January 19, 2018 |
Filing
327
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 318 plaintiff's motion for change of venue be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
January 14, 2013 |
Filing
310
ORDER Denying 304 Plaintiff Christopher A. Jones's Motion to Review Costs. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/14/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 5, 2012 |
Filing
292
ORDER Granting 238 Motion for Summary Judgment. Denying 244 Motion for Summary Judgment and 284 Motion to Strike. The clerk of court shall enter final judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/5/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
April 27, 2012 |
Filing
283
ORDER that pro se plaintiff Christopher A. Jones motion to exceed the page limit 281 is GRANTED. Plaintiffs motion for order 278 is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
April 6, 2012 |
Filing
277
ORDER Denying 262 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/6/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 2, 2012 |
Filing
276
ORDER Denying 248 Motion to Exclude Evidence, Granting in Part and Denying in Part 250 Motion to Extend Time and for New Copies of Docket Entries, and Granting 249 and 260 Motions for Extension of Time, and Denying as Moot 272 Motion for Leave to File a Late Reply. 238 MOTION for Summary Judgment Deadlines: Responses due by 4/16/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/2/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 19, 2012 |
Filing
271
ORDER Granting 269 Motion to Extend Time to Reply to 262 Motion to Strike. Replies due by 3/26/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 27, 2012 |
Filing
267
ORDER Granting 264 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 262 Motion to Strike. Responses due by 3/2/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/27/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 24, 2012 |
Filing
265
ORDER Granting 251 Motion for Order. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall detach the exhibit from 251 Motion and enter it separately as exhibit 29 to 244 Motion for Summary Judgment which was filed on 12/16/11. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/24/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 19, 2012 |
Filing
256
ORDER Granting 252 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 244 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 1/19/2012. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/19/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 13, 2011 |
Filing
242
ORDER Granting 240 Motion to Extend Time. Plaintiff shall have until 12/20/11 to file any Dispositive Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 12/13/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 5, 2011 |
Filing
236
ORDER Denying as Moot 234 Motion for Exhibit Stickers. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/5/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 2, 2011 |
Filing
230
ORDER Granting 227 Motion for Court to Issue an Order Setting a New Dispositive/Summary Judgment Schedule. Motions due by 12/9/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 11/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
October 31, 2011 |
Filing
229
ORDER that plaintiff Christopher A. Jones motion for district judge to reconsider magistrate judges order 224 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 10/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
September 8, 2011 |
Filing
218
ORDER Denying as moot 211 Motion for Orders. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 9/8/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 2, 2011 |
Filing
215
ORDER Denying as Moot 210 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages, Denying as Moot 211 Motion for Orders, and Denying 212 Motion to Strike. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 9/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
August 30, 2011 |
Filing
209
ORDER Denying 188 Motion for Sanctions, Granting in Part and Denying in Part 189 Motion to Determine Sufficiency of Answers and to Deem Requests for Admissions Admitted, and Granting 191 Motion to Shorten Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/30/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
August 24, 2011 |
Filing
208
ORDER Granting 204 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply to 190 Statement of Additional Discovery. (Reply due by 8/29/2011.) Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/24/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|
August 3, 2011 |
Filing
201
ORDER granting 199 Motion to Extend Deadline. Responses due by 8/4/2011 re 188 MOTION for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/3/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
July 22, 2011 |
Filing
198
ORDER that findings and recommendations of Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr 181 regarding the plaintiffs motion to modify scheduling order 179 are AFFIRMED in their entirety. Plaintiffs motion to modify scheduling order 179 is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/22/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
July 18, 2011 |
Filing
195
ORDER Denying 186 Motion for Order Requiring the Clerk to Cease Artificially Inflating Response Time. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr. on 7/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 7, 2011 |
Filing
185
ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion for Enlargement of Time 183 is GRANTED. Plaintiff shall until 7/15/11 to file the Statement of Additional Discovery. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/7/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
May 31, 2011 |
Filing
176
ORDER Denying 136 Motion for Order to Show Cause, Denying 138 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Order, Denying 146 Motion for Sanctions, Denying without Prejudice 153 Motion to Determine the Sufficiency of Denials and Answers and/or Deem Admissions Admitted, Denying without Prejudice 163 Motion to Compel, and Denying as Moot 169 Emergency Motion to Require the Presence of Marc A. Fox. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/31/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
May 27, 2011 |
Filing
174
ORDER Granting 139 Motion to Unseal 52 Exhibit. The Court will file an unsealed copy of the medical records attached to Defendants motion to dismiss (# 52 ) with Plaintiffs date of birth and social security number redacted. The Court will also send a copy of the unsealed records to Plaintiff for Plaintiff to keep in his cell. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/27/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
May 26, 2011 |
Filing
171
ORDER Granting 167 Motion to File a Late Reply. Clerk shall file Reply to Response to the Motion for Sanctions. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/26/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
April 20, 2011 |
Filing
147
ORDER Granting in Part 133 MOTION to Compel and Setting Hearing on 133 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 5/17/2011 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3A before Magistrate Judge George Foley Jr. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 4/19/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 28, 2011 |
Filing
135
ORDER Granting 129 Supplement to Motion to Compel. The Nevada Department of Corrections and Ely State Prison officials shall allow Plaintiff to keep his personal medical records, including the medical records attached to Defendants motion to dismiss (# 52 ), in his possession in his prison cell. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 11, 2011 |
Filing
131
ORDER for the Filing of Objections or Joinder to 42 Proposed Pretrial Order by 3/25/2011. Signed by Judge Edward C. Reed, Jr on 3/11/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
March 8, 2011 |
Filing
128
ORDER Granting 119 Motion to Compel. Supplement due by 3/9/2011. Discovery due by 6/11/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
March 4, 2011 |
Filing
127
ORDER Granting 114 Motion to attach the supplemental exhibits to the amended complaint and file the amended complaint and exhibits as one document in the record. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/4/2011. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
February 28, 2011 |
Filing
123
ORDER that Plaintiff Christopher A. Jones Motion To Depose an Incarcerated Person and Motion for an Order 112 is granted. Plaintiff shall make arrangements with prison officials to determine a date and time in the near future when the deposition m ay take place. In the event that Plaintiff and Mr. Wardell are not housed in the same prison, the deposition may be taken telephonically. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/28/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
February 14, 2011 |
Filing
116
ORDER that Plaintiffs Motion for Clarification 115 is granted to the extent that Plaintiff requests a status conference. The parties shall appear for a status conference on Wednesday, March 2, 2011 at 2:00 p.m. in LV Courtroom 3A before the unders igned magistrate judge. The Attorney General shall make arrangements for Plaintiff to be available telephonically for this hearing and shall contact the Courtroom Deputy at (702) 464-5418 two (2) days prior to this hearing to advise the Court of the telephone number where the plaintiff may be reached the day of the hearing. The plaintiff shall be available (10) minutes prior to the hearing so the Courtroom Deputy may initiate the conference call. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/14/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
January 25, 2011 |
Filing
109
ORDER granting 106 Motion for Clarification of Scheduling Order 104 . See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/25/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
January 18, 2011 |
Filing
105
ORDER Denying 102 Motion for Re-Taxation of Costs. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 1/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
December 15, 2010 |
Filing
99
ORDER Granting 97 Motion to Order Defendants to file an Answer to the Complaint. Defendants' Answers 1/4/2011. Discovery due by 3/15/2011. Motions due by 4/14/2011. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 12/15/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
November 17, 2010 |
Filing
98
ORDER Denying 95 Motion to Reassign Case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 11/17/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DXS)
|