A.M.C. v. Baxter International et al
Plaintiff: A.M.C.
Defendant: Baxter International, Inc., Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Baxter International and Baxter Healthcare Corp.
Case Number: 4:2023cv01613
Filed: December 15, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 13, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 13, 2024 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #24 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corp., Baxter International. (Bennett, James)
February 13, 2024 Filing 24 MOTION to Stay Discovery by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corp., Baxter International. (Bennett, James)
January 18, 2024 Filing 23 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corp., Baxter International. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Email)(Bennett, James)
January 17, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE: This case is assigned to Track: 2. A Scheduling Conference pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16 is set for February 28, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. before the undersigned in Courtroom 9N. (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 2/21/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 2/28/2024 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9N - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/17/2024. (LNJ)
January 8, 2024 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff A.M.C.. (Clubb, John)
January 5, 2024 Filing 20 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff A.M.C., Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corp., Baxter International. (LNJ)
January 4, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 19 Docket Text ORDER: Attorney Laura Clubb's motion to withdraw [ECF No #18 ] is GRANTED. Attorney Laura E. Clubb terminated. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 1/4/2024. (CLT)
January 4, 2024 Filing 18 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney re attorney/firm Laura Clubb by Plaintiff A.M.C. (CBL)
January 3, 2024 Filing 17 ENTRY of Appearance by John P. Clubb for Plaintiff A.M.C.. (Clubb, John)
December 22, 2023 Filing 16 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #15 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corp., Baxter International. (Bennett, James)
December 22, 2023 Filing 15 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corp., Baxter International. (Bennett, James)
December 18, 2023 Filing 14 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
December 18, 2023 Filing 13 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baxter Healthcare Corp., Baxter International, Inc... (Bennett, James)
December 18, 2023 Filing 12 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baxter International, Baxter Healthcare (Guangzhou) Company Ltd, Baxter Healthcare SA (Singapore Woodlands Branch), BlackRock, Inc., Morgan Stanley.. (Bennett, James)
December 18, 2023 Filing 11 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corp., Baxter International Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Attachment Notice to State Court of Filing of Removal)(Bennett, James)
December 18, 2023 Filing 10 Electronic Notice - Application for Admission needed as to Laura E. Clubb. Review of case shows that Attorney Laura E. Clubb is not currently a member of our Bar. For instructions on applying for bar admission or moving for pro hac vice admission, please follow the instructions located on our website at #https://www.moed.uscourts.gov under the Attorney tab. Notice only, no.pdf attached. (JBH)
December 18, 2023 Filing 9 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Charles County, filed by A.M.C..(JBH)
December 18, 2023 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #2 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Baxter International, Inc.. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement in this action in which jurisdiction is based on diversity under 28 U.S.C.1332(a) but, did not identify the name and citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor, including all members, sub-members, general and limited partners, and corporations. One Disclosure Statement must be filed for each party. Further, please include the state of incorporation/formation and the state of primary place of business in section 2 of the form. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled. (CBL)
December 18, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
December 15, 2023 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Arin Smith for Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Baxter International, Inc.. (Smith, Arin)
December 15, 2023 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Kelly J.H. Murrie for Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Baxter International, Inc.. (Murrie, Kelly)
December 15, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by James F. Bennett for Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Baxter International, Inc.. (Bennett, James)
December 15, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Baxter International, Inc. Sent To: Plaintiff (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Bennett, James)
December 15, 2023 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Baxter International, Inc... (Bennett, James)
December 15, 2023 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Baxter International, Inc., Baxter Healthcare (Guangzhou) Company Ltd, Baxter Company Ltd, BlackRock, Inc., Morgan Stanley.. (Bennett, James)
December 15, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Circuit Court of St. Charles County, Missouri, case number 2311-CC01087, with receipt number AMOEDC-10331059, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Baxter Healthcare Corporation, Baxter International, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Petition, #2 Exhibit B - State Court File, #3 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Bennett, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: A.M.C. v. Baxter International et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.M.C.
Represented By: John P. Clubb
Represented By: Laura E. Clubb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter International, Inc.
Represented By: Arin Smith
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corporation
Represented By: Arin Smith
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter International
Represented By: Arin Smith
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baxter Healthcare Corp.
Represented By: Arin Smith
Represented By: James F. Bennett
Represented By: Kelly J.H. Murrie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?