Grady et al v. CenturyLink Communications, LLC
Plaintiff: Derek H. Virkus, Gail L. Sherrick, Alma Natalia Noot, Cecilia S. Price, Matthew Richard Phillips, Peggy L. Abeyta, Kathryn E. Dunbar, Kurt W. Byers, Martin Quezada, Tammy Norton, Heidi A. Beltico, Ardis L. Arbuckle, Joy Lamar Bateman, Daniel C. Cannon III, Rosarito P. Kniffin, Rosemary T. Swenson, Esther Kay Medina, Carmen R. Guffey, Michael N. McGarr, James Ellington, Darcy Washington-Hawes, Gladys Humes, Karen J. Prutzman, Janice R. Undsderfer, Philip B. Sexton, Brian K. McNiff, James Connelly, Jessica Greenwood, Ralph Vigil, Lori Carter-Goolsby, Duwayne H. Schoepp, Allen T. Groner, Sharon V. Jones, Steven F. Rygwalski, Joyce Ann Finch, Lisa Marie Levine, Gary G. Baker, Shirley A. McClain, George A. Reents, Jason D. Garcia, Michael S. Metcalf, Thomas L. Burney, Donna C. Cioppi, Catherine L. Taylor, Heather Towne-Lindboe, Benji Schwartz, Carmen H. Perez, William R. Perrin, Karen Porter, Darrel P. Clemans, Kenneth L. Graus, Jason Matthews, Douglas S. Sanchez, Glenn D. McMahan, Todd Hoste, Daniel S. O'Toole, Tonna M. Baruso, Edd A. Saggus, Gary L. Jungclaus, Merrie Chase, Darius Arthur Sparks, David Ison, Jaqueline M. Payne, Anthony R. Hirsch, Russell T. Nunez, Paul A. Gorie, Eric M. Hughes, Kenneth W. Kramer, Lawrence Jerome Willeke, Marc Phelps, Matthew J. Kearney, Gary W. Norris, Catherine M. Ball, Jodie L. Leonard, Gary L. Sands, Gino C. Gregario, Michelle R. Goddard, Daniel R. Spencer, Dennis L. Figley, Michael R. Jernigan, Roger L. Blankenship, Mark M. Iverson, Tenille M. Sorenson, Cheryl M. Haskell, Dean S. Jacobson, Larry A. Talbot, Leann Kysar, James Brian Buchanan, Dan G. Ross, Thomas A. Sherrer, Jonathan S. Fischer, Kevin A. Heeren, Brian D. Diechl, Daniel P. Gomez, Michael L. Davis, Robert Charles Peek, Timothy M. Rames, Mikhail A. Crawford, Tracey D. Tipton, Cathy A. Paradiso, Thomas E. Larsen, Anthony L. Anderson, William L. Hayden, Gary W. Weaver, Ranell Langley, Jaydene Chan-Jones, Dale Lynn Paesche, Scott J. Schimenesky, Edward E. Krieger, James L. Bill, Willie E. Jones, Ray Andrew Ranstrom, Stacy Peterson, Marilyn Perry, Lisa Hauswirth, Castalia Simon, Warren Arnold Wallace, Brandon G. Squyres, Richard Klussendorf, Michelle R. Turner, Roger A. Lavoie, Thomas R. Parks, Sabrina L. Thompson, Kyle L. Goodroad, Melba C. Sharer, Gerald L. Ortiz, Shelly Boyce, Tammi K. Baker, William L. Price, Jamie L. McCord, Gary Lee Thompson, James C. Aragon, Charles M. Barnett, Jihad H. Farhat, Patrick L. Geiger, Vickie D. Jeffrey, Yvette Gerasimieg, Edwin A. Hunt Jr., Josephine M. Gettman, Erik L. Nelson, Cale Hartman, Dustin R. Withers, Alan L. Ulrich, Mari K. Freer, Michael Kazinski, Ben L. Little, Scott M. Slater, Cheryl L. Bolinder, Margaret Bergeson, William F. Pierce, Peter L. May, Larry D. Gurule, Janet C. Duke, Bradley S. McNew, Joseph L. Dairy, Keith J. Nance, Stephanie Embry, Eric R. Hitchcock, Rick A. Jorgensen, Gary J. Engen, Bruce E. Holloway, Mark Hansen, Karen L. Brown Geller, Fatima Ortiz Arreola, Shirley A. Futch, Delight J. Hansen, Laurence R. Joe, William P. Muncey, James K. Casey, Ruth E. Lusk, Curtis J. Austin, Timothy P. Kemper, Latonia R. Petty, Phillip A. Williams, Jr., John R. Carter, Roxanne J. Weightman, Mark A. Kimmelshue, Barbara J. Oerke-Ambos, Steven M. Wright Jr., Dennis M. Aust, Jr., Thomas M. Frankfurth, Robert Anderson, Beverly Anne Young, Adam L. Monsen, Robert Knapp, Paul D. Conrad, Earl J. Winters, Diane Schomer, Shelley J. Baker-Gard, Jeffery T. Schamber, William J. Kreibich, Vaughn Paul Dougherty, Joe E. Ward, Daniel J. Tashnick, Lane Grady, Robert J. Friend, Lawrence J. Pirtle, Forrest Cherney, Sean P. Blocher, Bradford W. Allen, Tyson Schilling, Angel L. Rivera, Robert D. Francway, Dirk Tibbets, Anthony Melilli, Kelly Squires, Edward E. Roe, Lesley A. Devine, Susan L. Grenier, Janet L. Sanchotena, Jeff Goodwin, Ronald R. Popp, Jeffrey Langley, Robert M. Jones, Robin W. Scott, Jennifer L. Johnson and Eric Lorenz
Defendant: CenturyLink Communications, LLC
Case Number: 1:2015cv00085
Filed: August 28, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Billings Office
County: GALLATIN
Presiding Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:201
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2017. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 105 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING SUPPLEMENTAL SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE #104 Joint MOTION to Reopen Case and for Approval of the Supplemental Collective Action Settlement Agreement Addendum filed by James Ellington. READ ORDER FOR SPECIFICS. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/13/2017. (AMC)
November 10, 2017 Filing 104 Joint MOTION to Reopen Case and for Approval of the Supplemental Collective Action Settlement Agreement Addendum Rowdy B. Meeks appearing for Plaintiff James Ellington (Meeks, Rowdy)
May 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 103 FINAL JUDGMENT AND ORDER APPROVING SETTLEMENT AND DISMISSING ACTION WITH PREJUDICE. Read order for details. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/23/2017. (AMC)
