November 16, 2015 |
Filing 441
ORDER Granting #440 Stipulation to Close Case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing 440
STIPULATION to Close the Case by Plaintiffs. (Londen, Jack)
|
November 12, 2015 |
Filing 439
NOTICE of Change of Attorney (Mark Danis) by Plaintiffs. (Ortiz, Dinah) Modified event on 11/13/2015 (DKJ).
|
October 21, 2015 |
Filing 438
ORDER re 437 Status Conference held 9/9/15. ORDERED that a Status Conference is set for 10:00 A.M. Monday, December 7, 2015, in LAS VEGAS COURTROOM TBD, before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 9, 2015 |
Filing 437
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/9/2015 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Eileen Wood; Pla Counsel: Leecia Welch, Jonathan Blum, Mari Schann, Mark Danis; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley; Court Reporter: Margaret Greiner; Time of Hearing: 11:05-11:06 AM; Courtroom: 7C. Representations of counsel are heard. All matters have been resolved and funds distributed. Counsel to submit a proposed closing order. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EW)
|
September 2, 2015 |
Filing 436
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 9/2/2015. By Deputy Clerk: Lesa Ettinger. RE: #435 Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Telephonically. The parties that have been approved by the Court to appear telephonically for the 9/09/2015 Status Conference, the following instructions are given: Counsel shall dial into the AT&T meet-me-line number (1-888-675-2535, Access Code 2900398, Security Code 090915) five (5) minutes prior to the hearing. Please remain on the line until such time as the Court joins the call and convenes the proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing 435
ORDER Granting #434 Request to Appear Telephonically. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing 434
MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically. Attorney: Jack Londen and Leecia Welch. by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
September 1, 2015 |
Filing 433
NOTICE of Attorney Action Required: to #432 Statement: ERROR: Documents should have been filed as separate entries by attorney Mark Wilmot Danis , pursuant to Special Order 109 a separate document must be filed for each type of document or purpose . Attorney advised in the future please file documents in accordance with Special Order 109 filing procedures; to prevent delay in the timely filing of documents. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to file the additional MOTION contained in document #432 STATEMENT, using the appropriate event found under the MOTIONS category pursuant to Special Order 109. (no image attached)(RFJ)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing 432
STATEMENT re 430 Notice of Hearing; filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
August 31, 2015 |
Filing 431
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
August 25, 2015 |
Filing 430
NOTICE of Hearing Location: Status Conference set for 9/9/2015 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 7C before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
July 21, 2015 |
Filing 429
ORDER. Status Conference is set for 9/9/15 at 10:00 am before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that out-of-state counsel requesting telephonic appearances shall file a Request to Appear Telephonically with the Court on or before 8/31/15 by 5:00 pm. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file a Status Report with the court on or before 8/31/15 by 5:00 pm. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
July 21, 2015 |
Filing 428
ORDER GRANTING #427 Stipulation to Dismiss all Claims of Plaintiffs, Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B. and Mason I. with Prejudice. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - PS)
|
July 16, 2015 |
Filing 427
STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice; filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Nevada, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret)
|
July 6, 2015 |
Filing 426
NOTICE of Change of Attorney filed by Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. (Davis, Sarah)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing 424
DECLARATION of Stephanie Krol re #423 Status Report; filed> by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Danis, Mark)
|
April 23, 2015 |
Filing 423
STATUS REPORT re: Disbursements; filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Danis, Mark)
|
April 1, 2015 |
Filing 422
NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel (Aurora V. Kaiser) by Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
March 20, 2015 |
Filing 421
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
March 20, 2015 |
Filing 419
SUPPLEMENT to #400 Order; filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
March 12, 2015 |
Filing 418
ORDER granting #412 Motion for Release of Funds. Petitioner Henry A. will file receipts with the Court showing that funds have been used as requested and in compliance with this Order within thirty days from the completion of the above listed transactions. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 3/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing 417
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing 416
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. [Proposed] Order Regarding Blocked Accounts and Petition for Release of Funds (Danis, Mark)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing 415
DECLARATION re #412 MOTION for Release of Funds 1)Plaintiffs' Report Regarding Blocked Accounts and Petition for Release of Funds ; filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. Declaration of Stephanie Krol In Support of Plaintiffs' Report Regarding Blocked Accounts and Petition for Release of Funds (Danis, Mark)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing 414
DECLARATION re #412 MOTION for Release of Funds 1)Plaintiffs' Report Regarding Blocked Accounts and Petition for Release of Funds ; filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. Declaration of Arthur Keller In Support of Plaintiffs' Report Regarding Blocked Accounts and Petition for Release of Funds (Danis, Mark)
|
March 9, 2015 |
Filing 412
MOTION for Release of Funds filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
February 5, 2015 |
Filing 411
WITHDRAWAL of #360 and #361 Philomena Osemwengie's Motion for Summary Judgment by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Nevada, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers (Foley, Margaret) Not linked properly. Modified on 2/6/2015. (EDS)
|
February 5, 2015 |
Filing 410
WITHDRAWAL of #313 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Nevada, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers (Foley, Margaret) Not linked to motion. Modified on 2/6/2015 (EDS).
