Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc. et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc, Baptist Memorial Hospital Booneville, Inc., Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., South Sunflower County Hospital, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc., Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc., Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc., Quitman County Hospital, LLC and Baptist Medical Center-Attala, LLC
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., H.D. Smith, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Mallinckrodt, LLC, Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc., Allergan, PLC, Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Abbott Laboratories, Specgx, LLC, Abbvie, Inc., Impax Laboratories, LLC, Anda, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Indiana, LLC, Smith Drug Company, Allergan PLC, Rite Aid Corporation, Assertio Therapeutics, Inc., Cardinal Health, Inc., Kroger Limited Partnership I, Actavis, LLC, Henry Schein, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc., Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc., Walgreen Co., Cephalon, Inc., Tasmanian Alkaloids PTY, LTD, Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC, Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Practice Fusion, Inc., Actavis Kadian, LLC, Johnson & Johnson, Does 1-100, H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, KVK-Tech, Inc., Watson Pharma, Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Noramco, Inc., Abbott Laboratories, Inc., Actavis Totowa, LLC., Allergan Finance, LLC, Mallinckrodt, PLC, Kroger Limited Partnership II, Walmart, Inc., Don Waldron's Mr. Discount Drugstore, Inc., No 1, Allergan USA, Inc., Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc., The Kroger Co. and Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Case Number: MSS/3:20-CV-00433
Filed: June 29, 2020
Court: Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation
Presiding Judge: Daniel P Jordan
Nature of Suit: Other
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2020 Filing 52 Joint RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE CTO (re: pldg. ( 8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( 8176 in MDL No. 2804, 13 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) ) (CTO-164) Filed by Defendants Mallinckrodt, LLC, #et al.Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Kadian, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Allergan Finance, LLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc., Specgx, LLC, Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. #[Suppress List] Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 8/24/2020 (SM). EDITED EVENT TYPE
August 21, 2020 Filing 51 Joint RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO VACATE CTO (re: pldg. ( 8167 in mdl 2804)( 8176 in MDL No. 2804)(15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), (13 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) ) (CTO-164) Filed by Defendants AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation, #et al.Cardinal Health, Inc., The, McKesson Corp. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 8/24/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINKS. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
August 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 50 HEARING ORDER re: pldg. (40 in ALN/2:20-cv-00848, #8025 in MDL No. 2804), (38 in CAC/8:20-cv-01202, #8286 in MDL No. 2804), (18 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8236 in MDL No. 2804), (5 in ILN/1:20-cv-04111, #8236 in MDL No. 2804), ( #7833 in MDL No. 2804, 11 in OKW/5:20-cv-00456), ( #8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( #7956 in MDL No. 2804, 30 in NYE/2:20-cv-02431), ( #8176 in MDL No. 2804, 13 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200), ( #7977 in MDL No. 2804, 6 in OKE/6:20-cv-00172), ( #7918 in MDL No. 2804, 20 in OKE/6:20-cv-00156, 20 in OKE/6:20-cv-00160) in the following opposition(s) of Plaintiffs 10 Actions - ALN-1, CAC-1, ILN-1, MSS-1, NYE-1, OKE-4, OKW-1 - SECTION B (DESIGNATED FOR CONSIDERATION WITHOUT ORAL ARGUMENT) PANEL HEARING set for 9/24/2020 in Washington, DC.Signed by Judge Karen K. Caldwell, Chair, PANEL ON MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION, on 8/18/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, ALN/2:20-cv-00848, CAC/8:20-cv-01202, ILN/1:20-cv-04111, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, NYE/2:20-cv-02431, OKE/6:20-cv-00156, OKE/6:20-cv-00160, OKE/6:20-cv-00172, OKE/6:20-cv-00200, OKW/5:20-cv-00456 (RH)
July 31, 2020 Filing 49 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( #8176 in MDL No. 2804, 13 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200), ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( #8049 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., H.D. Smith, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Padgett, William)
July 31, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( #7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) Filed by William Edward Padgett on behalf of Defendants H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co., H.D. Smith, LLC (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Padgett, William)
July 31, 2020 Filing 47 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 31, 2020 Filing 46 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc. for Walgreen Co.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 31, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( #7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) Filed by Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr on behalf of Defendants Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc., #et al.Walgreen Co., Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Stoffelmayr, Kaspar)
July 31, 2020 Filing 44 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8044 in MDL No. 2804) (4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), (15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Specgx, LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 31, 2020 Filing 43 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804) ( 8049 in MDL No. 2804)(4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), (15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), (13 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200), (4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Mallinckrodt, PLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
July 31, 2020 Filing 42 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL NO. 2804) ( 8049 in MDL No. 2804)(4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), (15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), (13 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200), (4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Mallinckrodt PLC for Mallinckrodt, LLC. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
July 31, 2020 Filing 41 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd. for Actavis Elizabeth LLC, Actavis Kadian, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Service List) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Reed, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( #7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Steven A. Reed on behalf of Defendants Actavis Elizabeth LLC, #et al.Actavis Kadian, LLC, Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC, Actavis Pharma, Inc., Actavis South Atlantic LLC, Actavis Totowa, LLC., Actavis, LLC, Cephalon, Inc., Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Warner Chilcott Company, LLC, Watson Laboratories, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Other List of Defendants, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Service List) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Reed, Steven)