May 23, 2017 Filing 102 Joint MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement and Dismiss Case Rowdy B. Meeks appearing for Plaintiff James Ellington (Meeks, Rowdy)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER. The Court has been informed that this case has settled #100 . Accordingly, IT IS ORDERED that all deadlines and hearings in this case are VACATED. The parties shall file a stipulation for dismissal and submit to the undersigned a proposed order of dismissal on or before June 18, 2017, or show good cause for their failure to do so. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/18/2017. (EMH)
March 30, 2017 Filing 100 NOTICE of Settlement by Lane Grady (Meeks, Rowdy)
March 10, 2017 Filing 99 STATUS REPORT Joint by Lane Grady. (Meeks, Rowdy)
January 18, 2017 Filing 98 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consent to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consent to Sue) (Meeks, Rowdy)
November 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING MEDIATION. Granting #94 Motion to Stay. IT IS ALSO ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report with the Court ten days after the mediation in this case. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/22/2016. (AMC, )
November 22, 2016 Filing 96 MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Telephonic Status Conference held on 11/22/2016. (Law Clerk: H. Carpenter), (SLL, )
November 22, 2016 Filing 95 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11212016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
November 22, 2016 Filing 94 Joint MOTION to Stay Pending Mediation Gilbert Brosky appearing for Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Brosky, Gilbert)
November 16, 2016 Filing 93 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -11162016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
November 14, 2016 Filing 92 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11142016 Consents to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - 11142016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
November 14, 2016 Filing 91 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11112016 Consents, #2 Exhibit 2 - 11112016(2) Consents) (George, Tracey)
November 11, 2016 Filing 90 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11102016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
November 10, 2016 Filing 89 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11102016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
November 9, 2016 Filing 88 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11082016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
November 8, 2016 Filing 87 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11082016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
November 2, 2016 Filing 86 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 11012016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
November 1, 2016 Filing 85 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10312016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
October 28, 2016 Filing 84 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10272016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
October 27, 2016 Filing 83 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10262016 Consents to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10252016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
October 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 82 ORDER RESETTING THE TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE. ( Telephonic Status Conference RESET for 11/22/2016 at 02:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris.) GRANTING #81 Joint MOTION re 78 Order Setting,, Order Vacating, to Reschedule the Status Conference Until After the FLSA Opt In Period Closes filed by Lane Grady. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/26/2016. (AMC, )
October 26, 2016 Filing 81 Joint MOTION re 78 Order Setting,, Order Vacating, to Reschedule the Status Conference Until After the FLSA Opt In Period Closes Rowdy B. Meeks appearing for Plaintiff Lane Grady (Meeks, Rowdy)
October 25, 2016 Filing 80 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10242016 Consent to Join) (George, Tracey)
October 19, 2016 Filing 79 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 10172016 Consents to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10182016 Consents to Join, #3 Exhibit 3 - Fischer Consent to Join) (George, Tracey)
October 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 78 TEXT Order Re-Setting: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Telephonic Status Conference is RESET for 10/31/2016 at 03:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. The Court will contact the parties with the call-in number. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/19/2016. (SLL, )
October 14, 2016 Filing 77 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -10122016 Consents to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10132016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
October 12, 2016 Filing 76 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -10112016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
October 11, 2016 Filing 75 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -10062016 Consents to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - 10072016 Consents to Join, #3 Exhibit 3 - 10102016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