|
February 4, 2015 |
Filing 409
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Defendant Debbie Mallwitz of Motion for Summary Judgment filed under seal on May 23, 2014 [Dkt. No. 344] (Blum, Jonathan)
|
February 4, 2015 |
Filing 408
WITHDRAWAL of Motion by Defendant Yvette Chevalier of Motion for Reconsideration filed under seal on May 19, 2014 [Dkt. 339] (Blum, Jonathan)
|
January 22, 2015 |
Filing 407
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #395 STIPULATION re: Funds Payable by Clark County to Barco Assignments, LTD. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
January 22, 2015 |
Filing 406
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #397 STIPULATION to Dismiss All Claims with Prejudice by Plaintiffs Leo C., Victor C., and Linda E. against all Defendants. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
January 22, 2015 |
Filing 405
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #402 STIPULATION Regarding Agreement to Amend Settlement Agreement and Release. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
January 22, 2015 |
Filing 404
ORDER granting #403 Unopposed Motion for approval of Plaintiffs' negotiated attorneys' fees and costs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/22/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
January 16, 2015 |
Filing 403
UNOPPOSED MOTION Joint Petition and Memorandum in Support of Petition for Approval of Plaintiffs' Negotiated Attorneys' Fees and Costs by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Nevada, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. Motion ripe 1/16/2015. (Foley, Margaret)
|
January 16, 2015 |
Filing 402
STIPULATION re #400 Order, ; and [Proposed] Order Regarding Agreement to Amend Settlement Agreement and Release by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. (Kaiser, Aurora)
|
January 11, 2015 |
Filing 401
NOTICE re: #388 MOTION for Attorney Fees; filed by Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret)
|
January 9, 2015 |
Filing 400
ORDER approving 386 Petition To Approve Compromise Settlement and Distribution. The Clerk of the Court shall file the attachment/exhibits sealed annuity schedules under seal pursuant to the Court order dated October 5, 2010. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 1/9/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
December 19, 2014 |
Filing 398
NOTICE re: 386 Motion to Approve Compromise Settlement; filed by Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret)
|
December 18, 2014 |
Filing 397
STIPULATION to Dismiss All Claims with Prejudice; filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret)
|
December 10, 2014 |
Filing 395
STIPULATION re: Funds Payable by Clark County; filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 394
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 393
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #388 MOTION for Attorney Fees; filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I. . (Danis, Mark)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 392
DECLARATION of Karie Wilson re #388 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 391
DECLARATION of Bruno Wolfenzon re #388 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Danis, Mark)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 390
DECLARATION of Leecia Welch re #388 MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Danis, Mark)
|
November 25, 2014 |
Filing 388
MOTION for Attorney Fees filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. Responses due by 12/12/2014. (Danis, Mark)
|
November 14, 2014 |
Filing 385
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 11/14/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Dani, Erin Liotta; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 11:00 a.m.; IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall forthwith meet and confer and submit proposed stipulations discussed during the status conference. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
November 13, 2014 |
Filing 396
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 11/13/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Danis, Jack London, Leecia Welch; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Stephanie Barker; Time of Hearing: 11:00 a.m.; IT IS ORDERED counsel for Clark County shall forthwith draft a simple proposed form of stipulation as discussed and send it to plaintiffs counsel for execution so that settlement proceeds may be tendered on Thursday, December 11, 2014 as the parties settlement documents contemplate. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
November 6, 2014 |
Filing 384
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 11/6/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Dani, Leecia Welch; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, John Blum; Time of Hearing: 11:05 a.m.; Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/13/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 31, 2014 |
Filing 383
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Status Conference held on 10/31/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Erin Liotta, Mark Danis; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 9:34 AM; Telephonic Status Conference set for 11/6/2014 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 27, 2014 |
Filing 382
SECOND NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Tim J. Heuvel is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Continued failure to abide by Special Order 109 will be brought to the Judges attention for appropriate action within ten (10) days. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select ATTORNEY REGISTRATION located in the middle of the web page to register.(no image attached) (RFJ)
|
October 23, 2014 |
Filing 381
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 10/23/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Erin Liotta, Jack London; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 9:00 A.M; Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/30/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing 380
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 10/17/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Dani, Leecia Welch; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 9:00 A.M; Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/23/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 16, 2014 |
Filing 379
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #378 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Staying Discovery and Extending Briefing on 344 Sealed MOTION for Summary Judgment. Responses due by 11/17/2014. Replies due by 12/1/2014. Discovery due by 11/10/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing 378
