colony Life Insurance Company
Defendant: David Laval Wright, Sayre & Toso, Inc. and Estate of Valerie Wright
Case Number: 4:2023cv01580
Filed: December 8, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Interpleader Action
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 24, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 24, 2024 Filing 15 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by David Laval Wright.(McLean, Mark)
December 28, 2023 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Anthony W. Hafner for Defendant David Laval Wright. (Hafner, Anthony)
December 28, 2023 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Mark G. McLean for Defendant David Laval Wright. (McLean, Mark)
December 27, 2023 Filing 12 AFFIDAVIT re #11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Cantwell, Emily)
December 27, 2023 Filing 11 Summons Returned Unexecuted by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company as to Sayre & Toso, Inc.. (Cantwell, Emily)
December 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew C. Whitaker. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10317561) by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Whitaker, Andrew); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/12/2023. (KRZ)
December 11, 2023 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company Process Server: Mike Walrod - HPS Process Service & Investigations (Cantwell, Emily)
December 11, 2023 Filing 8 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company, Genworth Life Insurance Company, Genworth North America Corporation, Genworth Holdings, Inc., Genworth Financial, Inc., Jamestown Assignment Company, Inc., River Lake Insurance Company VI, River Lake Insurance Company X, Assigned Settlement, Inc., GNWLAAC Real Estate Holding, LLC, Newco Properties, Inc., Genworth Life Insurance Company of New York, Mayflower Assignment Corporation, GLICNY Real Estate Holding, LLC.. (Cantwell, Emily) Modified on 12/11/2023 (JWD).
December 11, 2023 Filing 7 SUPPLEMENTAL re #1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #2 Summons Summons to David Wright, #3 Summons Summons to Sayre Toso Inc.)(Cantwell, Emily)
December 11, 2023 Filing 6 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Andrew C. Whitaker. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10317561) by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Whitaker, Andrew)
December 11, 2023 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #1 Complaint, #2 Disclosure Statement. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Original Filing Form not filed. Civil Cover Sheet not filed. Plaintiff's counsel did not enter all corporate entities listed on Disclosure Statement into CM/ECF. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JWD)
December 11, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. 2. Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorneys Andrew Whitaker and Emily Cantwell. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)
December 8, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company Process Server: Lousika Legal Courier, LLC (Cantwell, Emily)
December 8, 2023 Filing 3 MOTION to Deposit Funds by Plaintiff Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. (Cantwell, Emily)
December 8, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Cantwell, Emily)
December 8, 2023 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10316828, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company.(Cantwell, Emily)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company v. Wright et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Genworth Life and Annuity Insurance Company
Represented By: Emily Cantwell
Represented By: Andrew C Whitaker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: First Colony Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Andrew C Whitaker
Represented By: Emily Cantwell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Laval Wright
Represented By: Anthony W. Hafner
Represented By: Mark G. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sayre & Toso, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Estate of Valerie Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?