Strizic v. NorthWestern Corporation et al

Plaintiff: Daniel (Dan) J. Strizic
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation and John & Jane Does 1-7
Case Number: 2:2016cv00016
Filed: April 21, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Butte Office
County: SILVER BOW
Presiding Judge: Sam E Haddon
Nature of Suit: Other Labor Litigation
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 115 ORDERED: The above-captioned action is dismissed with prejudice, each party to bear their own costs and attorneys' fees. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/27/2018. (HEG)
January 10, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 105 ORDER Plaintiff's proposed witness, Jake Traverna, MD., shall be limited in his testimony a trial to those opinions and statements expressed in his medical records, subject to any further limitations deemed appropriate by the Court. REVISED Final Pretrial Order due by 1/19/2018. Please review order for revised components. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 1/10/2018. (HEG)
November 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 90 ORDERED: 1. Pla Counts I, II, III, IV, V and VI are DISMISSED. 2. Pla Count VII remains before the Court. 3. No discovery may be introduced as evidence at trial. 4. Jessica Chastain, not identified in pretrial disclosures as ordered by the Court, may not testify at trial. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 11/17/2017. (ELL)
August 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER denying 46 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment; denying 48 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/4/2017. (ELL)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 63 ORDER granting 62 Motion to Vacate Hearing on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED. The hearing set for 8/4/17 is VACATED. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 8/3/2017. (ELL)
July 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER granting 38 Motion for Protective Order; granting 36 Motion in Limine Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 7/21/2017. (DED)
March 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER re 23 Show Cause Hearing. (SEE ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/22/2017. (ELL)
March 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDERED: 1. Pla ppt stmt amended in compliance with L.R. 16.2(b)(1) to cure the stated deficiencies shall be filed on or before 3/10/17. 2. Complete copies of all Pla expert reports shall be served upon opposing cnsl and filed on or before 3/10/17. 3. Complete copies of all of Dft's expert reports shall be served upon opposing cnsl and filed on 4/7/17. 4. Separate written disclosures of non-retained experts shall be served upon opposing cnsl and filed by Pla on or before 3/10/17, and by Dfts on or before 4/7/17. (READ ORDER FOR COMPLETE DETAILS) All other matters and deadlines in the Court's Order of 7/11/16 remain in full force and effect. Signed by Judge Sam E Haddon on 3/6/2017. (ELL)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strizic v. NorthWestern Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel (Dan) J. Strizic
Represented By: Jami Rebsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NorthWestern Corporation
Represented By: Harlan B. Krogh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John & Jane Does 1-7
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?