Ramos et al v. Alchemee, LLC
Plaintiff: Ramos, Efren Ramos, Joshua Cross and Marisol Scharon
Defendant: Alchemee, LLC
Case Number: CAN/5:24-CV-02230
Filed: April 15, 2024
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Beth Labson Freeman
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 7, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 7, 2024 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 1 in MDL No. 3120), ( 2 in MDL No. 3120) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries Ltd., Corporate Parent Proactiv Company Holdings, Inc. for Alchemee, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions , #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3120, CAC/2:24-cv-01834, CAN/5:24-cv-01918, CAN/5:24-cv-02230, ILN/1:24-cv-02755, MOW/4:24-cv-00195, NYS/7:24-cv-02718 (Boehm, Paul) Modified on 6/10/2024 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME. DELTED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT NAME
June 7, 2024 Filing 4 ***TEXT ONLY ENTRY***MINUTE ORDER (re: pldg. ( #15 in MDL No. 3120) ) -- Motion of: Defendants Wal-Mart Stores, Inc., et al. for Extension of Time to Respo nd to Motion -- GRANTED TO ALL PARTIES IN PART. Responses due on or before 6/21/2024. Reply, if any, due on or before 6/28/2024. No further extensions will be granted absent extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 6/7/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3120, CAC/2:24-cv-01834, CAC/2:24-cv-01876, CAC/2:24-cv-01878, CAC/2:24-cv-01895, CAC/8:24-cv-00573, CAE/1:24-cv-00280, CAE/1:24-cv-00288, CAE/1:24-cv-00289, CAE/1:24-cv-00290, CAN/3:24-cv-01448, CAN/3:24-cv-02066, CAN/5:24-cv-01918, CAN/5:24-cv-02230, HI/1:24-cv-00110, ILN/1:24-cv-02173, ILN/1:24-cv-02193, ILN/1:24-cv-02755, ILN/1:24-cv-02762, ILN/1:24-cv-02763, ILN/1:24-cv-03138, LAE/2:24-cv-00663, MN/0:24-cv-01323, MOW/3:24-cv-05019, MOW/4:24-cv-00195, MOW/4:24-cv-00211, MOW/6:24-cv-03077, NYS/1:24-cv-01974, NYS/1:24-cv-02735, NYS/7:24-cv-02718, SC/4:24-cv-01656 (DLD)
June 5, 2024 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE re: pldg.( 2 in MDL No. 3120), ( 1 in MDL No. 3120) Filed by Paul Boehm on behalf of Defendants Alchemee, LLC, Taro Pharmaceuticals U.S.A., Inc., Taro Pharmaceuticals Industries, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit List of Parties Represented, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 3120, CAC/2:24-cv-01834, CAN/5:24-cv-01918, CAN/5:24-cv-02230, ILN/1:24-cv-02755, MOW/4:24-cv-00195, NYS/7:24-cv-02718 (Boehm, Paul) Modified on 6/6/2024 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES Modified on 6/10/2024 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT NAMES
May 24, 2024 Filing 2 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( #1 in MDL No. 3120) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS:< br< Notices of Appearance due on or before 6/7/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 6/7/2024. Responses due on or before 6/14/2024. Reply, if any, due on or before 6/21/2024. In their briefs, the parties should address what steps they have taken to pursue alternatives to centralization (including, but not limited to, engaging in informal coordination of discovery and scheduling, and seeking Section 1404 transfer of one or more of the subject cases). #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines < Forms page of our website for additional information.Attorneys must be registered to file in the JPML. Please visit our website for #Registration Information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel Tiffaney D. Pete on 5/24/2024. Associated Cases: MDL No. 3120, CAC/2:24-cv-01834, CAC/2:24-cv-01876, CAC/2:24-cv-01878, CAC/2:24-cv-01895, CAC/8:24-cv-00573, CAE/1:24-cv-00280, CAE/1:24-cv-00288, CAE/1:24-cv-00289, CAE/1:24-cv-00290, CAN/3:24-cv-01448, CAN/3:24-cv-02066, CAN/5:24-cv-01918, CAN/5:24-cv-02230, HI/1:24-cv-00110, ILN/1:24-cv-02173, ILN/1:24-cv-02193, ILN/1:24-cv-02755, ILN/1:24-cv-02762, ILN/1:24-cv-02763, ILN/1:24-cv-03138, LAE/2:24-cv-00663, MN/0:24-cv-01323, MOW/3:24-cv-05019, MOW/4:24-cv-00195, MOW/4:24-cv-00211, MOW/6:24-cv-03077, NYS/1:24-cv-01974, NYS/1:24-cv-02735, NYS/7:24-cv-02718, SC/4:24-cv-01656 (SM)
May 24, 2024 Filing 1 MDL Number 3120 Assigned -- MOTION FOR TRANSFER ACCEPTED FOR FILING re: pldg. ( #1 in Pending No. 42) Associated Cases: Pending No. 42, CAC/2:24-cv-01834, CAC/2:24-cv-01876, CAC/2:24- cv-01878, CAC/2:24-cv-01895, CAC/8:24-cv-00573, CAE/1:24-cv-00280, CAE/1:24-cv-00288, CAE/1:24-cv-00289, CAE/1:24-cv-00290, CAN/3:24-cv-01448, CAN/3:24-cv-02066, CAN/5:24-cv-01918, CAN/5:24-cv-02230, HI/1:24-cv-00110, ILN/1:24-cv-02173, ILN/1:24-cv-02193, ILN/1:24-cv-02755, ILN/1:24-cv-02762, ILN/1:24-cv-02763, ILN/1:24-cv-03138, LAE/2:24-cv-00663, MN/0:24-cv-01323, MOW/3:24-cv-05019, MOW/4:24-cv-00195, MOW/4:24-cv-00211, MOW/6:24-cv-03077, NYS/1:24-cv-01974, NYS/1:24-cv-02735, NYS/7:24-cv-02718, SC/4:24-cv-01656 (SM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos et al v. Alchemee, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Efren Ramos
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Stephanie Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Cross
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Stephanie Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marisol Scharon
Represented By: Robert Brent Wisner
Represented By: Stephanie Sherman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alchemee, LLC
Represented By: Paul Boehm
Represented By: David S. Kurtzer-Ellenbogen
Represented By: Ingrid Kristin Campagne
Represented By: Jessica Bodger Rydstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?