In Re: Western States Wholesale Natural Gas Antitrust Litigation (MDL 1566)
Plaintiff: A.L. Gilbert Company, Abelman Art Glass, Abelman Art Glass Company, et al, Arandell Corp., Auila, Inc., BBD Acquisition Co., Mark Benscheidt, Susan Benscheidt, Bing's Stop & Shop, Breckenridge Brewery of Colorado, LLC, David C. Brown, California, People of the State of, Coachella Valley Taxi Owners Association, Frank H. Colvett, Jr., Cross Oil Refining & Marketing, Inc., Ever-Bloom, Inc., Fairhaven Power Co., Fairhaven Power Company, H&M Roses, Heartland Regional Medical Center, Dennis J. Herrera, JP Morgan Trust Company, NA, Ladish Co., Inc., Learjet, Inc., Samuel D. Leggett, Lois the Pie Queen, Los Angeles, City Of, Celina Martinez, Maximum Nursery, Inc., Merrick's Inc., Missouri Public Service Commission, Multiut Corporation, NewPage Wisconsin System Inc., Northwest Missouri State University, Oberti Wholesale Foods, Inc., Dan L. Older, Craig Podesta, Prime Tanning Corporation, Reorganized FLI, Inc., Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc., San Diego, County of, San Francisco, City of, San Francisco, County of, Santa Clara, County of, Sargento Foods, Inc., Shanghai 1930 Restaurant Partners, LP, Haleema Silverman, Michael Silverman, Sinclair Oil Corporation, Lynette Stevenson, Tom Stevenson, Team Design, Texas-Ohio Energy, Inc., Topeka Unified School District 501, Utility Savings & Refund Services, LLP, Laurence Uyeda, Vittice Corporation and Wolfe River Cafe
Defendant: AEP Energy Services, Inc., American Electric Power Company, Inc., Aquila Merchant Services, Inc., Aquila, Inc., Brian Bates, CMS Energy, CMS Energy Corporation, CMS Energy Resource Management Company, CMS Energy Resources, CMS Energy Resources Management Company, CMS Enterprises Group, Inc., CMS Field Services, CMS Marketing Services & Trading Company, CMS Marketing, Service & Trading Company, Cantera Gas Company, Cantera Natural Gas, Inc., Cantera Resources, Inc., Center Point Energy, Inc., Centerpoint Energy Inc., Centerpoint Energy Services, Inc., Coral Energy Resources, LP, DMT G.Pg. LLC, Duke Energy, Duke Energy & Marketing, LLC, Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC, Duke Energy Corporation, Duke Energy Field Services, Inc., Duke Energy North America, LLC, Duke Energy Trading & Marketing, LLC, Duke Energy Trading and Marketing, L.L.C., Dynegy GP Inc DMT Holding, LP, Dynegy GP Inc., Dynegy Holding Co., Inc., Dynegy Illinois Inc., Dynegy Inc., Dynegy Inc. Holding Company, Dynegy Marketing & Trade, Dynegy Power Marketing, Inc., E Prime Inc, EPNG Mojave, Inc., El Paso Corporation, El Paso Marketing LP, El Paso Marketing, LP, El Paso Merchant, El Paso Merchant Energy Company, El Paso Merchant Energy Holding Co., El Paso Merchant Energy LP, El Paso Merchant Energy, L.P., El Paso Merchant Energy-Gas LP, El Paso Mojave Pipeline Co., El Paso Natural Gas Company, El Paso Pipeline, El Paso Tennesse Pipeline Company, Encana Corporation, Encana Energy Services, Inc., Kansas Gas Marketing Company, Mojave Pipeline Company, Mojave Pipeline Operating Company, Northern States Power Company, OneOK Energy Services Company, L.P., Oneok Energy Marketing & Trading Company, LP, Oneok, Inc., RRI Energy Services, Inc., Reliant Energy Services, Reliant Energy, Inc., Reliant Resources, Inc, San Diego Gas & Electric, Sempra Energy, Sempra Energy Corp., Sempra Energy Trading Corp., Southern California Gas Company, WD Energy Services, Inc., West Coast Power LLC, Western Gas Resources, Inc., Williams Companies, Inc., Williams Energy Marketing & Trading Company, Williams Energy Services Company, Williams Merchant Services Company, Inc., Williams Power, Xcel Energy Inc., Kathleen M. Zanaboni and e prime Inc.