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Sixth or more Request) Staying Discovery and Extending Briefing by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
October 7, 2014 |
Filing 377
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 10/7/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Dani, Erin Liotta, Bill Grimm; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, John Blum; Time of Hearing: 2:12 p.m.; Telephonic Status Conference set for 10/17/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing 376
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/29/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Leecia Welch; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 9:01 am - 9:09 am; A Telephonic Status Conference is set for 10/7/2014 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
September 23, 2014 |
Filing 375
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/19/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Dani, Leecia Welch; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Alan Lefebvre; Time of Hearing: 9:35 a.m.; Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/29/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
September 12, 2014 |
Filing 374
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/12/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Dani, Leecia Welch, Erin Liotta; Def Counsel: Jon Blum, Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 9:19 a.m.; Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/19/2014 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
September 10, 2014 |
Filing 373
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #372 STIPULATION for Order Staying Discovery and Extending Briefing (Fifth Request re Discovery; Fourth Request re Briefing) as to 344 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment . Discovery STAYED until 10/8/2014. Response to Motion for Summary Judgment due by 10/16/2014. Reply due by 10/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
September 8, 2014 |
Filing 372
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fifth Request) - Stipulation and [Proposed] Order Staying Discovery and Extending Briefing - (Fifth Request re Discovery; Fourth Request re Briefing) - by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
September 5, 2014 |
Filing 371
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/5/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Dani, Leecia Welch; Def Counsel: Jon Blum, Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 9:00 A.M; Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/12/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
July 31, 2014 |
Filing 370
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 7/31/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Dani, Leecia Welch; Def Counsel: Jon Blum, Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 9:00 A.M; IT IS ORDERED that a telephonic Status Conference is set for 9/4/2014 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Counsel shall be connected to the conference call by dialing (702) 868-4907, Conference Code: 123456, no later than 8:55 a.m. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
July 30, 2014 |
Filing 369
ORDER ON STIPULATION granting #368 STIPULATION to stay Discovery and extend briefing to 344 MOTION for Summary Judgment. Discovery is stayed until 9/1/2013. Responses due by 9/16/2014. Replies due by 9/30/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/30/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
July 29, 2014 |
Filing 368
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER STAYING DISCOVERY AND EXTENDING BRIEFING (FOURTH REQUEST RE DISCOVERY; THIRD REQUEST RE BRIEFING) by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
July 3, 2014 |
Filing 367
ORDER approving the parties' #366 Stipulation. The telephonic status conference scheduled for July 3, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. is VACATED and RESET for 7/31/2014 at 09:00 a.m. in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. The parties shall call into the status conference as instructed in the court's prior #357 Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/3/14. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EAJ)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing 366
STIPULATION STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER TO VACATE TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret)
|
July 2, 2014 |
Filing 365
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #364 STIPULATION Extending Briefing Dates and Requesting Continuance of Hearing Date. Responses due by 8/14/2014. Replies due by 8/28/2014. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/2/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 26, 2014 |
Filing 364
STIPULATION AND PROPOSED ORDER EXTENDING BRIEFING DATES & REQUESTING CONTINUANCE OF HEARING DATE by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
June 18, 2014 |
Filing 363
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Telephonic Dispute Resolution held on 6/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Teresa K. Hoskin; Pla Counsel: Mark Danis and Bill Grimm; Def Counsel: Jon Blum and Margaret Foley; Time of Hearing: 4:33 pm - 4:50 pm; A dispute arose during a deposition, and various proposals to resolve the dispute were discussed. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing 361
NOTICE OF RE-FILING OF CONCISE STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT PHILOMENA OSEMWENGIE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON JANUARY 23, 2014, et al. by Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Foley, Margaret)
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing 360
NOTICE OF RE-FILING OF DEFENDANT PHILOMENA OSEMWENGIE'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED ON JANUARY 23, 2014, et al. by Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Foley, Margaret)
|
June 11, 2014 |
Filing 359
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #358 Stipulation Extending/Staying Discovery, Extending Various Deadlines re 344 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment and Setting Status Check Hearing. Discovery is STAYED until 7/3/2014 except as outlined in Order. Responses re 344 SEALED MOTION for Summary Judgment are due by 7/15/2014. Replies due by 7/29/2014. A telephonic status conference is set for 7/3/2014 at 10:30 AM. The parties shall call in as instructed in the court's prior #357 order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 06/11/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC) Modified on 6/20/2014 (EAJ).