October 5, 2016 Filing 74 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -10042016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
October 3, 2016 Filing 73 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09302016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
September 30, 2016 Filing 72 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09292016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
September 29, 2016 Filing 71 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09272016 Consents, #2 Exhibit 2 - 09262016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
September 26, 2016 Filing 70 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09232016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
September 22, 2016 Filing 69 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents To Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09212016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
September 21, 2016 Filing 68 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents To Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -09202016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
September 20, 2016 Filing 67 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents To Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09162016 Consents, #2 Exhibit 2 - 09192016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
September 16, 2016 Filing 66 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consents to Sue) (Meeks, Rowdy)
September 14, 2016 Filing 65 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit FLSA Consents to Sue, #2 Exhibit FLSA Consents to Sue) (Meeks, Rowdy)
September 8, 2016 Filing 64 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-in Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09072016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
September 7, 2016 Filing 63 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 -09062016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
September 6, 2016 Filing 62 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 09012016 Consents, #2 Exhibit 2 - 09022016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
September 1, 2016 Filing 61 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 08312016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
August 31, 2016 Filing 60 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 08302016 Consents) (George, Tracey)
August 30, 2016 Filing 59 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Opt-In Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 08292016 Consents to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - 08262016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
August 26, 2016 Filing 58 NOTICE by Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 08262016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
August 25, 2016 Filing 57 NOTICE by James Ellington of Filing FLSA Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 08242016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
August 24, 2016 Filing 56 NOTICE by James Ellington, Lane Grady of Filing FLSA Consents to Join Litigation (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - 08222016 Consents to Join, #2 Exhibit 2 - 08232016 Consents to Join) (George, Tracey)
July 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER granting #39 Motion to Certify Class. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 7/28/2016. (SLL, )
July 6, 2016 Filing 54 MINUTE ENTRY for MOTION HEARING held 7/6/16 before Judge Brian Morris: William Mattix (appearing by telephone), Lauri Korneffel and Greg Mersol present and appearing on behalf of CenturyLink, Phillip McGrady (appearing by telephone), Rowdy Meeks present and appearing on behalf of Plaintiff. Motion Hearing re #39 MOTION to Certify Class as FLSA Collective Action and Send Notice filed by James Ellington, Lane Grady. Court hears argument on motion; written order forthcoming. Hearing commenced at 10:07 am and concluded at 11:31 pm. (Court Reporter Vonnie Bray.) (Law Clerk: B. McClafferty), (Hearing held in Great Falls) (MMS, )
July 6, 2016 Filing 53 SUPPLEMENT re #42 Response to Motion, by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration - Justin Metzler) (Brosky, Gilbert) Modified on 7/11/2016 to link to Motion #39 . (NOB)
July 5, 2016 Filing 52 SUPPLEMENT re #42 Response to Motion, by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declarations) (Brosky, Gilbert) Modified on 7/11/2016 to link to Motion #39 . (NOB)
June 24, 2016 Filing 51 REPLY to Response to Motion re #39 MOTION to Certify Class as FLSA Collective Action and Send Notice filed by James Ellington, Lane Grady. (George, Tracey)
June 24, 2016 Filing 50 NOTICE of Change of Address by Rowdy B. Meeks (Meeks, Rowdy)
June 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 49 IT IS ORDERED that local counsel may appear by phone at the hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for FLSA Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice (Doc. 39) scheduled for July 6, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana. The Court will contact local counsel with the call-in information. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/16/2016. (SLL, )