Unknown: Roger M. Schrimp, Gene J. Stonebarger, Clinton P. Walker, Jonathon Abram, William H. Johnson, Michael J. Boni, Marc H. Edelson, Nathan Reinmiller, Joshua D Snyder, Sylvie K. Kern, Jared M. Katz, Josef D. Cooper, Craig C. Corbitt, Athena Jiangxioa Hou, Tracy R. Kirkham, Christopher T. Micheletti, Francis O. Scarpulla, Judith A. Shimm, John S. Wilder, Sr., A. J. De Bartolomeo, Daniel C. Girard, Gordon M. Fauth, Jr., David Gordon, Frederic G. Berner, Jr., Heather R. Skinazi, Joseph W. Cotchett, Mark E. Haddad, Walter L McInnis, Elizabeth S Parker, Mark A. James, Meg Vergeront, Brian E. Butler, Matthew E. Digby, Stephen R. Mick, William D. Taylor, Brian I Cheng, Karen C Corallo, Reginald D. Steer, D. Neal Tomlinson, Patrick D. Martin, Clifford Joe Cavitt, Marie A. Stanton, Lisa M.R. Miller, Scott Phillip DeVries, Katrina June Lee, Michael J. Modl, Steven M. Streck, John S. Golwen, Shea Sisk Wellford, Steven M. Kaufmann, Stuart Plunkett, Diane E. Pritchard, Linda M. Bullen, Robert A. Sacks, Diane McGimsey, Kate Reznick, Dennis J. Stewart, Bruce Alverson, Michael P. Lehmann, William Timothy Needham, Henry A. Cirillo, Thomas P. Dove, Jef Feibelman, Rockard J. Delgadillo, Edwin W. Duncan, Richard M. Helgeson, Don E Lanson, Mark C. Molumphy, Jennifer L. Nassiri, Stanton J. Snyder, Kerrin I. Tso, Steven N. Williams, Paul Alexis Del Aguila, Jeffrey S. Torosian, Thomas Kirby, David S Steefel, Daniel D. Crabtree, Gregory T Everts, Jennifer Cotner, Douglas M. Poland, Joseph P. Hardy, Steven A. Heinzen, Geoffrey C. Rushing, Richard Alexander Saveri, Guido Saveri, Cadio Zirpoli, Elizabeth A. Hernandez, Walter J. Lack, Rahul Ravipudi, Paul A. Traina, Theresa J. Henson, Jerold B Hoffman, Allan M Hoffman, Gilmur R. Murray, Matthew Douglas, Cannon F. Allen, Brian S. Faughnan, Amy Pepke, Michael C. Lieb, John M Palmeri, David T. Peterson, Christopher J. Healey and Mark R Robeck
415) 972-8166 (fax: Susan G. Kupfer
816) 374-0509 (fax: W. Terrence Kilroy and Gregory M. Bentz
702) 384-0605 (fax: Mark Albright
303) 572-7883 (fax: John Preston Baker
Interested Party: Michael Beck and Clerk Jeffery N. Luthi
901) 683-1963 (fax: Alan G. Crone and James J. Webb
Consol Plaintiff: Briggs and Stratton Corporation and Carthage College
213) 892-9494 (fax: Peter H. Mason
213) 443-3100 (fax: A. William Urquhart
202) 887-0689 (fax: Leslie H. Spiegel
307) 778-8175 (fax: Donald Schultz and Michael Daniel Smith
510) 434-7804 (fax: Remigius Chibueze
510) 230-4616 (fax: Reginald Von Terrell
312)456-8435 (fax: Paul T Fox and Howard K Jeruchimowitz
213) 612-2500 (fax: Joseph Duffy
415) 982-8515 (fax: Daniel J. Mulligan
310) 769-9893 (fax: Albro L. Lundy, III
Objector: The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc.