|
June 9, 2014 |
Filing 358
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) Staying Discovery, Extending Various Deadlines and Setting Status Check Hearing by Defendants Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 356
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #342 Stipulation to Seal 288 Motion for Summary Judgment and 291 Statement of Separate Concise Statement of Undisputed Material Facts in Support of Defendant Philomena Osemwengie's Motion for Summary Judgment. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 06/06/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
June 6, 2014 |
Filing 355
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ThirdParty Defendant National Deaf Academy, LLC, Defendant National Deaf Academy, LLC. (Stryker, Eric)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 357
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference - Telephonic Status Check held on 6/5/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Judicial Assistant: Teresa K. Hoskins; Pla Counsel: Mark Danis; Def Counsel: Jon Blum; Time of Hearing: 4:01 PM - 4:09 PM; Courtroom: LV Chambers; IT IS ORDERED that the parties shall submit a stipulation and proposed order consistent with the discussions during the conference call with the court. Status Conference set for 7/3/2014 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Counsel shall be connected to the conference call by dialing (702) 868-4907, Conference Code: 123456, no later than 10:25 a.m. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
June 5, 2014 |
Filing 353
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Deborah Hill and Joseph Hill re #351 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default of Third-Party Defendant Deborah Hill and #352 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default of Third-Party Defendant Joseph Hill. (AC)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 352
MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default of Third-Party Defendant Joseph Hill by Third Party Plaintiffs Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz. Motion ripe 6/4/2014. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 351
MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default of Third-Party Defendant Deborah Hill by Third Party Plaintiffs Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz. Motion ripe 6/4/2014. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 350
SERVICE by Publication filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz. Last publication date 03/14/2014. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
June 4, 2014 |
Filing 349
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference - Telephonic Status Conference held on 6/4/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Judicial Assistant: Teresa K. Hoskins; Pla Counsel: Erin Liotta, Bill Grimm, Leecia Welch, Mark Danis & Sarah Davis; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Jon Blum & Alan LeFebvre; Time of Hearing: 4:34 PM - 4:51 PM; Courtroom: LV Chambers; IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall confer by 6/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 30, 2014 |
Filing 348
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Settlement Conference - Telephinc Status Check held on 5/30/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Judicial Assistant: Teresa K. Hoskins; Pla Counsel: Jack London, Leecia Welch, Mark Danis, Sarah Davis & Bill Grimm; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Jon Blum & Alan LeFebvre; Time of Hearing: 4:02 PM - 4:20 PM; IT IS ORDERED that a follow-up Telephonic Conference is set for 6/2/2014 04:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Counsel shall be connected to the conference call by dialing in on the Chambers' Meet Me Line at (702) 868-4907, Conference Code: 123456, no later than 4:25 p.m. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 27, 2014 |
Filing 345
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 5/27/2014. IT IS ORDERED that the Request for Exemption from Settlement Conference (Dkt. #343) is GRANTED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH)
|
May 23, 2014 |
Filing 343
MOTION Exception to Settlement Conference Attendance Requirement; filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. Responses due by 6/9/2014. (Foley, Margaret)
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing 342
STIPULATION by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret)
|
May 21, 2014 |
Filing 341
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by ThirdParty Plaintiff Yvette Chevalier. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
May 20, 2014 |
Filing 340
ORDER Granting #338 Plaintiffs' Motion for Exception to Settlement Conference Attendance Requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 05/19/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 16, 2014 |
Filing 338
MOTION for Exception to Settlement Conference Attendance Requirement filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
May 16, 2014 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #338 RESPONSE-Other. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Mark Danis. CORRECTION: Clerk's office modified event as #338 MOTION for Exception to Settlement Conference Attendance Requirement. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
May 13, 2014 |
Filing 337
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #336 Stipulation for Continuance of Evidentiary Hearing re #313 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel and 288 Motion for Summary Judgment. Evidentiary Hearing reset for 7/7/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom to be determined before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 12, 2014 |
Filing 336
STIPULATION re #329 Minute Order Setting Hearing on Motion,, ; Continuance of Evidentiary Hearing and Oral Argument by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
May 7, 2014 |
Filing 335
ORDER Granting in part #280 Third Party Defendant's Motion to Dismiss or Stay and To Transfer Venue and the #267 First Amended Third-Party Complaint is DISMISSED as against National Deaf Academy, LLC. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 294 Third Party Plaintiff's Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Faiza Ebrahim, Kate Walker, Erin Liotta, and Leecia Welch must appear at the 5/15/2015 hearing prepared to testify as to the #313 Motion to DisqualifyCounsel. National Deaf Academy, LLC terminated. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 05/07/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
May 5, 2014 |
Filing 334
SERVICE by Publication filed by Third Party Plaintiffs Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz. Last publication date 04/18/2014. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
April 30, 2014 |
Filing 333
ORDER Scheduling Settlement Conference: Settlement Conference set for 5/27/2014 09:30 AM in LV Chambers before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. The settlement conference statements shall be received in chambers, Room 3071, no later than 4:00 p.m., 5/20/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 04/28/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
April 24, 2014 |
Filing 330
REPLY to Response to #313 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit F, #2 Exhibit Exhibit G)(Foley, Margaret)
|
April 23, 2014 |
Filing 329