June 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER GRANTING #44 Joint MOTION re #43 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Motion to Reschedule Hearing filed by James Ellington, Lane Grady.The hearing set on June 29, 2016, to hear argument on Plaintiffs Motion for FLSA Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice is VACATED. The undersigned will conduct a hearing on Plaintiffs Motion for FLSA Conditional Collective Action Certification and Notice (Doc. 39) on July 6, 2016, at 10:00 a.m. at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/14/2016. (SLL, )
June 13, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting #45 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #39 MOTION to Certify Class as FLSA Collective Action and Send Notice Responses due by 6/24/2016. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/13/2016. (SLL, )
June 13, 2016 Filing 46 SUPPLEMENT re #42 Response to Motion, by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Brent Lamb) (Brosky, Gilbert) Modified on 6/15/2016 to add link. (NOB)
June 10, 2016 Filing 45 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #39 MOTION to Certify Class as FLSA Collective Action and Send Notice Tracey F. George appearing for Plaintiffs James Ellington, Lane Grady (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Extension) (George, Tracey)
June 10, 2016 Filing 44 Joint MOTION re #43 Order Setting Hearing on Motion, Motion to Reschedule Hearing Rowdy B. Meeks appearing for Plaintiffs James Ellington, Lane Grady (Meeks, Rowdy)
June 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER Setting Hearing on Motion #39 MOTION to Certify Class as FLSA Collective Action and Send Notice : Motion Hearing set for 6/29/2016 at 02:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 6/7/2016. (SLL, )
June 3, 2016 Filing 42 RESPONSE to Motion re #39 MOTION to Certify Class as FLSA Collective Action and Send Notice filed by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Randazzo Declaration, #2 Exhibit B Lamb Declaration, #3 Exhibit C Lawrey Declaration, #4 Exhibit D Metzler Declaration, #5 Exhibit E Nelson Declaration, #6 Exhibit F Osborne Declaration, #7 Exhibit G Wilson Declaration, #8 Exhibit H Sample Agreements) (Brosky, Gilbert)
May 18, 2016 Filing 41 Notice of Correction re #39 MOTION to Certify Class Action and #40 Brief/Memorandum in Support. The filing error relates to: Signature and Login Do not Match. See the attached document for a brief description of the error made. (NOB)
May 6, 2016 Filing 40 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #39 MOTION to Certify Class as FLSA Collective Action and Send Notice filed by James Ellington, Lane Grady. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Eng I Job Listings, #2 Exhibit 2 - Eng II Job Listings, #3 Exhibit 3 - Grady Declaration, #4 Exhibit 4 - Ellington Declaration, #5 Exhibit 5 - Pre-Lawsuit Job Listings, #6 Exhibit 6 - CenturyLink Org Chart, #7 Exhibit 7 - Proposed Notice, #8 Exhibit 8 - Proposed Consent, #9 Exhibit 9 - Proposed Reminder Notice) (George, Tracey)
May 6, 2016 Filing 39 MOTION to Certify Class as FLSA Collective Action and Send Notice Tracey F. George appearing for Plaintiffs James Ellington, Lane Grady (George, Tracey)
April 26, 2016 Remark: Attorney Tracey George is now a registered user and may be noticed electronically by the court. (NOB)
February 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 38 SCHEDULING ORDER:. Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/27/2016 at 01:30 PM before Judge Brian Morris. Amended Pleadings due by 3/4/2016. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/4/2016. (SLL, )
February 4, 2016 Filing 37 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Brian Morris: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference held on 2/4/2016. (Law Clerk: B. McClafferty), (SLL, )
February 4, 2016 Filing 36 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by James Ellington, Lane Grady Tracey George (McGrady, Philip)
January 25, 2016 Filing 35 Letter from Clerk of Court to notify Pro Hac Vice attorney Tracey George to register. (copy of this letter along with a copy of the order granting pro hac vice status mailed to Tracey George) (AMC, )
January 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER granting #33 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due by 2/5/2016. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/21/2016. (SLL, )
January 21, 2016 Filing 33 MOTION Tracey George to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-1715241.) Philip L. McGrady appearing for Plaintiff Lane Grady (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit of Tracey George, #2 Text of Proposed Order) (McGrady, Philip)
December 30, 2015 Filing 32 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by James Ellington, Lane Grady. (Meeks, Rowdy)
December 30, 2015 Filing 31 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL STATEMENT by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Supplement to Potential Witness List) (Brosky, Gilbert)
December 30, 2015 Filing 30 STATEMENT OF STIPULATED FACTS by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Brosky, Gilbert)
December 22, 2015 Filing 29 JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Mattix, William)
December 18, 2015 Remark: Attorney G. Brosky is now a registered user and may be noticed electronically by the court. (NOB)
