The Depot, Inc. et al v. Caring for Montanans, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Union Club Bar, Inc., Ed Wells, Trail Head, Inc., The Depot, Inc. and Doug Hutcheon
Defendant: John Does I-X, Caring for Montanans, Inc. and Health Care Service Corporation
Case Number: 9:2019cv00113
Filed: July 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the District of Montana
Presiding Judge: Donald W Molloy
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION) filed by Health Care Service Corporation. (McCann, M. Christy)
August 23, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION) filed by The Depot, Inc., Trail Head, Inc., Union Club Bar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amended Report of MCE) (Morrison, John)
August 23, 2019 Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #12 MOTION to Remand (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION) filed by Caring for Montanans, Inc.. (Wall, Stefan)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER denying #17 Motion to Stay; denying #18 Motion to Stay. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs shall file their response to Defendants' pending motion to dismiss #4 on or before August 23, 2019. Defendants shall respond to the pending motion to remand #12 by the same date. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/20/2019. (ASG)
August 19, 2019 Filing 18 Amended MOTION to Stay re #12 MOTION to Remand , #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION) John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiffs The Depot, Inc., Trail Head, Inc., Union Club Bar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) (Morrison, John)
August 16, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Stay John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiffs The Depot, Inc., Trail Head, Inc., Union Club Bar, Inc. (Morrison, John)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER granting #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #12 MOTION to Remand . Responses due by 8/23/2019. Motions ripe 8/23/2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/13/2019. (dle)
August 12, 2019 Filing 15 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #12 MOTION to Remand (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION) Stefan T. Wall appearing for Defendant Caring for Montanans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Wall, Stefan)
August 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that the claims of Plaintiffs Ed Wells and Doug Hutcheon, on their own behalf and on behalf of those similarly situated, are DISMISSED. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 8/6/2019. (NOS)
August 2, 2019 Filing 13 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #12 MOTION to Remand filed by The Depot, Inc., Trail Head, Inc., Union Club Bar, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Doc 66 Plaintiffs' Supplemental Brief) (Morrison, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 12 MOTION to Remand John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiffs The Depot, Inc., Trail Head, Inc., Union Club Bar, Inc. (Morrison, John)
August 2, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Doug Hutcheon, Ed Wells (Morrison, John)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION). Responses due by 8/14/2019. Signed by Judge Donald W. Molloy on 7/24/2019. (NOS)
July 22, 2019 Filing 9 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION) John M. Morrison appearing for Plaintiffs The Depot, Inc., Trail Head, Inc., Union Club Bar, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Order) (Morrison, John)
July 11, 2019 Filing 8 STATE COURT AMENDED COMPLAINT against Caring for Montanans, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, and John Does I-X filed by The Depot, Inc., Union Club Bar, Inc., Trail Head, Inc., Ed Wells, and Doug Hutcheon. (NOS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 7 STATE COURT COMPLAINT against Caring for Montanans, Inc., Health Care Service Corporation, and John Does I-X filed by The Depot, Inc., Union Club Bar, Inc., Trail Head, Inc., Ed Wells, and Doug Hutcheon. (NOS)
July 11, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Receipt of State Court File from Missoula County District Court. (Attachments: #1 3 - Amended Summons Issued - Caring for Montanans, #2 4 - Amended Summons Issued - Health Care Service Corp, #3 5 - Affidavit of Service) (NOS)
July 10, 2019 Filing 5 Brief/Memorandum in Support re #4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION) filed by Caring for Montanans, Inc.. (Wall, Stefan)
July 10, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (COMBINED WITH HEALTH CARE SERVICE CORPORATION) Stefan T. Wall appearing for Defendant Caring for Montanans, Inc. (Wall, Stefan)
July 8, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Health Care Service Corporation. (McCann, M. Christy)
July 3, 2019 Filing 2 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Caring for Montanans, Inc. (NOS)
July 3, 2019 Filing fee of $400 paid; receipt number 0977-2333462. (NOS)
July 3, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Montana Fourth Judicial District Court, Missoula County, case number DV-16-521, filed by Health Care Service Corporation and Caring for Montanans, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - CFMs Am. Summons & Am. Compl., #2 Exhibit B - HCSCs Am. Summons & Am. Compl., #3 Exhibit C - 07/02/19 Decl. of Sharon Langdorf, #4 Exhibit 1 - Depot Employer Application (1 of 3), #5 Exhibit 1-1 - Depot Employer Application (2 of 3), #6 Exhibit 1-2 - Depot Employer Application (3 of 3), #7 Exhibit 2 - Trail Head Employer Election, #8 Exhibit D - Rutledge Complaint, #9 Exhibit E - Depot Member Guide (1 of 3), #10 Exhibit E-1 - Depot Member Guide (2 of 3), #11 Exhibit E-2 - Depot Member Guide (3 of 3), #12 Exhibit F - Trail Head Member Guide (1 of 3), #13 Exhibit f-1 - Trail Head Member Guide (2 of 3), #14 Exhibit F-2 - Trail Head Member Guide (3 of 3), #15 Exhibit G - Union Club Bar Member Guide (1 of 3), #16 Exhibit G-1 - Union Club Bar Member Guide (2 of 3), #17 Exhibit G-2 - Union Club Bar Member Guide (3 of 3), #18 Exhibit H - 11/04/19 MCC to Trail Head letter, #19 Civil Cover Sheet) (NOS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Montana District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Depot, Inc. et al v. Caring for Montanans, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does I-X
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caring for Montanans, Inc.
Represented By: Stefan T. Wall
Represented By: Michael D. McLean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Health Care Service Corporation
Represented By: Kimberly A. Beatty
Represented By: Stanley T. Kaleczyc
Represented By: M. Christy S. McCann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Union Club Bar, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Linda M. Deola
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Wells
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Linda M. Deola
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Trail Head, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Linda M. Deola
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Depot, Inc.
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Linda M. Deola
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Hutcheon
Represented By: John C. Heenan
Represented By: Linda M. Deola
Represented By: John M. Morrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?