415) 956-1008 (fax: Barry R Himmelstein
In Re: Western States Wholesale Natural Gas Antitrust Litigation
619) 236-1048 (fax: Mark H. Hamer, Noah A. Katsell, Jeffrey M. Shohet, Nancy L. Stagg and Stanley J. Panikowski
918) 594-0505 (fax: Stephanie A. Horton
608) 255-6006 (fax: Stuart G Mondschein
310) 399-7201 (fax: Brian J. O'Neill
310) 556-1954 (fax: Luan K. Phan
619) 645-5385 (fax: Jeffrey D Wexler
303) 296-3131 (fax: Franz Hardy
Case Number: 2:2003cv01431
Filed: November 14, 2003
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:1 Antitrust Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3155 ORDER granting ECF Nos. 3141 Motion/ 3148 Proposed Order : Awarding Attorney's Fees, Reimbursement of Wisconsin Expenses, and Incentive Awards. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3137 ORDER granting ECF No. 3136 Stipulation for the Designation of the Contents of the Record on Remand. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
May 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3134 ORDERED that Minute Order in Chambers (ECF No. 3133 ) isVACATED and RESCINDED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Final Fairness is set for 9:00 A.M., Monday, August 5, 2019, in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B, before Judge Robert C. Jones.(ECF Nos. 3127 and 3130 ).Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/8/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3130 ORDER re ECF No. 3128 Notice : Final Fairness Hearing set for 8/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3127 AMENDED ORDER re ECF No. 3126 Order : Final Fairness Hearing scheduled for Monday 8/5/2019 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/5/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
February 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3116 ORDER granting ECF No. 3111 Stipulation for Court to Separate Claims against Settling Defendants El Paso, Centerpoint and Genon, and Retain Jurisdiction Over Those Claims for the Purpose of Approving Settlements. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/19/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3108 ORDER granting ECF No. 3107 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice as to Xcel Energy Inc. and e prime Inc. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
January 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3106 ORDER granting ECF No. 3104 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice : This action as against El Paso is dismissed with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/14/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3103 ORDER granting ECF No. 3102 Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice : Farmland hereby dismisses this action as against Xcel Energy Inc. and e prime, Inc., with prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/2/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
December 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3101 ORDER granting ECF No. 3098 Motion to Withdraw Attorneys Mark R. Robeck and Travis G. Cushman on behalf of Reliant Energy Services, Inc., now known as RRIEnergy Services, LLC, and Reliant Energy, Inc. (n/k/a GenOn Energy, Inc.). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
October 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3080 ORDER VACATING STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR MONDAY, OCTOBER 22, 2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
September 5, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3045 ORDER granting ECF No. 3040 Motion to Extend Time : Response to ECF No. 3038 Motion for Remand due by 9/19/2018. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/5/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3033 ORDER that Amy Irene Washburn is withdrawn as counsel for the Wisconsin Plaintiffs. Clerk is directed to remove Amy Irene Washburn from the records and from CM/ECF System. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 24, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3023 ORDER denying ECF No. 2997 Motion for Reconsideration. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/24/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 21, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3008 ORDER granting ECF No. 3003 Withdrawal of Counsel : Attorney Mark E. Haddad is withdrawn as counsel of record for the CMS Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/21/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
May 17, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 2995 ORDER on Mandate as to ECF No. 2994 USCA Mandate. ORDER Setting a Status Conference for 7/9/2018 at 9:00 AM in Las Vegas Courtroom 4B, before Judge Robert C. Jones. The parties shall jointly file a status report by 6/29/2018 at 5:00 PM. Any out-of-state counsel who request telephonic appearances shall file a Request to Appear Telephonically by 6/29/2018 at 5:00 PM. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
December 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2989 ORDER granting ECF No. 2980 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Bill of Costs and Application for Attorneys' Fees. The deadline is extended until 30 days after an opinion or order entered by the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeal s becomes a final determination of the appeal of this Court's decision on summary judgment against Sinclair Oil Corporation in the Ninth Circuit Case No. 17-16926. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
November 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2987 ORDERED that the Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Brief (ECF No. 2946 ) and the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 2962 ) are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Reconsider (ECF No. 2959 ) is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. Xcel Energy Inc.; Northern States Power Co.; Dynegy Illinois, Inc.; Dynegy GP, Inc.; El Paso Corp.; and Williams Merchant Services Co. are entitled to summary judgment based on release, but DMT GP, LLC is not. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to C ertify (ECF Nos. 2967 , 2968 ) and the Motion for Suggestion of Remand (ECF No. 2961 ) are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the consolidated cases are STAYED, and the parties shall notify the Court upon the issuance of the Court of Appeals' rulings in Appeals Nos. 16-17099 and 17-16227. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 22, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2957 ORDER that the Motions to File Supplemental Briefs ECF Nos. 2798 , 2824 , 2828 and the Motions to Strike ECF Nos. 2710 , 2818 are DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motion for Order Limiting Defendants Seriatim Filing of Disp ositive Motions ECF No. 2689 , the Motion to Defer State Specific Rulings and Remand Cases to Transferor Courts ECF No. 2843 , the Motions to Strike ECF Nos. 2901 , 2909 , the Motion for Hearing ECF No. 2921 , and the Motion to Server ECF No. [2 915] are DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motions to File Surreply ECF Nos. 2836 , 2866 , 2900 , the Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages ECF No. 2849 , and the Motion to Extend Time and Exceed Page Limits ECF No. 2879 are GRANTE D.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motions to Seal ECF Nos. 2738 , 2742 , 2749 , 2750 , 2854 , 2857 2860 , 2864 , 2889 are GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motions to Reconsider ECF Nos. 2839 , 2840 , 2841 are DENIED; AND THE Motion to Reconsider ECF No. 2852 is GRANTED. The Order ECF No. 2832 is AMENDED under Rule 60(a) to remove the final sentence of the first paragraph of Part III.B.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 2740 is GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 2741 is GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motions for Summary Judgment ECF Nos. 2744 , 2746 , 2748 , 2754 , 2761 , 2762 are DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED the Motions for Summary Judgment ECF Nos. 2745 , 2764 , are DENIED without prejudice.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report within 14 days add ressing: (1) the refiling, mootness, waiver, etc. of Motions Nos. 2745 and 2764 ; and (2) any matters (apart from motions to reconsider anything in the present order) that remain to be address in this Court before remand to the transferor courts. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 08/22/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
July 27, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2933 AMENDED JUDGMENT re ECF No. 2687 Motion for Judgment. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 7/27/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2925 ORDER denying Defendants' ECF No. 2789 Joint Motion to Compel Production of Documents Plaintiffs' Expert George Donkin Relied Upon; granting Plaintiffs' ECF No. 2813 Motion for Leave to File Surreply. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2907 ORDER PRELIMINARILY CERTIFYING SETTLEMENT CLASSES, APPROVING CLASS SETTLEMENT, APPROVING CLASS NOTICE AND SETTING DATE FOR FAIRNESS HEARING re ECF No. 2897 Proposed Order. Fairness Hearing set for 8/9/2017 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 4B before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
April 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2847 ORDER granting ECF No. 2842 Motion to Stay Briefing. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 4/19/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 30, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2832 ORDER that the Motions for Summary Judgment ECF Nos. 2399 , 2508 , 2555 , 2694 , 2709 ; Motions for Class Certification ECF Nos. 2308 , 2309 , 2310 , 2311 ; Motions to Strike ECF Nos. 2547 , 2548 , 2620 , 2621 , 2622 , 2623 , 2624 , 2625 , Motion to Reconsider ECF No. 2772 , Motion to File a Reply ECF No. 2796 , Motion to File a Surresponse ECF No. 2718 , Motion to Amend ECF No. 2454 , and the Motion for Suggestion of Remand ECF No. 2765 are DENIED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Seal ECF No. 2766 , Motion to Strike ECF No. 2679 , Motion for Summary Judgment ECF No. 2436 , and the Joinder to Motion No. 2436 ECF No. 2444 , are GRANTED.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motions to Strike EC F Nos. 2644 , 2645 , 2651 are GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Strike ECF No. 2650 is DENIED as moot.IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Strike ECF No. 2767 is DENIED IN PART and DENIED as moot in part. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 03/30/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
February 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2808 ORDER - The Clerk of the Court shall UNSEAL Sealed Exhibit 6 (ECF No. 2550 - 2), the 2009 Dwyer Declaration. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
January 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 2730 ORDER denying ECF No. 2673 Motion to Reconsider; granting ECF No. 2677 Motion to Clarify. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
November 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2672 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Lance S. Wilson on 11/16/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
October 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2632 ORDER granting ECF Nos. 2383 , 2384 , 2486 , 2487 , 2518 , and 2545 motions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/20/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
October 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2627 JUDGMENT. All of the Arandell Plaintiffs' claims in their Third Amended Complaint (ECF No. 1846 in 2:03-CV-01431-RCJ-PAL) are dismissed with prejudice against CES. To the extent this Final Judgment results in judgment against fewer than all D efendants and/or judgment on fewer than all claims in the above-captioned action, the Court directs that Final Judgment be entered on all claims against CES, as no just reason for delay exists. Signed by Clerk of Court Lance S. Wilson on 10/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2598 ORDER on ECF No. 2563 Stipulation : Plaintiffs' reply briefs in support of class certification (ECF No. 2311 ), and defendants' merits expert reports, shall be due on September 12, 2016. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/22/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
September 14, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2587 ORDER directing Clerk to unseal ECF No. 2498 Sealed Exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2546 ORDER DENYING without prejudice ECF No. 2445 Motion for Entry of Judgment. (See pdf Order for specifics.) Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/24/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2529 ORDER granting ECF No. 2507 Motion to Modify Class Certification and Merits Expert Report Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 16, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2523 ORDER granting ECF No. 2492 Motion for Leave to File Surreply to Clarify the Record; granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 2439 Motion to Compel Responses to Contention Interrogatories (see order for details). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/15/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2519 ORDER granting ECF No. 2515 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Attorneys Travis Cushman and Mark R. Robeck substituted as counsel for Centerpoint Energy Services Inc, in place and stead of Attorneys Orrin L. Harrison III and Heather L. Peckham. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2506 ORDER granting ECF No. 2446 Motion for Clarification. Responses to ECF No. 2436 Motion for Summary Judgment due within 21 days. Replies due 14 days thereafter. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2416 ORDER granting ECF No. 2277 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order; vacating ECF No. 2270 Order; and granting ECF Nos. 2286 and 2299 Motions for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/23/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