December 17, 2015 Remark: Atty G. Mersol is now a registered user and may be noticed electronically by the court. (NOB)
December 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Order GRANTING #26 Unopposed MOTION to Continue to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference and to Allow Counsel to Attend by Phone filed by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. The preliminary pretrial conference set for January 6, 2016 is VACATED and RESET for Thursday, February 4, 2016 at 10:00 a.m. ALL parties shall participate by telephone. The Court will initiate the call. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/15/2015. (SLL, )
December 14, 2015 Filing 27 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #26 Unopposed MOTION to Continue to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference and to Allow Counsel to Attend by Phone filed by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Mattix, William)
December 14, 2015 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Continue to Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conference and to Allow Counsel to Attend by Phone William J. Mattix appearing for Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order re Reschedule Preliminary Pretrial Conf.) (Mattix, William)
December 10, 2015 Filing 25 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by CenturyLink Communications, LLC re #22 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #23 Letter (Gilbert Brosky) (Mattix, William)
December 10, 2015 Filing 24 NOTICE of Acknowledgment of Pro Hac Vice Order by CenturyLink Communications, LLC re #22 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, #23 Letter Gregory Mersol (Mattix, William)
December 9, 2015 Filing 23 Letter from Clerk of Court advising PHV counsel Brosky and Mersol of CM/ECF registration requirements. (Mailed to Brosky and Mersol.) (NOB)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/9/2015. (SLL, ) Modified on 12/9/2015: KH notified; order mailed to Brosky and Mersol. (NOB)
December 9, 2015 Administrative Correction re #21 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Incorrect document attached. Correct document will be refiled. (NOB)
December 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 DISREGARD FILED IN WRONG CASE. ORDER granting #18 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; granting #19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/9/2015. (SLL, ) Modified on 12/9/2015 to seal and add text. (NOB, ).
December 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Order Setting: Pretrial Conference is RESET for 1/6/2016 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/7/2015. (SLL, )
December 1, 2015 Filing 19 Unopposed MOTION Gilbert Brosky to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number MTX100012185.) William J. Mattix appearing for Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Affidavit of Gilbert Brosky) (Mattix, William) Modified on 12/9/2015 to unterm motion. (NOB)
December 1, 2015 Filing 18 Unopposed MOTION Gregory Mersol to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number MTX100012185.) William J. Mattix appearing for Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Gregory Mersol with Exhibit A) (Mattix, William) Modified on 12/9/2015 to unterm motion. (NOB)
November 24, 2015 Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer to Western District of Louisiana, Monroe Division or, in the alternate, the District of Colorado filed by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Mattix, William)
November 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER denying #8 Motion to Transfer. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/24/2015. (SLL, )
November 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 AMENDED ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference in this matter is RESET for Wednesday, January 6, 2016 at 10:30 a.m. at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/19/2015. (SLL, )
November 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Preliminary Pretrial Conference in this matter is RESET for Wednesday, January 6, 2015 at 10:30 a.m. at the Missouri River Federal Courthouse, Great Falls, Montana. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/18/2015. (SLL, )
November 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER: Preliminary Pretrial Statement due by 12/30/2015. Joint Discovery Plan due by 12/30/2015. Statement of Stipulated Facts due by 12/30/2015. Pretrial Conference set for 1/5/2016 at 01:30 PM in Great Falls, MT before Judge Brian Morris. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/16/2015. (SLL, )
November 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Brian Morris for all further proceedings. Judge Susan P. Watters no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Dana L. Christensen on 11/13/2015. (dle)
November 10, 2015 Filing 11 RESPONSE to Motion re #8 MOTION to Transfer to Western District of Louisiana, Monroe Division or, in the alternate, the District of Colorado filed by James Ellington, Lane Grady. (McGrady, Philip)
October 27, 2015 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits Exhibit B - Declaration of David Fong re: #9 Brief/Memorandum in Support, (Mattix, William) Modified on 10/28/2015 to add link to the motion(ACL, ).
