Smith v. Horswell et al
Plaintiff: Terry Allen Smith
Defendant: Karen Horswell, Jim Salmonsen and Bruce Miller
Case Number: 6:2020cv00045
Filed: May 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Dana L Christensen
Referring Judge: John Johnston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner Petitions (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 29, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 Prisoner Account Statement by Terry Allen Smith (TAG)
May 11, 2020 Case Number 9:20-cv-57 transferred in from Missoula Division on 05/11/2020. (TAG)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 TRANSFER ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kathleen L. DeSoto on 5/11/2020. Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
May 4, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF CASE OPENING re #2 Complaint IFP/Prisoner. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet, #2 Letter re Acount Statement) Transmitted electronically to prison for delivery to Plaintiff. (TAG)
May 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE re Address by Terry Allen Smith (TAG)
May 4, 2020 Filing 2 LODGED COMPLAINT IFP/PRISONER (Filing fee $ 400 not paid), filed by Terry Allen Smith. (TAG)
May 4, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Terry Allen Smith. Motions referred to Kathleen L. DeSoto. (TAG)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Smith v. Horswell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen Horswell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jim Salmonsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bruce Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Allen Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?