July 31, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( 7992 in MDL No. 2804) (1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) Filed by Brien T. O'Connor on behalf of Defendants Mallinckrodt, LLC, #et al.Mallinckrodt, Specgx, LLC #[Suppress List] Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (O'Connor, Brien) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
July 31, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( 7992 in MDL No. 2804) (1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) Filed by Robert Arthur Nicholas on behalf of Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Nicholas, Robert) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK
July 31, 2020 Filing 37 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( 8049 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Johnson & Johnson. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
July 31, 2020 Filing 36 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804)( 8049 in MDL No. 2804)(4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), (4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Amerisourcebergen Services Corporation, Corporate Parent AmerisourceBergen Corporation for AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Nicholas, Robert) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINKS. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
July 31, 2020 Filing 35 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( 8049 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Johnson & Johnson for Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
July 31, 2020 Filing 34 DUPLICATE PLEADING. SEE PLEADING 8194 IN MDL No. 2804 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( 7992 in MDL No. 2804) (1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) Filed by Robert Arthur Nicholas on behalf of Defendant AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Nicholas, Robert) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME. ADDED NOTATION
July 31, 2020 Filing 33 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan USA, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Welch, Donna)
July 31, 2020 Filing 32 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Sales, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Welch, Donna)
July 31, 2020 Filing 31 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( 7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) Filed by Charles Coleman Lifland on behalf of Defendants Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc., #et al.Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Lifland, Charles) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
July 31, 2020 Filing 30 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( 8176 in MDL No. 2804, 13 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200), ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( 8049 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Endo International plc for Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Stern, Jonathan) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
July 31, 2020 Filing 29 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan PLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Welch, Donna)
July 31, 2020 Filing 28 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent AbbVie Inc. for Allergan Finance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Welch, Donna)
July 31, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( 7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) Filed by Jonathan L. Stern on behalf of Defendants Endo Health Solutions, Inc., #et al.Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Par Pharmaceutical, Inc., Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Stern, Jonathan) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM). DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAMES
July 31, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( #7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Donna Marie Welch on behalf of Defendants Allergan Finance, LLC, #et al.Allergan PLC, Allergan Sales, LLC, Allergan USA, Inc., Allergan USA, Inc. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Welch, Donna)
July 31, 2020 Filing 25 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804) (15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Quitman County Hospital, LLC, South Sunflower County Hospital. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Barrett, John (Don)) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK
July 31, 2020 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8044 in MDL No. 2804) (15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Baptist Memorial Health Care Corporation for Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc., Baptist Medical Center-Attala, LLC, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital Booneville, Inc., Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Barrett, John (Don)) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 31, 2020 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804)( 8049 in MDL No. 2804) (4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), (4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Cardinal Health, Inc.; Corporate Parent Generic Drug Holdings, Inc. for Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The. (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINKS. DELTED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
July 31, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg.( 7992 in MDL No. 2804) (1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) Filed by Enu Mainigi on behalf of Defendants Cardinal Health, Inc., #et al.Harvard Drug Group, LLC, The, #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Schedule of Actions, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (Mainigi, Enu) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK. DELETED DUPLICATE PARTY NAME
July 31, 2020 Filing 21 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL NO. 2804) ( 8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent Abbott Laboratories for Abbott Laboratories, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (McCauley, John) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 31, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804)( 8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Abbott Laboratories. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (McCauley, John) Modified on 8/3/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 31, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( #7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by John A. McCauley on behalf of Defendants Abbott Laboratories, Abbott Laboratories, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (McCauley, John)
July 31, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent WSE Investment LLC, Corporate Parent Wal-Mart Stores East, LLC, Corporate Parent WSE Management, LLC, Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Wal-Mart Stores East, LP. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Lovrien, Christopher)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( #8167 in MDL No. 2804, 15 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Walmart, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Lovrien, Christopher)
July 31, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( #7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Christopher J Lovrien on behalf of Defendants Wal-Mart Stores East, LP, Walmart, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Lovrien, Christopher)
July 31, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION TO VACATE CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER WITH BRIEF IN SUPPORT (CTO-164) re: pldg. (4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Plaintiffs Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc., #et al.Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc., Baptist Medical Center-Attala, LLC, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital Booneville, Inc., Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc., Quitman County Hospital, LLC, South Sunflower County Hospital #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Brief, #2 Schedule of Actions, #3 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Barrett, John (Don))