October 27, 2015 Filing 9 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #8 MOTION to Transfer to Western District of Louisiana, Monroe Division or, in the alternate, the District of Colorado filed by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Monique Amundson) (Mattix, William)
October 27, 2015 Filing 8 MOTION to Transfer to Western District of Louisiana, Monroe Division or, in the alternate, the District of Colorado William J. Mattix appearing for Defendant CenturyLink Communications, LLC (Mattix, William)
October 9, 2015 Filing 7 ANSWER to #1 Complaint with Jury Demand and Demand for Trial by Jury by CenturyLink Communications, LLC. (Mattix, William)
September 18, 2015 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lane Grady, James Ellington. CenturyLink Communications, LLC served on 9/3/2015, answer due 9/24/2015. (Meeks, Rowdy)
September 4, 2015 Remark: Pro Hac Vice attorney Rowdy Meeks is now a registered user and can receive filings electronically. (ACL, )
September 3, 2015 Filing 5 Letter from Clerk to notify Pro Hac Vice attorney to register. (Copy mailed to R. Meeks) (ACL, )
September 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for atty Rowdy B. Meeks. Signed by Judge Susan P. Watters on 9/3/2015. (Copy mailed to R. Meeks, notified to add in our database) (ACL, )
September 3, 2015 Filing 3 MOTION Rowdy B. Meeks to Appear Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0977-1644276.) Philip L. McGrady appearing for Plaintiff Lane Grady (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Rowdy B. Meeks, #2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (McGrady, Philip)
August 28, 2015 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to CenturyLink Communications, LLC.(Original summons mailed to attorney P. McGrady) (CLR)
August 28, 2015 Filing fee: $ 400, receipt number 0977-1641407 (CLR)
August 28, 2015 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against CenturyLink Communications, LLC, filed by Lane Grady, James Ellington. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - FLSA Consents, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (CLR)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady et al v. CenturyLink Communications, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Derek H. Virkus
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail L. Sherrick
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alma Natalia Noot
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecilia S. Price
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew Richard Phillips
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peggy L. Abeyta
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn E. Dunbar
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kurt W. Byers
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Quezada
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammy Norton
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heidi A. Beltico
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ardis L. Arbuckle
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joy Lamar Bateman
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel C. Cannon III
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosarito P. Kniffin
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rosemary T. Swenson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther Kay Medina
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen R. Guffey
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael N. McGarr
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Ellington
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darcy Washington-Hawes
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gladys Humes
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen J. Prutzman
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janice R. Undsderfer
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Philip B. Sexton
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian K. McNiff
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Connelly
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Greenwood
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ralph Vigil
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Carter-Goolsby
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duwayne H. Schoepp
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Allen T. Groner
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon V. Jones
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven F. Rygwalski
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Ann Finch
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Marie Levine
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary G. Baker
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A. McClain
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A. Reents
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason D. Garcia
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael S. Metcalf
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas L. Burney
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna C. Cioppi
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine L. Taylor
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Towne-Lindboe
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benji Schwartz
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carmen H. Perez
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William R. Perrin
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Porter
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darrel P. Clemans
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth L. Graus
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jason Matthews
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Douglas S. Sanchez
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glenn D. McMahan
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Todd Hoste
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel S. O'Toole
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonna M. Baruso
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edd A. Saggus
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L. Jungclaus
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrie Chase
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darius Arthur Sparks
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Ison
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaqueline M. Payne
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony R. Hirsch
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Russell T. Nunez
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A. Gorie
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric M. Hughes
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth W. Kramer
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Jerome Willeke
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Phelps
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Matthew J. Kearney
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary W. Norris
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Catherine M. Ball
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jodie L. Leonard
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary L. Sands
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gino C. Gregario
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R. Goddard
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel R. Spencer
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis L. Figley
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael R. Jernigan
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger L. Blankenship
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark M. Iverson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tenille M. Sorenson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl M. Haskell
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dean S. Jacobson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry A. Talbot
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leann Kysar
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Brian Buchanan
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan G. Ross
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas A. Sherrer
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jonathan S. Fischer
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin A. Heeren
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian D. Diechl
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel P. Gomez
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael L. Davis
