Smith v. Godfrey et al
Plaintiff: Benjamin Karl Smith
Defendant: Asst. Warden Powell, Warden Fletcher, Mr. Henson, D.J. Godfrey, Chaplain Delella and Mr. Madrid
Case Number: 4:2018cv00150
Filed: December 6, 2018
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: John Johnston
Referring Judge: Brian Morris
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Directing Monthly Payments be made from Prison Account of Smith. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/31/2019. Mailed to Smith and MSP (TAG)
January 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Directing Clerk to Serve defendant(s). Waiver of Service of Summons is due within 30 days of this Order; if executed, an answer or other appropriate motion is due within 60 days of this Order.( Waiver of Service due by 3/4/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge John Johnston on 1/31/2019. Mailed to Smith; documents forwarded to Chad Adams as directed (TAG)
December 19, 2018 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT/DECLARATION re #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Benjamin Karl Smith. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (TAG)
December 19, 2018 Filing 5 Statement of Undisputed Fact re: #4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Benjamin Karl Smith filed by Benjamin Karl Smith. (TAG)
December 19, 2018 Filing 4 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiff Benjamin Karl Smith. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (TAG)
December 6, 2018 Filing 3 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. Mailed to Smith with docket sheet (TAG)
December 6, 2018 Filing 2 COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Benjamin Karl Smith. (TAG) Modified on 1/31/2019: complaint deemed filed (TAG).
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Benjamin Karl Smith. Motions referred to John Johnston. (Attachments: #1 Account Statement) (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Godfrey et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Karl Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Asst. Warden Powell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden Fletcher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.J. Godfrey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chaplain Delella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Madrid
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?