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804)(4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. (OH) for Kroger Limited Partnership II. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Harvey, Ronda) Modified on 7/31/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 30, 2020 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg.( 8044 in MDL No. 2804) (4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent The Kroger Co. (OH) for Kroger Limited Partnership I. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Harvey, Ronda) Modified on 7/31/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 30, 2020 Filing 12 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL NO. 2804)(4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for The Kroger Co.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Harvey, Ronda) Modified on 7/31/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 30, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( #7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Ronda L. Harvey on behalf of Defendants Kroger Limited Partnership I, #et al.Kroger Limited Partnership II, The Kroger Co. #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Harvey, Ronda)
July 24, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg.( 8061 in MDL No. 2804) (8 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Defendant Don Waldron's Mr. Discount Drugstore, Inc., No 1 -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Ready, William) Modified on 7/24/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( 8058 in MDL No. 2804)(7 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Defendant Don Waldron's Mr. Discount Drugstore, Inc., No 1 -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Ready, William) Modified on 7/24/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 20, 2020 Filing 8 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804)(4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) -- Identifying Corporate Parent No Parent Corp. for Don Waldron's Mr. Discount Drugstore, Inc., No 1. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Ready, William) Modified on 7/22/2020 (SM). ADDED MDL LINK
July 20, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg.( 7992 in MDL No. 2894) (1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by William E. Ready, Jr on behalf of Defendant Don Waldron's Mr. Discount Drugstore, Inc., No 1 (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Ready, William) Modified on 7/22/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK Modified on 7/24/2020 (SM).DELETED DUPLICATE ATTACHMENT NAME
July 17, 2020 Filing 6 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF MULTIPLE FILED OPPOSITIONS TO CTO-164 AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: pldg. ( 8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( 8049 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Notices of Appearance due on or before 7/31/2020. Corporate Disclosure Statements due on or before 7/31/2020. Motion to Vacate with Brief in Support due on or before 7/31/2020. Consolidated Responses due on or before 8/21/2020. Reply, if any, due on or before 8/28/2020. #Appearance forms (JPML form 18) and #Corporate Disclosure forms can be downloaded from our website. Important: A Corporate Disclosure Form, if required, must be filed, even if one has previously been filed in this MDL.Please visit the #CM/ECF Filing Guidelines & Forms page of our website for additional information.Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/17/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200 (CMD) Modified on 7/22/2020 (CMD).
July 17, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE (AMENDED) re: pldg. ( #8043 in MDL No. 2804, 3 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433), ( #8044 in MDL No. 2804, 4 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Plaintiffs Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc., #et al.Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc., Baptist Medical Center-Attala, LLC, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital Booneville, Inc., Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc., Quitman County Hospital, LLC, South Sunflower County Hospital #[Suppress List] -- Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Barrett, John (Don))
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-164) - 1 action(s) - re: pldg.( 7992 in MDL No. 2804) (1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by Plaintiffs Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc., #et al.Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc., Baptist Medical Center-Attala, LLC, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital Booneville, Inc., Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc., Quitman County Hospital, LLC, South Sunflower County Hospital #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Barrett, John (Don)) Modified on 7/16/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FOR CTO-164 re: pldg. ( 7992 in MDL No. 2804) (1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433) Filed by John (Don) W. Barrett on behalf of Plaintiffs Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc., #et al.Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc., Baptist Medical Center-Attala, LLC, Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc., Baptist Memorial Hospital Booneville, Inc., Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc., Quitman County Hospital, LLC, South Sunflower County Hospital #[Suppress List] (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - List of Plaintiffs, #2 Proof of Service) Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, MSS/3:20-cv-00433 (Barrett, John (Don)) Modified on 7/16/2020 (SM).ADDED MDL LINK
July 9, 2020 Filing 2 ***TEXT ONLY NOTICE***NOTICE OF FILING OF CTO AND PUBLICATION OF BRIEFING SCHEDULE (CTO-164) re: pldg. (1 in AZ/3:20-cv-08149, 1 in LAE/2:20-cv-01782, #7992 in MDL No. 2804, 1 in MSS/3:20-cv-00433, 2 in OKE/6:20-cv-00200, 1 in PR/3:20-cv-01290, 1 in PR/3:20-cv-01291) BRIEFING SCHEDULE IS SET AS FOLLOWS: Oppositions due on or before 7/16/2020. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/9/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, AZ/3:20-cv-08149, LAE/2:20-cv-01782, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200, PR/3:20-cv-01290, PR/3:20-cv-01291 (SM)
July 9, 2020 Filing 1 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER FILED TODAY (CTO-164) - 6 action(s) Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 7/9/2020. Associated Cases: MDL No. 2804, AZ/3:20-cv-08149, LAE/2:20-cv-01782, MSS/3:20-cv-00433, OKE/6:20-cv-00200, PR/3:20-cv-01290, PR/3:20-cv-01291 (SM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc. et al v. Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital Booneville, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Medical Center - Leake, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Union County, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - North Mississippi, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Golden Triangle, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: South Sunflower County Hospital
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Memorial Hospital - Calhoun, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mississippi Baptist Medical Center Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Medical Center - Yazoo, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Quitman County Hospital, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baptist Medical Center-Attala, LLC
Represented By: Sarah Sterling Starns
Represented By: David McMullan, Jr.