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Charles Peek
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy M. Rames
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mikhail A. Crawford
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracey D. Tipton
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cathy A. Paradiso
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas E. Larsen
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony L. Anderson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Hayden
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary W. Weaver
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ranell Langley
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jaydene Chan-Jones
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Lynn Paesche
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott J. Schimenesky
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward E. Krieger
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Bill
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Willie E. Jones
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Andrew Ranstrom
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stacy Peterson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marilyn Perry
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Hauswirth
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Castalia Simon
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren Arnold Wallace
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon G. Squyres
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Klussendorf
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michelle R. Turner
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger A. Lavoie
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas R. Parks
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sabrina L. Thompson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kyle L. Goodroad
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melba C. Sharer
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gerald L. Ortiz
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelly Boyce
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tammi K. Baker
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William L. Price
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie L. McCord
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary Lee Thompson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James C. Aragon
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles M. Barnett
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jihad H. Farhat
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patrick L. Geiger
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vickie D. Jeffrey
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yvette Gerasimieg
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edwin A. Hunt Jr.
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josephine M. Gettman
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erik L. Nelson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cale Hartman
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dustin R. Withers
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan L. Ulrich
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mari K. Freer
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Kazinski
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben L. Little
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Scott M. Slater
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl L. Bolinder
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Margaret Bergeson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William F. Pierce
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter L. May
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry D. Gurule
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet C. Duke
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradley S. McNew
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph L. Dairy
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Keith J. Nance
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Embry
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric R. Hitchcock
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rick A. Jorgensen
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gary J. Engen
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce E. Holloway
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Hansen
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen L. Brown Geller
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fatima Ortiz Arreola
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley A. Futch
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delight J. Hansen
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence R. Joe
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William P. Muncey
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James K. Casey
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruth E. Lusk
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis J. Austin
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy P. Kemper
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latonia R. Petty
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phillip A. Williams, Jr.
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John R. Carter
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne J. Weightman
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark A. Kimmelshue
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbara J. Oerke-Ambos
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven M. Wright Jr.
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis M. Aust, Jr.
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thomas M. Frankfurth
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Anderson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Beverly Anne Young
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adam L. Monsen
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Knapp
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul D. Conrad
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Earl J. Winters
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Schomer
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shelley J. Baker-Gard
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffery T. Schamber
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William J. Kreibich
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaughn Paul Dougherty
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joe E. Ward
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel J. Tashnick
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lane Grady
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert J. Friend
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence J. Pirtle
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Forrest Cherney
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sean P. Blocher
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bradford W. Allen
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tyson Schilling
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Angel L. Rivera
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert D. Francway
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dirk Tibbets
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Melilli
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kelly Squires
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward E. Roe
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lesley A. Devine
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan L. Grenier
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Janet L. Sanchotena
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeff Goodwin
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronald R. Popp
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jeffrey Langley
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert M. Jones
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robin W. Scott
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer L. Johnson
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eric Lorenz
Represented By: Philip L. McGrady
Represented By: Rowdy B. Meeks
Represented By: Tracey F. George
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CenturyLink Communications, LLC
Represented By: Gregory Mersol
Represented By: William J. Mattix
Represented By: Gilbert Brosky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?