Elliot v. HBO Home Entertainment Corp. et al
Plaintiff: Marc Elliot
Defendant: HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Jehane Noujaime, Karim Amer, The Othrs, LLC, The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Square, LLC, Isabella Constantino and John Does 1-10
Case Number: 4:2023cv01611
Filed: December 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Sarah E Pitlyk
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 9, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 9, 2024 Filing 34 RESPONSE to Motion re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Marc Elliot. (NEP)
January 16, 2024 Filing 33 EXHIBIT A RE Doc #31 Received; DVD will be maintained in the Clerk's Office: by Defendants Karim Amer, Isabella Constantino, HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Jehane Noujaime, The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. (NEP)
January 12, 2024 Filing 32 SUPPLEMENTAL re #31 MOTION to Dismiss Case Exhibit Key by Defendants Karim Amer, Isabella Constantino, HBO Home Entertainment Corp., John Does 1-10, Jehane Noujaime, The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC. (Seidlin-Bernstein, Elizabeth)
January 12, 2024 Filing 31 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Karim Amer, Isabella Constantino, HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Jehane Noujaime, The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Decl. of Karim Amer., #3 Decl. of Isabella Constantino, #4 Decl. of Samantha Grande, #5 Decl. of Jehane Noujaime, #6 Decl. of Lisa Heller, #7 Ex. A to Heller Decl. - video)(Seidlin-Bernstein, Elizabeth)
January 10, 2024 Filing 30 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #15 Disclosure Statement, #16 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. Section 2 must include the state of incorporation/formation AND the state of primary place of business for the named defendant. The Disclosure Statements must be refiled. (ANR)
December 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #26 MOTION for Leave to FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEF by Defendant Isabella Constantino. (Martineau, Joseph); ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/26/2023. (KRZ)
December 22, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Isabella Constantino. (Martineau, Joseph) filed by Isabella Constantino; ORDERED GRANTED. Isabella Constantino answer due 1/12/2024. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/22/2023. (KEK)
December 22, 2023 Filing 27 ENTRY of Appearance by Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein for Defendant Isabella Constantino. (Seidlin-Bernstein, Elizabeth)
December 22, 2023 Filing 26 MOTION for Leave to FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEF by Defendant Isabella Constantino. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 22, 2023 Filing 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Isabella Constantino. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 22, 2023 Filing 24 ENTRY of Appearance by Kolten Charles Ellis for Defendant Isabella Constantino. (Ellis, Kolten)
December 22, 2023 Filing 23 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Martineau for Defendant Isabella Constantino. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 21, 2023 Filing 22 Request for Electronic Noticing from Plaintiff. Email Address will be added to the party's record. (KEK)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10338964) by Defendants Karim Amer, HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Jehane Noujaime, The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. (Attachments: # 1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seidlin-Bernstein, Elizabeth) filed by The Othrs Licensing Corp., HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Jehane Noujaime, The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC, Karim Amer; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/21/2023. (KEK)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 19. Thu Dec 21 09:00:05 CST 2023 (Kratzer, Katie)
December 21, 2023 ***REMARK: Summons returns received that were previously filed in the state case before or at the time of removal as to Karim Amer, The Square LLC, and Jehane Nojaime. These defendants already have entered counsel. (KEK)
December 21, 2023 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 21. Thu Dec 21 10:38:19 CST 2023 (Kratzer, Katie)
December 20, 2023 Filing 20 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein. The Certificate of Good Standing was attached.(Filing fee $150 receipt number AMOEDC-10338964) by Defendants Karim Amer, HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Jehane Noujaime, The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Seidlin-Bernstein, Elizabeth)
December 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: #18 AND #17 ; ORDERED GRANTED. Karim Amer answer due 1/12/2024; HBO Home Entertainment Corp. answer due 1/12/2024; Jehane Noujaime answer due 1/12/2024; The Othrs Licensing Corp. answer due 1/12/2024; The Othrs, LLC answer due 1/12/2024; The Square, LLC answer due 1/12/2024. Signed by District Judge Sarah E. Pitlyk on 12/20/2023. (KEK)
December 19, 2023 Filing 18 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendants Karim Amer, HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Jehane Noujaime, The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 19, 2023 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to FILE OVERLENGTH BRIEF by Defendants Karim Amer, HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Jehane Noujaime, The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 19, 2023 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Othrs, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 19, 2023 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Square, LLC. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 19, 2023 Filing 14 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Othrs Licensing Corp.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 19, 2023 Filing 13 ENTRY of Appearance by Kolten Charles Ellis for Defendants Karim Amer, Jehane Noujaime. (Ellis, Kolten)
December 19, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Martineau for Defendants Karim Amer, Jehane Noujaime. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 19, 2023 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Kolten Charles Ellis for Defendants The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. (Ellis, Kolten)
December 19, 2023 Filing 10 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Martineau for Defendants The Othrs Licensing Corp., The Othrs, LLC, The Square, LLC. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., WarnerMedia (Thailand) Limited.. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #6 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendant HBO Home Entertainment Corp.. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. This case was removed based on diversity jurisdiction. Please provide the state of incorporation/formation of the party and its state of primary place of business in section 2 of the form. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (CBL)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Marc Elliot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(JWD)
December 15, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by HBO Home Entertainment Corp., Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc., WarnerMedia (Thailand) Limited, Warner Bros. Discovery, Inc... (Martineau, Joseph)
December 15, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kolten Charles Ellis for Defendant HBO Home Entertainment Corp.. (Ellis, Kolten)
December 15, 2023 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Joseph E. Martineau for Defendant HBO Home Entertainment Corp.. (Martineau, Joseph)
December 15, 2023 Filing 3 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant HBO Home Entertainment Corp. Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to State Clerk of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - efiling confirmation)(Martineau, Joseph)
December 15, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant HBO Home Entertainment Corp. Sent To: Plaintiff (Martineau, Joseph)
December 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis City, case number 2322-CC09423, with receipt number AMOEDC-10330210, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by HBO Home Entertainment Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State File, #2 Exhibit B - Original Filing Form, #3 Exhibit C - Civil Cover Sheet)(Martineau, Joseph)
December 15, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Sarah E. Pitlyk. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliot v. HBO Home Entertainment Corp. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Elliot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HBO Home Entertainment Corp.
Represented By: Kolten Charles Ellis
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jehane Noujaime
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Represented By: Kolten Charles Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karim Amer
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Represented By: Kolten Charles Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Othrs, LLC
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Represented By: Kolten Charles Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Othrs Licensing Corp.
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Represented By: Kolten Charles Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Square, LLC
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Represented By: Kolten Charles Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isabella Constantino
Represented By: Joseph E. Martineau
Represented By: Elizabeth Seidlin-Bernstein
Represented By: Kolten Charles Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?