May 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2389 ORDER granting in part and denying in part ECF No. 2174 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
April 28, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2378 ORDER denying without prejudice ECF Nos. 2282 , 2295 , 2313 , 2331 , 2355 , 2359 , and 2366 Motions to Seal; directing the documents referenced in the motions to remain under seal until 5/13/2016; giving the designating party or parties until 5/13/2016 to file particularized showing why they should remain under seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 4/28/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2336 ORDER re 2333 Notice of Withdrawal of Counsel : Attorneys Scott S. Barker, Kendra N. Beckwith, and Michael N. Mulvania on behalf of Sinclair Oil Corporation terminated, and removed from CM/ECF notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/30/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2321 ORDER granting 2320 Ms. Vergeront's Motion to be Removed from CM/ECF Notification. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/16/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2317 ORDER that Plaintiffs' shall have until April 15, 2016, to file a responses to CenterPoint Energy Services, Inc.'s Motion for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 2286 ), and Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment Based on Res Judicata and Relea se Defenses and Supporting Brief (Dkt. # 2299 ). Movants shall have until April 29, 2016, to file a reply to the Motions for Summary Judgment (Dkt. # 2286 , 2299 ). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 27, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2272 ORDER that the Order (ECF No. 2270 ) is AMENDED IN PART, and the Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 2252 ) is DENIED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2270 ORDER that the Motions to Dismiss (ECF Nos. 2248 , 2249 , 2250 , 2252 ) are GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 4, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 2260 ORDER that 2168 Plaintiffs' Motion to Compel E Prime to Produce the documents is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/4/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2259 ORDER that 2253 MOTION for Leave to Take Depositions of Individuals Confined in Prison is GRANTED and Plaintiffs are granted leave to depose James Brooks and Wesley Walton in prison on or before the close of fact discovery in this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 16, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2254 ORDER Granting 2251 Motion to Extend Time to File Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction. Motions due by 12/15/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2247 ORDER that the Motions to Hold in Abeyance (ECF Nos. 2129 , 2130 ) are DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that the Motion to Remove Counsel from CM/ECF and Manual Notice Lists (ECF No. 2135 ) is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 12/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2171 ORDER re 2164 Stipulation. Calendar Call set for 1/9/2017 09:00 AM in Courtroom to be determined. before Judge Robert C. Jones., Jury Trial set for 1/23/2017 10:00 AM in Courtroom to be determined. before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2154 ORDER that 2153 Motion to Substitute Attorney is GRANTED. Attorneys Mark R. Robeck and Travis Cushman substituted for Terry Houlihan, Amy E. Tabor, Jeffrey D Wexler, Jefferson Gregory Copeland, and Christopher J. Healey for Reliant Energy Services, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 19, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2151 ORDER that 2145 Motion to Substitute Attorneys is GRANTED. Attorney Joseph A. Fischer, III substituted in place of Douglas R. Tribble, John M. Grenfell, Barry S. Hyman, Samantha C. Norris, and William M. Hannay for the Dynegy Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2150 ORDER that 2147 Motion to Substitute Attorneys is GRANTED. Attorneys Tristan L. Duncan, Tammy B. Webb, Steven D. Soden, John R. McCambridge and Brent Dwerlkotte substituted in place of Sarah Jane Gillett, Heather L. Cupp and Brandon B. Rule for the Williams Defendants. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 7, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2144 ORDER that 2141 Motion to Substitute Counsel for Williams Defendants is DENIED without prejudice for failure to comply with LR IA 10-6(b). Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 8/7/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2140 ORDER that the Status Conference currently set for 10:00 a.m., Thursday, August 13, 2015 is VACATED and RESCHEDULED to 10:00 a.m., Wednesday, September 9, 2015 in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 7, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2106 ORDERED that the parties shall file a joint status report on or before January 7, 2012. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 12/7/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
August 31, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2099 ORDER that the parties shall file a Joint Status Report due by 9/20/2011. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 30, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2098 ORDER that 1393 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1395 Plaintiffs' Motion to Certify Class is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1630 Defendants' Motion to Strike is DENI ED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 1722 Plaintiffs' Motion to Strike is DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 2034 Defendant's Motion for Attorney Fees is DENIED without prejudice to renew once the stay is lifted. IT IS FURT HER ORDERED that 75 in 2:06-cv-267-PMP-PAL Defendants' Motion to Award Attorneys' Fees and Costs is DENIED without prejudice to renew once the stay is lifted. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
August 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2074 AMENDED JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 8/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
