BITTERROOT RIDGE RUNNERS SNOWMOBILE CLUB et al v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE et al
Plaintiff: BITTERROOT RIDGE RUNNERS SNOWMOBILE CLUB, RAVALLI COUNTY OFF-ROAD USER ASSOCIATION, BITTERROOT BACKCOUNTRY CYCLISTS, MONTANA TRAIL VEHICLE RIDERS ASSOCIATION, MONTANA SNOWMOBILE ASSOCIATION, CITIZENS FOR BALANCED USE and BACKCOUNTRY SLED PATRIOTS
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE, U.S. FOREST SERVICE, Northern Region, BITTERROOT NATIONAL FOREST, LEANNE MARTEN and JULIE KING
Case Number: 9:2016cv00158
Filed: December 28, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Office: Missoula Office
County: RAVALLI
Presiding Judge: Dana L. Christensen
Nature of Suit: Environmental Matters
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 8, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER granting 65 Motion for Clarification. The Court remands the Travel Plan without vacatur of the Travel Plans restrictions on mountain bike use in WSAs. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 8/8/2018. (ASG)
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 62 CLERK'S JUDGMENT. (ASG)
May 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER granting 13 Motion to Intervene. Opening brief due on September 14, 2017. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 5/9/2017. (ASG)
January 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting 4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Paul A. Turcke for BACKCOUNTRY SLED PATRIOTS, BITTERROOT BACKCOUNTRY CYCLISTS, BITTERROOT RIDGE RUNNERS SNOWMOBILE CLUB, CITIZENS FOR BALANCED USE, MONTANA SNOWMOBILE ASSOCIATION, MONTANA TRAIL VEHICLE RIDERS ASSOCIATION, RAVALLI COUNTY OFF-ROAD USER ASSOCIATION. Acknowledgment of PHV Order due within fifteen days of this Order. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/17/2017. (NOS)
January 9, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER. Signed by Judge Dana L. Christensen on 1/9/2017. (APP)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: BITTERROOT RIDGE RUNNERS SNOWMOBILE CLUB et al v. UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BITTERROOT RIDGE RUNNERS SNOWMOBILE CLUB
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAVALLI COUNTY OFF-ROAD USER ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BITTERROOT BACKCOUNTRY CYCLISTS
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTANA TRAIL VEHICLE RIDERS ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MONTANA SNOWMOBILE ASSOCIATION
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CITIZENS FOR BALANCED USE
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BACKCOUNTRY SLED PATRIOTS
Represented By: Robert T. Bell
Represented By: Paul A. Turcke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES FOREST SERVICE
Represented By: Devin T. Kenney
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. FOREST SERVICE, Northern Region
Represented By: Devin T. Kenney
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BITTERROOT NATIONAL FOREST
Represented By: Devin T. Kenney
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEANNE MARTEN
Represented By: Devin T. Kenney
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JULIE KING
Represented By: Devin T. Kenney
Represented By: John P. Tustin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?