St. Louis County, Missouri v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Plaintiff: St. Louis County, Missouri
Defendant: Evernorth Health, Inc., Eli Lilly and Company, Novo Nordisk Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Express Scripts Holding Company, Express Scripts, Inc., Express Scripts Administrators, LLC, ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc., Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark, LLC, UnitedHealth Group, Inc., Optum, Inc., OptumRx Inc. and Optuminsight, Inc.
Case Number: 4:2024cv00369
Filed: March 11, 2024
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of Missouri
Presiding Judge: Catherine D Perry
Nature of Suit: Racketeer/Corrupt Organization
Cause of Action: 18 U.S.C. ยง 1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2024 Filing 26 CJRA ORDER (NMG). Magistrate Judge Patricia L. Cohen termed. Case reassigned to Sr. District Judge Catherine D. Perry for all further proceedings (CLT)
April 5, 2024 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF MDL TRANSFER to: District of New Jersey. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 4/5/2024. Case transferred via CM-ECF extraction. (JBH)
April 5, 2024 Filing 24 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-11) regarding MDL 3080 by Clerk of the Panel. Signed by Tiffaney D. Pete on 4/5/2024. (JBH)
April 4, 2024 Filing 23 Pursuant to Local Rule 2.08, the assigned/referred magistrate judge is designated and authorized by the court to exercise full authority in this assigned/referred action or matter under 28 U.S.C. Sec. 636 and 18 U.S.C Sec. 3401, including any case budgeting matters. (auto)
April 2, 2024 Filing 22 STIPULATION and Proposed Order by Defendants CVS Health Corporation, CVS Pharmacy, Inc, Caremark PCS Health, LLC, Caremark Rx, LLC, Caremark, LLC. (Murray, Casey). Modified text on 4/5/2024 (JAB). Modified on 4/5/2024 (JAB).
April 2, 2024 Notice from Clerk instructing Plaintiff St. Louis County, Missouri to submit Notice regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. (Notice re: Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction due by 4/5/2024). (LNJ)
March 27, 2024 Filing 21 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Caremark PCS Health, LLC served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Caremark Rx, LLC served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 19 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Caremark, LLC served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 18 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. CVS Health Corporation served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. CVS Pharmacy, Inc served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Eli Lilly and Company served on 3/19/2024, answer due 4/9/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 14 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Evernorth Health, Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 13 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Express Scripts Administrators, LLC served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 11 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Express Scripts, Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Novo Nordisk Inc. served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 9 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Optum, Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Optuminsight, Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. OptumRx Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC served on 3/15/2024, answer due 4/5/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 27, 2024 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by St. Louis County, Missouri. UnitedHealth Group, Inc. served on 3/14/2024, answer due 4/4/2024. (Burns, Sarah)
March 12, 2024 Case Opening Notification. Judge Assigned: Honorable Patricia L. Cohen. 17 Summons(es) issued and emailed to Sarah S. Burns. All parties must file the Notice Regarding Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form consenting to or opting out of the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction. Click #here for the instructions. Pursuant to Local Rule 2.09, every nongovernmental corporate party or nongovernmental corporation that seeks to intervene in any case, and every party or intervenor in an action in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity, must file a Disclosure Statement immediately upon entering its appearance in the case. Please complete and file the certificate as soon as possible. # (moed-0001.pdf). (JBH)
March 11, 2024 Filing 4 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by St. Louis County, Missouri. No corporate parents or affiliates identified. (Burns, Sarah)
March 11, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Deficiency. In accordance with Eastern District of Missouri Local Rules and the Case Management/Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) Procedures Manual, a filing deficiency has been identified as follows: Disclosure Statement not filed as a separate docket entry. This deficiency must be filed in the case record immediately. (JBH)
March 11, 2024 Filing 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff St. Louis County, Missouri Process Server: Legalex Litigation Support Services LLC (JBH)
March 11, 2024 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against defendant All Defendants with receipt number BMOEDC-10486658, in the amount of $405 Jury Demand,, filed by St. Louis County. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Original Filing Form Original Filing, #3 Form Disclosure Statement, #4 Form Notice to use special process server, #5 Summons Caremark LLC, #6 Summons Caremark PCS, #7 Summons Caremark RX, #8 Summons CVS Health Corp, #9 Summons CVS Pharmacy, #10 Summons Eli Lilly, #11 Summons ESI Mail Services, #12 Summons Evernorth, #13 Summons Express Scripts Administrators, #14 Summons Express Scripts Pharmacy, #15 Summons Express Scripts, #16 Summons Novo Nordisk, #17 Summons Optum Inc, #18 Summons Optum Insight, #19 Summons Optum RX, #20 Summons Sanofi-Aventis, #21 Summons Unitedhealth Group)(Burns, Sarah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Missouri Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: St. Louis County, Missouri v. Eli Lilly and Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Evernorth Health, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eli Lilly and Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novo Nordisk Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Holding Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Administrators, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ESI Mail Pharmacy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Express Scripts Pharmacy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark Rx, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark PCS Health, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caremark, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UnitedHealth Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optum, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OptumRx Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Optuminsight, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: St. Louis County, Missouri
Represented By: Sarah S. Burns
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?