August 3, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 2048 ORDER granting unopposed 2002 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 8/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1972 ORDER that Defendants Joint Renewed Motion and Motion for Summary Judgment 1880 is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The ePrime Defendants Notice of Motion and Motion for Partial Summary Judgment Based on Preemption 1884 is GRANTED. Dynegy In c. and Dynegy Marketing and Trades Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 1891 is GRANTED. ONEOK Energy Services Companys Motion for Partial Summary Judgment 1944 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification 1383 and Plaintiffs Motion for Class Certification 1394 are DENIED as moot. To the extent this Order results in judgment against fewer than all Defendants and/or judgment on fewer than all claims in any of the above actions, the Court directs final judgment be entered on the ab ove-identified claims for the above-identified Defendants, as no just reason for delay exists. The stay imposed by the Order Re: Stay of Certain Proceedings 1942 is hereby lifted. The parties shall file any supplemental briefs regarding the various remaining pending motions for class certification on or before August 18, 2011. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
July 14, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1970 ORDER that the California Class Plaintiffs' 1384 Motion to Certify Class is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 7/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 13, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 1966 ORDER Approving the California Class Plaintiffs' Report on Settlement Fund and Cy Pres Distributions 1965 . Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
November 10, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1960 ORDER Granting CMS Energy Corporation, CMS Energy Resources Management Co., and Cantera Gas Company's Motion to Dismiss filed as document #10-6 in 2:09-cv-1103-PMP-PAL. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/10/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
November 3, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1959 ORDER Denying 1806 Defendants' Motion for Judgment. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/3/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 29, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1957 ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Reconsideration of the Courts March 9, 2009 Dismissal of American Electric Power Company, Inc., and AEP Energy Services, Inc. for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction 1652 is hereby DENIED. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/29/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
June 4, 2010 Opinion or Order Filing 1949 ORDER Granting 1798 Motion to Consolidate Cases 2:09-cv-00915-PMP-PAL and 2:09-cv-01019-PMP-PAL into 2:03-cv-01431-PMP-PAL. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 6/4/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
March 9, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1549 ORDER: Dynegy Illinios Inc.'s 929 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction is Denied. Plaintiffs' 1495 Motion to Supplement Record is Granted. Plaintiffs' 1496 Motion to Seal is Denied as moot. The 1497 Motion to Withdraw is Granted. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 03/09/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
February 23, 2009 Opinion or Order Filing 1521 ORDER Granting 1299 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction. Defendant Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC. is terminated. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 02/23/09. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SRK)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: In Re: Western States Wholesale Natural Gas Antitrust Litigation (MDL 1566)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: A.L. Gilbert Company
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelman Art Glass
Represented By: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Abelman Art Glass Company, et al
Represented By: Michael J. Boni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arandell Corp.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Auila, Inc.
Represented By: Sylvie K. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BBD Acquisition Co.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Benscheidt
Represented By: Michael P. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Benscheidt
Represented By: Michael P. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bing's Stop & Shop
Represented By: Thomas H. Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Breckenridge Brewery of Colorado, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David C. Brown
Represented By: Amelia F. Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California, People of the State of
Represented By: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Coachella Valley Taxi Owners Association
Represented By: Sylvie K. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank H. Colvett, Jr.
Represented By: Thomas H. Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cross Oil Refining & Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ever-Bloom, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa J. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairhaven Power Co.
Represented By: Kathleen S. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fairhaven Power Company
Represented By: Kathleen S. Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: H&M Roses
Represented By: William Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heartland Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis J. Herrera
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JP Morgan Trust Company, NA
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ladish Co., Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Learjet, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samuel D. Leggett
Represented By: Thomas H. Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lois the Pie Queen
Represented By: Donald Chidi Amamgbo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Los Angeles, City Of
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Celina Martinez
Represented By: Michael P. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maximum Nursery, Inc.
Represented By: Theresa J. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Merrick's Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Missouri Public Service Commission
Represented By: Cathy J. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Multiut Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NewPage Wisconsin System Inc.