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 4/23/2014 by Deputy Clerk: Ari Caytuero. IT IS ORDERED that a Motion Hearing re: 288 Motion for Summary Judgment, #280 Motion to Dismiss, #313 Motion to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel, and 294 SEALED Counter-Motion for Jurisdictional Discovery is set for 5/15/2014 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom to be determined before Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
April 22, 2014 |
Filing 332
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 4/22/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Mark Danis, Esq., Sarah Danis, Esq.; Def Counsel: John Bloom, Esq., Margaret Foley, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:40:45 - 2:53:18; Time of Hearing: 2:30pm; Courtroom: 3B; The Court hears the respective positions of Counsel concerning any progress they have made since the last hearing as they have not contacted this Court's Courtroom Administrator to schedule a settlement conference. The Court confirms with Counsel that this case will not be transferred to another Magistrate Judge in the event that a settlement conference is unsuccessful. The Court hears from Counsel regarding some matters issues that they are attempting to resolve. The Court goes OFF RECORD at 2:53pm to discuss scheduling options with Counsel for the settlement conference. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing 328
DECLARATION of Katharine Walker re #325 Response to #313 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kaiser, Aurora) Linked to motion. (ASB)
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing 327
DECLARATION of Aurora V. Kaiser re #325 Response to #313 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Kaiser, Aurora) Linked to motion. (ASB)
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing 326
DECLARATION of William Grimm re #325 Response to #313 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Kaiser, Aurora) Linked to motion. (ASB)
|
April 14, 2014 |
Filing 325
RESPONSE to #313 MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel, filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. Replies due by 4/24/2014. (Kaiser, Aurora)
|
April 13, 2014 |
Filing 324
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, held on 4/8/2014, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/4/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/14/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/12/2014. (MG)
|
April 11, 2014 |
Filing 323
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 311 Status Conference held on 3/18/2014, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2014. (MG)
|
April 11, 2014 |
Filing 322
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 300 Status Conference held on 2/3/2014, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 5/2/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/12/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/10/2014. (MG)
|
April 9, 2014 |
Filing 321
NOTICE Letter to Judge Leen re: Court's direction to schedule settlement conference by Clark County, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Tom Morton, Don Burnette, Virginia Valentine, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Philomena Osemwengie, Stacey Scott, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret)
|
April 9, 2014 |
Filing 320
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 4/9/2014. By Deputy Clerk: Jeff Miller. By Judicial Assistant: Teresa Hoskin. IT IS ORDERED: Status Conference set for 4/22/2014 is RESET IN TIME ONLY to 2:30 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
April 8, 2014 |
Filing 319
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 4/8/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Karie Wilson, Esq., Mark Danis, Esq.; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Esq., John Bloom, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:20:30 - 11:09:20; Time of Hearing: 10:00am; Courtroom: 3C; The Court has set this matter on Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence... #284 , Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply... #302 , and Plaintiffs' SEALED Motion 310 . IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' Motion for Leave to File Reply... #302 is GRANTED. The Court hears the respective arguments of Counsel regarding the remaining pending motions. Counsel also jointly represent that they feel they may be prepared for a Settlement Conference after completion of some additional discovery. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' SEALED Motion 310 is GRANTED IN PART/DENIED IN PART as stated in open court. The Court makes findings for the record.Status and Dispute Resolution Conference set for 4/22/2014 @ 2:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. The Court directs Counsel to confer with each other and then to contact this Court's Courtroom Administrator to schedule a Settlement Conference date consistent with the schedule discussed in open court. IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' Motion in Limine to Exclude Evidence... #284 is DENIED as premature. Certain discovery deadlines are extended consistent with the Court's direction as stated in open court. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
April 3, 2014 |
Filing 316
DECLARATION re #315 Response to 310 SEALED Rule 37(A) and Rule 37(D) MOTION to Compel Depositions of Clark County's Witnesses and for Sanctions Against Clark County filed by Defendant Clark County. (Witty, Cayla) Linked to proper motion. (ASB)
|
April 3, 2014 |
Filing 315
RESPONSE to 310 SEALED Rule 37(A) and Rule 37(D) MOTION to Compel Depositions of Clark County's Witnesses and for Sanctions Against Clark County, filed by Defendant Clark County. Response in Opposition to Sealed Motion for Sanctions Replies due by 4/13/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit Three)(Witty, Cayla) Linked to proper motion. (ASB)
|
March 28, 2014 |
Filing 313
MOTION to Disqualify Plaintiffs' Counsel by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. Motion ripe 3/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit C, #3 Exhibit D, #4 Exhibit E)(Foley, Margaret) Removed duplicate wording. (ASB)
|
March 24, 2014 |
Filing 312
NOTICE of Hearing on #284 MOTION in Limine, and 310 Rule 37(A) and Rule 37(D) MOTION to Compel Depositions of Clark County's Witnesses and for Sanctions Against Clark County : Motion Hearing/Status Conference set for 4/8/2014 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH) Modified on 3/24/2014 (TKH).
|
March 18, 2014 |
Filing 311
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 3/18/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Mark Danis, Esq., Sarah Davis, Esq., Sarah Dickey, Esq.; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Esq., John Bloom, Esq., Cayla Witty, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:44:45 - 10:15:43; Time of Hearing: 9:30am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed Counsels' Joint Status Report #309 and hears the representations of Counsel concerning recently produced materials to Plaintiffs' Counsel, ESI, and Rule 30(b)(6) depositions currently scheduled. Plaintiff's Counsel memorializes an agreement they have reached with Defense Counsel on the record in which County Counsel will produce agreed upon ESI materials by the end of the month. Defense Counsel concurs that they will complete the production of the agreed upon materials by the last judicial day of March, 2014. SO ORDERED. The Court hears the respective positions of Counsel concerning issues surrounding scheduled Rule 30(b)(6) depositions. Plaintiffs have also filed a related SEALED Motion. IT IS ORDERED: Plaintiffs' Reply deadline to their SEALED Motion is compressed to 3 days after Defense Counsel files their opposition in the normal course. A Motions Hearing will be calendared shortly after briefing is completed. Counsel make their respective arguments concerning additional discovery and scheduling issues. The Court will reserve ruling on Counsels' scheduling requests until after the Motions Hearing. This Court will confer with the District Judge to determine which Motions this Court will be deciding. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
