Mooney v. Hussmann Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Samantha Mooney and S. Mooney
Defendant: Hussmann Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of N.A. and Panasonic Corporation of North America
Case Number: 4:2024cv00081
Filed: January 16, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Noelle C Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185 Labor/Mgt. Relations (Contracts)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 12, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 12, 2024 Filing 30 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff S. Mooney. (Hernandez, Sylvia)
March 12, 2024 Filing 29 MEMORANDUM in Opposition re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff S. Mooney. (Hernandez, Sylvia)
March 11, 2024 Filing 28 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County filed by Plaintiff S. Mooney. (Hernandez, Sylvia)
March 11, 2024 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Petition by Plaintiff S. Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Attachment Amended Petition, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hernandez, Sylvia)
February 28, 2024 Filing 26 RESPONSE in Opposition re #23 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County filed by Defendants Hussmann Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Maule, Stephen)
February 20, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Hussmann Corporation and Defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America's Motions to Dismiss with Suggestions in Support Thereof (Doc. #24 ), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff may respond to the pending Motions to Dismiss on or before March 12, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 2/20/2024. (TMT)
February 14, 2024 Filing 24 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case , #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff S. Mooney. (Hernandez, Sylvia)
February 14, 2024 Filing 23 MOTION to Remand Case to State Court to Circuit Court of St. Louis County by Plaintiff S. Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Hernandez, Sylvia)
February 13, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 22 RULE 16 ORDER: This case is assigned to Track: Preliminary Track 2 (Standard) [SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS] (Joint Scheduling Plan due by 3/27/2024. Rule 16 Conference set for 4/3/2024 10:00 AM in Chambers - St. Louis before Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 2/13/2024. (TMT) Modified on 2/26/2024 (BRP).
February 9, 2024 Filing 21 FULL CONSENT has been received by Defendants Hussmann Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of North America, Plaintiff S. Mooney. (TMT)
February 6, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America's Motion to Dismiss with Suggestions in Support Thereof, (Doc. #18 ), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Defendant Hussmann Corporation's Motion to Dismiss with Suggestions in Support Thereof, (Doc. #19 ), is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. IT IS FINALLY ORDERED that Plaintiff may respond by February 15, 2024. ( Response to Court due by 2/15/2024.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 2/6/2024. (KXS)
February 6, 2024 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff S. Mooney to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (BRP)
February 5, 2024 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff S. Mooney. (Hernandez, Sylvia)
February 5, 2024 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Plaintiff S. Mooney. (Hernandez, Sylvia)
January 25, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 17 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Hussmann Corporation's Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief in Support of the Motion to Dismiss (Doc. 15) is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins on 1/25/2024. (JAS)
January 24, 2024 Filing 16 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Panasonic Corporation of North America, Panasonic Holdings (Netherlands) B.V... (Maule, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File in Excess of Page Limitation by Defendant Hussmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Memo in Support)(Maule, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 14 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Hussmann Corporation. (Maule, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Hussmann Corporation. (Maule, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #11 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Maule, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Maule, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint by Hussmann Corporation.(Maule, Stephen)
January 23, 2024 Filing 9 ENTRY of Appearance by James N. Foster, Jr for Defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Foster, James)
January 23, 2024 Filing 8 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen B. Maule for Defendant Panasonic Corporation of North America. (Maule, Stephen)
January 17, 2024 Filing 7 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
January 17, 2024 Filing 6 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of St. Louis County, filed by S. Mooney. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(JBH) Modified on 1/17/2024 [CLERKS NOTE: SEALED DUE TO PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN DOCKET ENTRY #1](JBH).
January 17, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Noelle C. Collins. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
January 16, 2024 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Hussmann Corporation, Panasonic Corporation of N.A., Panasonic Holdings (Netherlands) B.V., Panasonic Holdings Corp... (Maule, Stephen)
January 16, 2024 Filing 4 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendant Hussmann Corporation Sent To: Plaintiff (Maule, Stephen)
January 16, 2024 Filing 3 ENTRY of Appearance by James N. Foster, Jr for Defendant Hussmann Corporation. (Foster, James)
January 16, 2024 Filing 2 ENTRY of Appearance by Stephen B. Maule for Defendant Hussmann Corporation. (Maule, Stephen)
January 16, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Twenty-First Judicial Circuit St. Louis County, MO, case number 23SLCC05022, with receipt number AMOEDC-10380113, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Hussmann Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Case File, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Original Filing Form)(Maule, Stephen) Modified on 1/17/2024 [CLERKS NOTE: SEALED DUE TO PERSONAL IDENTIFIERS IN ATTACHMENT #1] (JBH).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mooney v. Hussmann Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Mooney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: S. Mooney
Represented By: Sylvia Alejandra Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hussmann Corporation
Represented By: James N. Foster, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B. Maule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Panasonic Corporation of North America
Represented By: James N. Foster, Jr.
Represented By: Stephen B. Maule
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?