Represented By: Richard Runft Barrett
Represented By: John (Don) W. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, LLC
Represented By: Brian Stephen Spitler
Represented By: William P Symmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Kasey M. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith, LLC
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Dean T. Barnhard
Represented By: William Edward Padgett
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceutica, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Kasey M. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, LLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel D. Gregory
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Eastern Co., Inc.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan, PLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Elizabeth LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Sales, LLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories
Represented By: Alper T Ertas
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specgx, LLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbvie, Inc.
Represented By: John Laurens Wilkes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Impax Laboratories, LLC
Represented By: Brian Stephen Spitler
Represented By: William P Symmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anda, Inc.
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Represented By: James W. Matthews
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis South Atlantic LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation
Represented By: Robert Arthur Nicholas
Represented By: Edderek Linnel Cole
Represented By: Thomas W Tardy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Samuel D. Gregory
Represented By: J. Carter Thompson, Jr.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Indiana, LLC
Represented By: Eric Delinsky
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smith Drug Company
Represented By: Michael Garner Berry
Represented By: JAMES H. ELLIOTT, JR.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan PLC
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rite Aid Corporation
Represented By: Elisa P. McEnroe
Represented By: Stephanie M. Rippee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Assertio Therapeutics, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin Marshall Sadler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cardinal Health, Inc.
Represented By: Enu Mainigi
Represented By: Wilton V. Byars, III
Represented By: Joseph Miles Forks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership I
Represented By: Quentin Andrew Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Alexander
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Represented By: Brandon I. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Henry Schein, Inc.
Represented By: Brandan Montminy - PHV
Represented By: Leah Nichols Ledford
Represented By: John P. McDonald
Represented By: John P. McDonald - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Represented By: Allscripts Healthcare Solutions, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: Kaspar J. Stoffelmayr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cephalon, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tasmanian Alkaloids PTY, LTD
Represented By: Tasmanian Alkaloids PTY. LDC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals of New York, LLC
Represented By: Brian Stephen Spitler
Represented By: William P Symmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Mid Atlantic, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Practice Fusion, Inc.
Represented By: Lana Alcorn Olson
Represented By: Jackson E. Knouse - PHV
Represented By: Practice Fusion, Inc.
Represented By: Lee M. Hollis - PHV
Represented By: Jackson R. Sharman, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Kadian, LLC
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Kasey M. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
Represented By: J. Patrick Strubel
Represented By: Dean T. Barnhard
Represented By: William Edward Padgett
Represented By: Corey D. Hinshaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceutical Industries, LTD
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Simon T. Bailey
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Chad R. Hutchinson
Represented By: Charles Coleman Lifland
Represented By: Kasey M. Adams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Represented By: Eric Delinsky
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KVK-Tech, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Biggs, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Pharma, Inc.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Eric Delinsky
Represented By: J. Cal Mayo, Jr.
Represented By: Sarah Katherine Embry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Noramco, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Jarcho
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Abbott Laboratories, Inc.
Represented By: Alper T Ertas
Represented By: John A. McCauley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Totowa, LLC.
Represented By: Steven A. Reed
Represented By: Stephen Lee Thomas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan Finance, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer G. Levy - PHV
Represented By: Fred Krutz, III
Represented By: Donna Welch - PHV
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Represented By: Timothy W. Knapp - PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mallinckrodt, PLC
Represented By: Brien T. O'Connor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kroger Limited Partnership II
Represented By: Quentin Andrew Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Alexander
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Represented By: Brandon I. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher J Lovrien
Represented By: James Russell Wooley
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M Louis
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Don Waldron's Mr. Discount Drugstore, Inc., No 1
Represented By: Don Waldron's Mr. Discount Drugstore, Inc., N
Represented By: William E. Ready, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allergan USA, Inc.
Represented By: Donna Marie Welch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wal-Mart Stores East, LP
Represented By: Christopher J Lovrien
Represented By: James Russell Wooley
Represented By: Kenna L. Mansfield, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas M Louis
Represented By: Dorissa S. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amneal Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Brian Stephen Spitler
Represented By: William P Symmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kroger Co.
Represented By: Quentin Andrew Daniels
Represented By: Amanda Alexander
Represented By: Ronda L. Harvey
Represented By: Brandon I. Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Par Pharmaceuticals Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan L. Stern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?