Association of Early Child Care Educators v. Vandeven et al
Plaintiff: Association of Early Child Care Educators
Defendant: Dr. Margie Vandeven, Dr. Tracy Hinds and Dr. Pam Thomas
Case Number: 4:2024cv00218
Filed: February 12, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Henry Edward Autrey
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 11, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 11, 2024 Filing 16 MOTION to Expedite Briefing Schedule and Consideration of Its Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Association of Early Child Care Educators. (Ellis, Kolten)
April 1, 2024 Filing 15 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #14 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Tracy Hinds, Pam Thomas, Margie Vandeven. (JEB)
April 1, 2024 Filing 14 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendants Tracy Hinds, Pam Thomas, Margie Vandeven. (JEB)
April 1, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Docket Text ORDER: Re: #11 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Out of Time by Defendants Tracy Hinds, Pam Thomas, Margie Vandeven; ORDERED GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 4/1/2024. (JEB)
March 29, 2024 Filing 12 REASSIGNMENT ORDER (NMG). Pursuant to full consent to jurisdiction by a Magistrate Judge not being received, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the above styled cause is randomly reassigned from Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes to District Judge Henry Edward Autrey. (KXS)
March 28, 2024 Filing 11 MOTION for Leave to File Motion to Dismiss Out of Time by Defendants Tracy Hinds, Pam Thomas, Margie Vandeven. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B - Memorandum of Law in Suport of Motion to Dismiss)(Gallagher, Ryan)
March 28, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall draw the name of a District Judge for reassignment of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rodney H. Holmes on 3/28/2024. (JEB)
March 27, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Association of Early Child Care Educators. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Crockett-Smith Declaration, #2 Exhibit 1-A - Crocket-Smith Provider List, #3 Exhibit 2 - Scheer Declaration, #4 Exhibit 2-A - PT Email, #5 Exhibit 2-B - Scheer DSR Email, #6 Exhibit 2-C - Scheer AR Email, #7 Exhibit 3 - Peebles Declaration, #8 Exhibit 3-A - Peebles AR Email, #9 Exhibit 3-B - Peebles DSR Email, #10 Exhibit 4 - Brown Declaration, #11 Exhibit 4-A - Brown AR App, #12 Exhibit 4-B - Brown DSR App, #13 Exhibit 4-C - Brown AR Email, #14 Exhibit 4-D - Brown DSR Email, #15 Exhibit 4-E - 9-6-23 Ltr, #16 Exhibit 5 - Bea Declaration, #17 Exhibit 6 - 2022 State Plan, #18 Exhibit 7 - 2012 State Plan, #19 Exhibit 8 - 2014 State Plan, #20 Exhibit 9 - 2016 State Plan, #21 Exhibit 10 - 2019 State Plan)(Ellis, Kolten) (Attachment 16 replaced on 3/28/2024) (JEB).
March 27, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Association of Early Child Care Educators. (Ellis, Kolten)
March 27, 2024 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff Association of Early Child Care Educators to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/1/2024. (JEB)
February 29, 2024 Filing 7 MEMORANDUM OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Association of Early Child Care Educators. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3)(Phillips, Jerina)
February 13, 2024 Filing 6 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
February 13, 2024 ***REMARK : [REMARK DOCKETED IN WRONG CASE IN ERROR. TEXT REMOVED.] (JWD) Modified on 2/14/2024 (JWD).
February 13, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Rodney H. Holmes. 3 Summons(es) issued and emailed to attorney Jerina Phillips and Kolten Ellis. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (JWD)
February 12, 2024 Filing 5 ENTRY of Appearance by Kolten Charles Ellis for Plaintiff Association of Early Child Care Educators. (Ellis, Kolten)
February 12, 2024 Filing 4 ENTRY of Appearance by Jerina Dominique Phillips for Plaintiff Association of Early Child Care Educators. (Phillips, Jerina)
February 12, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Association of Early Child Care Educators Process Server: Markell & Associates, Inc. (Phillips, Jerina)
February 12, 2024 Filing 2 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Association of Early Child Care Educators. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Phillips, Jerina)
February 12, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against defendant All Defendants with receipt number AMOEDC-10434810, in the amount of $405 Non-Jury Demand,, filed by Association of Early Child Care Educators. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form, #3 Summons Summons - Vandeven, #4 Summons Summons - Hinds, #5 Summons Summons - Thomas)(Phillips, Jerina)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Association of Early Child Care Educators v. Vandeven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Association of Early Child Care Educators
Represented By: Kolten Charles Ellis
Represented By: Jerina Dominique Phillips
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Margie Vandeven
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Tracy Hinds
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Pam Thomas
Represented By: Ryan Joseph Gallagher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?