Represented By: Gregory M. Bentz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Northwest Missouri State University
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oberti Wholesale Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas A. Jenkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dan L. Older
Represented By: Ralph B Kalfayan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Craig Podesta
Represented By: William Henry Parish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Prime Tanning Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Reorganized FLI, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Safety-Kleen Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Diego, County of
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco, City of
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Francisco, County of
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Santa Clara, County of
Represented By: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sargento Foods, Inc.
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shanghai 1930 Restaurant Partners, LP
Represented By: A. J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Haleema Silverman
Represented By: Brad N. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Silverman
Represented By: Brad N. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sinclair Oil Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lynette Stevenson
Represented By: Brad N. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tom Stevenson
Represented By: Brad N. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Team Design
Represented By: Brad N. Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Texas-Ohio Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Allan M Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Topeka Unified School District 501
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Utility Savings & Refund Services, LLP
Represented By: Jerold B Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laurence Uyeda
Represented By: William Bernstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vittice Corporation
Represented By: Derek G. Howard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wolfe River Cafe
Represented By: Thomas H. Brill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Roger M. Schrimp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gene J. Stonebarger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Clinton P. Walker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jonathon Abram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: William H. Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael J. Boni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Marc H. Edelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Nathan Reinmiller
Represented By: Francis O. Scarpulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Joshua D Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Sylvie K. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jared M. Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Josef D. Cooper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Craig C. Corbitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Athena Jiangxioa Hou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Tracy R. Kirkham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Christopher T. Micheletti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Francis O. Scarpulla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Judith A. Shimm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: John S. Wilder, Sr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: A. J. De Bartolomeo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Daniel C. Girard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gordon M. Fauth, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: David Gordon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Frederic G. Berner, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Heather R. Skinazi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Joseph W. Cotchett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Mark E. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Walter L McInnis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Elizabeth S Parker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Mark A. James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Meg Vergeront
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Brian E. Butler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Matthew E. Digby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Stephen R. Mick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: William D. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Brian I Cheng
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Karen C Corallo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Reginald D. Steer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: D. Neal Tomlinson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Patrick D. Martin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Clifford Joe Cavitt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Marie A. Stanton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Lisa M.R. Miller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Scott Phillip DeVries
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Katrina June Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael J. Modl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Steven M. Streck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: John S. Golwen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Shea Sisk Wellford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Steven M. Kaufmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Stuart Plunkett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Diane E. Pritchard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Linda M. Bullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Robert A. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Diane McGimsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Kate Reznick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Dennis J. Stewart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Bruce Alverson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael P. Lehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: William Timothy Needham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Henry A. Cirillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Thomas P. Dove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jef Feibelman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Rockard J. Delgadillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Edwin W. Duncan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Richard M. Helgeson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Don E Lanson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Mark C. Molumphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jennifer L. Nassiri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Stanton J. Snyder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Kerrin I. Tso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Steven N. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Paul Alexis Del Aguila
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jeffrey S. Torosian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Thomas Kirby
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: David S Steefel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Daniel D. Crabtree
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gregory T Everts
Represented By: James W. Richgels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jennifer Cotner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Douglas M. Poland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Joseph P. Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Steven A. Heinzen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Geoffrey C. Rushing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Richard Alexander Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Guido Saveri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Cadio Zirpoli
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Elizabeth A. Hernandez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Walter J. Lack
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Rahul Ravipudi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Paul A. Traina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Theresa J. Henson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Jerold B Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Allan M Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Gilmur R. Murray
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Matthew Douglas
Represented By: James E Scarboro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Cannon F. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Brian S. Faughnan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Amy Pepke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Michael C. Lieb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: John M Palmeri
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: David T. Peterson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Christopher J. Healey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Unknown: Mark R Robeck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AEP Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Electric Power Company, Inc.
Represented By: Robert B. Wolinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquila Merchant Services, Inc.
Represented By: Sylvie K. Kern
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aquila, Inc.
Represented By: Khai LeQuang
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Bates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Energy
Represented By: Steven A Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Energy Corporation
Represented By: Robert E. Craddock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Energy Resource Management Company
Represented By: Steven A Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Energy Resources
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Energy Resources Management Company
Represented By: Steven A Ellis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Enterprises Group, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Field Services
Represented By: Robert E. Craddock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Marketing Services & Trading Company
Represented By: Michelle B Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CMS Marketing, Service & Trading Company
Represented By: Robert E. Craddock, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantera Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantera Natural Gas, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cantera Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Mark E. Haddad
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Center Point Energy, Inc.
Represented By: Heather L Peckham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy Inc.
