Lee v. Unum Group Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Thomas K. Lee
Defendant: Unum Group Corporation, Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company and The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 4:2023cv01724
Filed: December 28, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Rodney H Holmes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2024 Filing 24 JOINT SCHEDULING PLAN by Plaintiff Thomas K. Lee. . (Pieper, Christopher)
February 21, 2024 Filing 23 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Golterman, Robert)
February 14, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED the Rule 16 Conference is re-set for 3/15/2024 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 2/14/2024. (HMA)
February 12, 2024 Filing 21 FULL CONSENT has been received by Plaintiff Thomas K. Lee, Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation. (HMA)
January 29, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER SETTING RULE 16 CONFERENCE (See Full Order). This case is assigned to Track: 2 Standard. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 2/12/2024. Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/7/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 3/14/2024 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 1/29/2024. (JEB)
January 25, 2024 Filing 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative and Additional Defenses filed by Defendant The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company. (Golterman, Robert)
January 25, 2024 Filing 18 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative and Additional Defenses filed by Defendant Unum Group Corporation. (Golterman, Robert)
January 25, 2024 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal) and Affirmative and Additional Defenses filed by Defendant Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company. (Golterman, Robert)
January 24, 2024 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Thomas K. Lee, Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (CLH)
January 3, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Docket Text ORDER: Re #15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply OR TO OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation; ORDERED GRANTED. (Response to Court due by 1/25/2024) Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 1/3/2024. (CLH)
January 2, 2024 Filing 15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply OR TO OTHERWISE RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation. (Golterman, Robert)
December 29, 2023 Filing 14 ENTRY of Appearance by Aaron W. Sanders for Plaintiff Thomas K. Lee. (Sanders, Aaron)
December 29, 2023 Filing 13 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Thomas K. Lee. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Pieper, Christopher)
December 29, 2023 Filing 12 ENTRY of Appearance by Christopher R. Pieper for Plaintiff Thomas K. Lee. (Pieper, Christopher)
December 28, 2023 Filing 11 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
December 28, 2023 Filing 10 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to State Clerk of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - efiling confirmation)(Haas, Matthew)
December 28, 2023 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by Matthew Joseph Haas for Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation. (Haas, Matthew)
December 28, 2023 Filing 8 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corp., Unum Group Corp... (Golterman, Robert)
December 28, 2023 Filing 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Unum Group Corporation, BlackRock, Inc., Vanguard Group, Inc... (Golterman, Robert)
December 28, 2023 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, Unum Group Corp., Unum Group Corp... (Golterman, Robert)
December 28, 2023 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Golterman for Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation. (Golterman, Robert)
December 28, 2023 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company, The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company, Unum Group Corporation Sent To: State Court - Executed (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Notice to State Clerk of Removal, #2 Exhibit 2 - efiling confirmation)(Golterman, Robert)
December 28, 2023 Filing 3 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: St. Louis County Circuit Court, filed by Thomas K. Lee. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(JWD)
December 28, 2023 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants Provident Life and Accident Insurance Co., The Paul Revere Life Insurance Co., Unum Group Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Golterman, Robert)
December 28, 2023 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from St. Louis County Circuit Court, case number 23SL-CC05027, with receipt number AMOEDC-10348566, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by The Paul Revere Life Insurance Co., Provident Life and Accident Insurance Co., Unum Group Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court File, #2 Exhibit B - Declaration of Joseph Griffin, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Golterman, Robert) (Main Document 1 replaced on 12/28/2023 due to PDF error) (JWD). Modified on 12/28/2023 (JWD).
December 28, 2023 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lee v. Unum Group Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas K. Lee
Represented By: Aaron W. Sanders
Represented By: Christopher R. Pieper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Unum Group Corporation
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Haas
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Provident Life and Accident Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Paul Revere Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Robert J. Golterman
Represented By: Matthew Joseph Haas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?