March 14, 2014 |
Filing 309
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I., Third Party Plaintiffs Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz, Defendants Yvette Chevalier, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Debbie Mallwitz, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Danis, Mark)
|
February 28, 2014 |
Filing 308
REPLY to Response to 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Defendant Philomena Osemwengie. (Foley, Margaret)
|
February 12, 2014 |
Filing 303
ORDER Granting #301 Defendants/Third-Party Plaintiffs Motion to Extend Time to Serve the #267 Amended Third-Party Complaint. Proof of service due by 5/20/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 02/12/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
February 11, 2014 |
Filing 302
MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Plaintiffs' Opposition #297 to Motion #248 in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiffs' Damages for Failure to Disclose Computation of Damages Required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(A)(1)(A)(iii) by Defendants Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz. Motion ripe 2/11/2014. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
February 10, 2014 |
Filing 301
MOTION to Extend Time to Serve the Amended Third-Party Complaint Upon Deborah and Joseph Hill by Third Party Plaintiffs Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz. Responses due by 2/27/2014. (Blum, Jonathan) Modified motion type. (ASB)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing 300
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 2/3/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Karie Wilson, Esq., Sarah Davis, Esq.; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Esq., Cayla Witty, Esq., John Blum, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:35:55 - 10:51:18; Time of Hearing: 10:30am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed Counsels' Joint Status Report #296 and hears the representations of Counsel concerning pending discovery production and upcoming deposition scheduling. The Court hears the respective positions of Counsel regarding an extension of discovery deadlines. IT IS ORDERED: The Court will grant a 60 day extension of the existing deadlines for the purposes described in the Joint Status Report unless good cause is shown for any other limited extensions for limited purposes. Status Conference set for 3/18/2014 @ 09:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Counsel shall file a Joint Status Report by 3/14/2014. This Court will coordinate with the District Judge regarding pending motions.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing 298
JOINDER to 293 RESPONSE to #280 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Witty, Cayla) Removed duplicate wording and linked to documents. (ASB)
|
February 3, 2014 |
Filing 297
RESPONSE to #284 MOTION in Limine filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I. (Danis, Mark) Removed duplicate wording. (ASB) Modified to add all plaintiffs on 2/5/2014 (RFJ).
|
January 31, 2014 |
Filing 296
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
January 24, 2014 |
Filing 292
NOTICE IN RESPONSE TO THIS COURT'S ORDER RE PLAINTIFFS MAKING A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT REGARDING MASON I. by Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I. re #281 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,. (Danis, Mark)
|
January 23, 2014 |
Filing 290
DECLARATION of Margaret G. Foley, Esq. in Support of Defendant Philomena Osemwengie's Motion for Summary Judgment re 288 MOTION for Summary Judgment ; by Defendant Philomena Osemwengie. (Foley, Margaret)
|
January 22, 2014 |
Filing 287
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 283 Status Conference,,,,, held on 1-15-14, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, 530-913-9213. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2014. (KF)
|
January 22, 2014 |
Filing 286
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 273 Status Conference,,,, held on 12-10-13, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, 530-913-9213. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 2/12/2014. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/22/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/22/2014. (KF)
|
January 21, 2014 |
Filing 285
JOINDER to #284 MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiffs' Damages for Failure to Disclose Computation of Damages Required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1)(A)(iii) filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Foley, Margaret) Linked to motion. (ASB)
|
January 17, 2014 |
Filing 284
MOTION in Limine to Exclude Evidence of Plaintiffs' Damages for Failure to Disclose Computation of Damages Required by Fed.R.Civ.P. 26(a)(1)(A)(iii) by Defendants Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz. Responses due by 2/3/2014. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
January 15, 2014 |
Filing 283
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 1/15/2014 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Karie Wilson, Esq., Sarah Davis, Esq.; Def Counsel: John Blum, Esq., Margaret Foley, Esq., Cayla Witty, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 8:47:26 - 9:18:15; Time of Hearing: 8:45am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court summarizes the previous proceedings. The Court hears the respective positions of Counsel concerning issues with E.S.I.. Counsel for the Clark County Defendants articulates concerns over the deposition of Director Lisa Ruiz-Lee, and Plaintiffs' Counsel argues in response. The Court will allow one final session of Miss Ruiz-Lee's deposition, which will be limited to four hours. Plaintiffs' Counsel are further directed to file any request for relief in the form of a motion if they feel, after the four hour session, that Defense Counsel did not produce a knowledgeable witness. The Court hears the respective positions of Counsel concerning issues with Rule 30(b)(6) depositions. Status Conference CONTINUED to 2/3/2014 @ 10:30 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Joint Status Report due by 1/31/2014 @ 4:00pm.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
January 13, 2014 |
Filing 282
ORDER Granting #209 Plaintiff's Motion to Seal 207 Declaration. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/13/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 10, 2014 |
Filing 281
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part #185 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss or for a More Definite Statement. A More Definitive Statement is due within 14 days of the entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 01/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
|
January 9, 2014 |
Filing 280
MOTION to Dismiss re: #267 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT for Lack of Jurisdiction; or in the Alternative for Stay of Third Party Proceedings; filed by Third Party Defendant National Deaf Academy, LLC. Responses due by 1/26/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Stryker, Eric)
|
January 7, 2014 |
Filing 279
NOTICE of Change of Attorney on behalf of Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
December 27, 2013 |