Represented By: Orrin L Harrison, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Centerpoint Energy Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coral Energy Resources, LP
Represented By: Kristen Bird
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DMT G.Pg. LLC
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy
Represented By: Lisa M Kaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy & Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Lisa M Kaas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Carolinas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Field Services, Inc.
Represented By: Bruno William Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy North America, LLC
Represented By: Bruno William Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Trading & Marketing, LLC
Represented By: Graydon Dean Luthey, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duke Energy Trading and Marketing, L.L.C.
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy GP Inc DMT Holding, LP
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy GP Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Holding Co., Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Illinois Inc.
Represented By: Michael J. Kass
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Inc.
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Inc. Holding Company
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Marketing & Trade
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dynegy Power Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: Douglas R. Tribble
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E Prime Inc
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPNG Mojave, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Corporation
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Marketing LP
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Marketing, LP
Represented By: Paul R. Norman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy Company
Represented By: Paul Howard Morris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy Holding Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy LP
Represented By: Joel B. Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Merchant Energy-Gas LP
Represented By: Joel B. Kleinman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Mojave Pipeline Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Natural Gas Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Pipeline
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: El Paso Tennesse Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encana Corporation
Represented By: Bruno William Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Encana Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kansas Gas Marketing Company
Represented By: Craig A. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mojave Pipeline Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mojave Pipeline Operating Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Northern States Power Company
Represented By: Michael John Miguel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OneOK Energy Services Company, L.P.
Represented By: Craig A. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneok Energy Marketing & Trading Company, LP
Represented By: Craig A. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Oneok, Inc.
Represented By: Craig A. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: RRI Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Jefferson Gregory Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Energy Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Energy, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliant Resources, Inc
Represented By: Jefferson Gregory Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: San Diego Gas & Electric
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sempra Energy
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sempra Energy Corp.
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sempra Energy Trading Corp.
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Southern California Gas Company
Represented By: Jennifer Dorsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WD Energy Services, Inc.
Represented By: Robert A. Sacks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Coast Power LLC
Represented By: John M. Grenfell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Gas Resources, Inc.
Represented By: Jessica Brody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Heather L. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Energy Marketing & Trading Company
Represented By: Heather L. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Energy Services Company
Represented By: Craig A. Fitzgerald
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Merchant Services Company, Inc.
Represented By: Heather L. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Williams Power
Represented By: Heather L. Cupp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xcel Energy Inc.
Represented By: Sarah Jane Gillett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kathleen M. Zanaboni
Represented By: Jefferson Gregory Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: e prime Inc.
Represented By: David Len Bryant
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
415) 972-8166 (fax: Susan G. Kupfer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
816) 374-0509 (fax: W. Terrence Kilroy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
816) 374-0509 (fax: Gregory M. Bentz
Represented By: Matthew Corcoran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
702) 384-0605 (fax: Mark Albright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
303) 572-7883 (fax: John Preston Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Michael Beck
Represented By: Michael J. Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Interested party: Clerk Jeffery N. Luthi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
901) 683-1963 (fax: Alan G. Crone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
901) 683-1963 (fax: James J. Webb
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Briggs and Stratton Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Consol plaintiff: Carthage College
Represented By: Jennifer Gille Bacon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
213) 892-9494 (fax: Peter H. Mason
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
213) 443-3100 (fax: A. William Urquhart
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
202) 887-0689 (fax: Leslie H. Spiegel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
307) 778-8175 (fax: Donald Schultz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
307) 778-8175 (fax: Michael Daniel Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
510) 434-7804 (fax: Remigius Chibueze
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
510) 230-4616 (fax: Reginald Von Terrell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
312)456-8435 (fax: Paul T Fox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
312)456-8435 (fax: Howard K Jeruchimowitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
213) 612-2500 (fax: Joseph Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
415) 982-8515 (fax: Daniel J. Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
310) 769-9893 (fax: Albro L. Lundy, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Objector: The McGraw-Hill Companies, Inc.
Represented By: Carolyn K. Foley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
415) 956-1008 (fax: Barry R Himmelstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: Western States Wholesale Natural Gas Antitrust Litigation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
619) 236-1048 (fax: Mark H. Hamer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
619) 236-1048 (fax: Noah A. Katsell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
619) 236-1048 (fax: Jeffrey M. Shohet
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
619) 236-1048 (fax: Nancy L. Stagg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
619) 236-1048 (fax: Stanley J. Panikowski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
918) 594-0505 (fax: Stephanie A. Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
608) 255-6006 (fax: Stuart G Mondschein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
310) 399-7201 (fax: Brian J. O'Neill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
310) 556-1954 (fax: Luan K. Phan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
619) 645-5385 (fax: Jeffrey D Wexler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
303) 296-3131 (fax: Franz Hardy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?