State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Stout et al
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Defendant: James Stout, K.B.A.S., K.B.S. and David Paul Zufall, Jr.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00037
Filed: January 8, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Shirley Padmore Mensah
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Declaratory Judgment
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2024 Filing 17 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by James Stout. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Rodriguez, Jamie)
February 16, 2024 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K.B.A.S.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Rodriguez, Jamie)
February 16, 2024 Filing 15 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by K.B.S.. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Rodriguez, Jamie)
February 16, 2024 Notice from Clerk instructing Defendants K.B.A.S., K.B.S., James Stout, Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (CLH)
February 16, 2024 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Defendants K.B.A.S., K.B.S., James Stout. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (CLH)
February 15, 2024 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by James Stout James Stout waiver signed on 1/9/2024, answer due 3/9/2024. (Rodriguez, Jamie) Modified on 2/16/2024 (CLH).
February 15, 2024 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by K.B.A.S. K.B.A.S. waiver signed on 1/9/2024, answer due 3/9/2024. (Rodriguez, Jamie) Modified on 2/16/2024 (CLH).
February 15, 2024 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by K.B.S. K.B.S. waiver signed on 1/9/2024, answer due 3/9/2024. (Rodriguez, Jamie) Modified on 2/16/2024 (CLH).
February 15, 2024 Filing 11 ENTRY of Appearance by Jamie Ann Rodriguez for Defendants K.B.A.S., K.B.S., James Stout. (Rodriguez, Jamie)
January 19, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. David Paul Zufall, Jr. served on 1/11/2024, answer due 2/1/2024. (Bousquet, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 9 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
January 9, 2024 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Peter A. Houser for Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Houser, Peter)
January 9, 2024 Filing 7 ENTRY of Appearance by Patrick A. Bousquet for Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Bousquet, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 6 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company.. (Bousquet, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 5 NOTICE of Lawsuit: by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service re: James Stout)(Bousquet, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service re K.B.A.S.)(Bousquet, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Lawsuit: by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company (Attachments: #1 Waiver of Service re: K.B.S.)(Bousquet, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff State Farm Fire and Casualty Company Process Server: Markel & Associates (Attachments: #1 Summons Directed to David Zufall)(Bousquet, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant K.B.A.S., K.B.S., James Stout, David Paul Zufall, Jr. with receipt number AMOEDC-10366022, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by State Farm Fire and Casualty Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Underlying Petition, #2 Exhibit B - Policy, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Original Filing Form)(Bousquet, Patrick)
January 9, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Shirley P. Mensah. 1 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorneys Patrick A. Bousquet and Peter A. Houser. 3 Waiver(s) of Service issued. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company v. Stout et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: State Farm Fire and Casualty Company
Represented By: Patrick A. Bousquet
Represented By: Peter A. Houser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Stout
Represented By: Jamie Ann Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.B.A.S.
Represented By: Jamie Ann Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K.B.S.
Represented By: Jamie Ann Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Paul Zufall, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?