Filing 278
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #277 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re #267 Amended Third Party Complaint. National Deaf Academy, LLC answer due 1/9/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/26/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 24, 2013 |
Filing 277
STIPULATION to extend time re #267 AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT; filed by ThirdParty Defendant National Deaf Academy, LLC, Defendant National Deaf Academy, LLC. (Stryker, Eric)
|
December 12, 2013 |
Filing 275
(1st Notice) NOTICE: of Non-Compliance with Special Order 109: that Kathleen A. Nelsonand Tim J. Heuvel is in violation of Special Order 109. Participation in the electronic filing system became mandatory for all attorneys effective January 1, 2006. You are required to register for the Courts Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) program and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Courts website www.nvd.uscourts.gov, then select CM/ECF Info, to register the Attorneys. (ASB)
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing 276
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #185 MOTION to Dismiss held on 12/11/2013 before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 2:03 - 2:13 p.m.; Courtroom: 4B; Appearances are noted on the record. Representations of counsel are heard. The Court takes this matter under submission. Written ruling of the Court will issue. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
December 11, 2013 |
Filing 274
ORDER that the following discovery plan and scheduling order deadlines will be extended as follows: Discovery due by 5/1/2014. Motions due by 6/2/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/14/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 10, 2013 |
Filing 273
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 12/10/2013 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Mark Danis, Esq., Sarah Davis, Esq.; Def Counsel: Cayla Witty, Esq., Margaret Foley, Esq., Alan Lefebvre, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 8:48:06 - 9:08:45; Time of Hearing: 8:45am; Courtroom: 3B; Counsel update the Court on the progress made concerning the E.S.I. production that had been previously discussed. The Court also hears updates regarding the production of licensing files and the deposition schedule that Counsel are working to complete. After the Court hears Counsels' representations, the parties next discuss and adjustment to the Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order dates. IT IS ORDERED: The discovery cutoff will be EXTENDED to 1/31/2014 will all related dates to be extended in a corresponding fashion. Separate Written Order shall issue, IT IS ORDERED: Status Conference set for 1/15/2014 @ 8:45 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing 272
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 265 Status Conference held on 11/13/2013, before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2014. (MG)
|
December 9, 2013 |
Filing 271
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 237 Order on Motion to Compel Motion Hearing before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 12/30/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/9/2014. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/9/2014. (MG)
|
December 5, 2013 |
Filing 270
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yvette Chevalier re #267 Amended Complaint. National Deaf Academy, LLC served on 12/4/2013, answer due 12/25/2013. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
December 5, 2013 |
Filing 269
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Yvette Chevalier re #256 Answer to Complaint, Third Party Complaint. National Deaf Academy, LLC served on 11/20/2013, answer due 12/11/2013. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
December 3, 2013 |
Filing 268
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/3/2013. ORDERED that Oral Argument RE: #185 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended complaint; or in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement is set for Wednesday, December 11, 2013 at 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 4B before Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 21, 2013 |
Filing 267
AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Deborah Hill, Joseph Hill, National Deaf Academy, LLC, filed by Yvette Chevalier. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 3/21/2014. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 21, 2013 |
Filing 266
AMENDED THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Deborah Hill, Joseph Hill, filed by Debbie Mallwitz. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 3/21/2014. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 13, 2013 |
Filing 265
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 11/13/2013 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Mark David, Esq., Sarah Davis, Esq., Sarah M. Dickey, Esq.; Def Counsel: Alan Lefebvre, Esq., Margaret Foley, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 9:20:53 - 10:07:01; Time of Hearing: 9:00am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed the Joint Status Report #262 and Defendants' SEALED Motion 236 . The Court and Counsel discuss the issues raised in the Joint Status Report, beginning with Counsels' Electronically Stored Information (E.S.I.) protocol. IT IS ORDERED: Clark County Defendants shall produce the first wave of E.S.I. no later than 11/27/2013 unless good cause is shown why they cannot meet that deadline. The parties next address the Rule 30(b)(6) matters, and Plaintiff's Counsel agrees to provide Defense Counsel with additional records to assist in locating a Rule 30(b)(6) designee for the topics discussed. The Court and Counsel next discuss and clarify generic "medical care" topics. The parties next discuss issues concerning placement information. The parties agree to confer further, and the Court expects Clark County to produce a Rule 30(b)(6) designee on this matter as discussed in open court. The Court next raises the issue of the licensing files. Clark County is in the process of collecting these files. The Court directs that Clark County should prioritize their efforts to collect all the files for one child at a time, make those files available for inspection and copying, and then notify Plaintiff's Counsel who can review the entirety of the files and determine what is relevant or not. Plaintiffs would then pay for the costs of reproduction at a reasonable litigation rate. IT IS ORDERED: Clark County shall have until 11/27/2013 to have files ready for inspection and copying for the first child. Counsel next state their respective positions concerning an extension of the discovery deadlines. The Court will continue these proceedings. Status Conference set for 12/10/2013 @ 08:45 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. This will allow the parties to make progess with the E.S.I., depositions, and licensing file inspection. The Court will grant parties a 30 days extention of the deadlines at this time, and will address additional extensions on 12/10/2013. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
November 12, 2013 |
Filing 264
Summons Issued as to Deborah Hill, Joseph Hill, and National Deaf Academy, LLC. (ASB)
|
November 12, 2013 |
Filing 263
Summons Issued as to Deborah Hill and Joseph Hill. (ASB)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 262
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Report by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 261
