Cogley et al v. Midvale Indemnity Company et al
Plaintiff: Charles Zac Cogley and Andrea Scarpino
Defendant: Midvale Indemnity Company doing business as Midvale Insurance Program, Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. doing business as AFICS, John Doe Corporation and John Doe 1-5
Case Number: 4:2024cv00352
Filed: March 7, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Patricia L Cohen
Referring Judge: John A Ross
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2024 Filing 23 Electronic Notice re: Disclosure Statement to Plaintiffs Charles Zac Cogley, Andrea Scarpino. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible and add all individuals and entities into CM/ECF as required # (moed-0001.pdf). (JAB)
April 10, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 23. Wed Apr 10 15:54:22 CDT 2024 (Bernsen, John)
April 8, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 22. Mon Apr 8 13:00:32 CDT 2024 (Reichert, Alexis)
April 5, 2024 Filing 22 CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to Sr. District Judge John A. Ross for all further proceedings. (CLT)
April 4, 2024 Filing 21 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
April 2, 2024 Filing 20 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Andrea Scarpino re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Form moed-0064 - notice re magistrate judge jurisdiction) (LNJ)
April 2, 2024 Filing 19 Letter from Clerk sent to Plaintiff Charles Zac Cogley re: Failure to file Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/11/2024. (Attachments: #1 Form moed-0064 - notice re magistrate judge jurisdiction) (LNJ)
April 2, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 19, 20. Mailed to party not set up for electronic delivery. Tue Apr 2 15:49:17 CDT 2024 (Jones, Lauren)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Docket Text ORDER: Plaintiffs' motion for extension of time to file response to Defendants motion to strike and to dismiss [ECF No. #17 ] is GRANTED. The deadline for response is extended to April 8, 2024. (Responses due by 4/8/2024) Signed by Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen on 3/26/2024. (CLT)
March 26, 2024 Opinion or Order ORDER RECEIPT: (see receipt) Docket No: 18. Tue Mar 26 12:31:33 CDT 2024 (Thoele, Cassandra)
March 25, 2024 Filing 17 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to #8 MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages and to Dismiss Count II by Plaintiffs Charles Zac Cogley, Andrea Scarpino. (JAB)
March 12, 2024 Filing 16 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Midvale Indemnity Company Sent To: State Court - Executed (Wulff, Robert)
March 11, 2024 Filing 15 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Homesite Underwriting Managers, LLC, Homesite Group Incorporated, AMFAM, Inc., AFMICSI, AmFam Holdings, Inc., American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company.. (Wulff, Robert)
March 11, 2024 Filing 14 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midvale Indemnity Company, AMFAM, Inc., AmFam Holdings, Inc., American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company, AFMICSI.. (Wulff, Robert)
March 11, 2024 Filing 13 AMENDED DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., AmFam Holdings, Inc., American Family Insurance Mutual Holding Company.. (Wulff, Robert)
March 8, 2024 Filing 12 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency re #3 Disclosure Statement, #4 Disclosure Statement, #5 Disclosure Statement filed by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Midvale Indemnity Company. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Party filed the Disclosure Statement but failed to enter the individuals/entities into CM/ECF as required. The Disclosure Statement must be refiled and these individuals/entities must be added into CM/ECF where prompted. Additionally, this case is an action which jurisdiction is based on diversity, therefore section 2 must be filled out to include the party's primary state of business AND state of incorporation/formation. An amended Disclosure Statement for each defendant must be refiled. (ANR)
March 7, 2024 Filing 11 First Amended Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Charles Zac Cogley, Andrea Scarpino.(JWD)
March 7, 2024 Filing 10 Petition (Removal/Transfer) Received From: Circuit Court of the City of St. Louis, filed by Charles Zac Cogley, Andrea Scarpino.(JWD) Modified on 3/7/2024 to correct title of State Court (JWD).
March 7, 2024 Filing 9 MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re #8 MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages and to Dismiss Count II filed by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Midvale Indemnity Company. (Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 8 MOTION to Strike Punitive Damages and to Dismiss Count II by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Midvale Indemnity Company. (Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Midvale Indemnity Company.(Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 6 ENTRY of Appearance by Robert J. Wulff for Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Midvale Indemnity Company. (Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 5 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I... (Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest.. (Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Midvale Indemnity Company.. (Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF FILING NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by Defendants American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest, Midvale Indemnity Company Sent To: Plaintiff (Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from City of St. Louis, case number 2322-CC01364, with receipt number AMOEDC-10481841, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by Midvale Indemnity Company, American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I., Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Original Filing Form Original Filing Form)(Wulff, Robert)
March 7, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Processed (see notice of electronic filing for distribution list) Thu Mar 7 15:02:39 CST 2024 (admin,)
March 7, 2024 ***Complaint Letter Created. This is to advise you that this office has received and filed your complaint and has assigned it the above-referenced case number. (JWD)
March 7, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JWD)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cogley et al v. Midvale Indemnity Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Zac Cogley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andrea Scarpino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Midvale Indemnity Company doing business as Midvale Insurance Program
Represented By: Robert J. Wulff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homesite Insurance Company of the Midwest
Represented By: Robert J. Wulff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. doing business as AFICS
Represented By: Robert J. Wulff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe 1-5
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?