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Joseph Hill, an individual, filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Debbie Mallwitz. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 260
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Deborah Hill, an individual, filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Debbie Mallwitz. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 259
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued National Deaf Academy, LLC, a Florida limited liability compay, filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Yvette Chevalier. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 258
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Joseph Hill, an individual, filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Yvette Chevalier. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 257
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Deborah Hill, an individual, filed by ThirdParty Plaintiff Yvette Chevalier. (Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 256
ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Deborah Hill, Joseph Hill, National Deaf Academy, LLC, a Florida limited liability company filed by Yvette Chevalier.(Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 8, 2013 |
Filing 255
ANSWER to Complaint , THIRD PARTY COMPLAINT against Deborah Hill, Joseph Hill filed by Debbie Mallwitz.(Blum, Jonathan)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing 254
DECLARATION of Aurora V. Kaiser in support of #253 RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Danis, Mark)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing 253
RESPONSE to #234 Clark County Defendants' Ex Parte Request to Supplement Briefing by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Linda E., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
November 5, 2013 |
Filing 252
NOTICE of Hearing on 236 SEALED Emergency MOTION to Extend Time regarding discovery/nondispositive matter (Fourth Request) : Motion Hearing set for 11/13/2013, 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, to be heard at the status conference which is currently scheduled for the same date and time.(no image attached)(TKH)
|
November 1, 2013 |
Filing 251
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER re: 236 Emergency MOTION to Extend Time #140 SCHEDULING ORDER; filed by Defendants Yvette Chevalier, Debbie Mallwitz . (Blum, Jonathan)
|
October 28, 2013 |
Filing 248
JOINDER to #185 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Foley, Margaret) Linked to motion. (ASB)
|
October 22, 2013 |
Filing 247
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #246 Stipulation Regarding Mootness. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/21/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 21, 2013 |
Filing 246
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Regarding Mootness by Defendants Amber Howell, Michael Willden. (Anderson, Linda)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 245
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 244
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Victor C. Philomena Osemwengie served on 9/24/2013, answer due 10/15/2013. (Davis, Sarah)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 243
ORDER Granting #229 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Tim J. Heuvel for Clark County et al., and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Margaret G Foley. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/17/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
October 17, 2013 |
Filing 242
ORDER Granting #228 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Kathleen A. Nelson for Clark County et al., and approving Designation of Local Counsel for Attorney Margaret G Foley. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/17/2013. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing 241
CERTIFICATE of Mailing; by Thor Martinez on 10/3/2013; executed by Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Victor C. (Davis, Sarah) Event modified on 10/16/2013 (RFJ).
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing 240
SUMMONS Returned Executed; by Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Victor C. re #1 Complaint, , . Stacey Scott served on 9/26/2013, answer due 10/17/2013. (Davis, Sarah) Event modified on 10/16/2013 (RFJ).
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing 239
SUMMONS Returned Executed; by Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Victor C. re 176 SECOND Amended Complaint. Debbie Mallwitz served on 10/8/2013, answer due 10/29/2013. (Davis, Sarah) Event modified on 10/16/2013 (RFJ).
|
October 15, 2013 |
Filing 238
SUMMONS Returned Executed; by Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Victor C. re 176 SECOND Amended Complaint, . Yvette Chevalier served on 10/8/2013, answer due 10/29/2013. (Davis, Sarah) Event modified on 10/16/2013 (RFJ).
|
October 10, 2013 |
Filing 237
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 10/10/2013 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: E. Garcia; Pla Counsel: Karie Wilson, William Grimm and Sarah Davis; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley and Alan Lefebvne; Court Reporter/FTR #: 8:58a.m. - 9:37a.m.; Time of Hearing: 9:00a.m.; Courtroom: 3B; The Court makes preliminary remarks and hears representations of counsel as to #215 Motion to Compel Discovery from County Defendants. For the reasons stated on the record, the Court requires the IT person that Defendant's counsel believes is the most knowledgeable about DFS ESI to meet and confer with Plaintiff's counsel and Plaintiff's experts to negotiate an appropriate ESI protocol. Defendants' counsel addresses extending discovery deadlines. Parties are required to go forward with Ms. Ruiz' deposition on the notice topics. Defendants' counsel is requited to have face to face discussions about the eleven (11) topics counsel is willing to produce a witness on. The productions of licensing files are addressed. Status Conference set for Wednesday, November 13, 2013 at 9:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Parties are required to submit to the Court a joint status report by the Friday before, indicating the progress made, as stated on the record. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EMG)
|
October 7, 2013 |
Filing 235
REPLY to Response to #215 MOTION to Compel Discovery from County Defendants filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Delia D., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
October 4, 2013 |
Filing 234
NOTICE of Supplemental Lodgment by Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine re #185 MOTION to Dismiss . (Foley, Margaret)
|
October 3, 2013 |
Filing 233
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #228 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen Nelson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Margaret G. Foley (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2977423) filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Teresa by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Foley, Margaret)
|
October 2, 2013 |
Filing 232
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #229 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tim J. Vanden Heuvel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Margaret G. Foley (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2977432) filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Te by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Foley, Margaret)
|
September 30, 2013 |
Filing 231
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required to #228 & #229 VERIFIED PETITIONS. ERROR: No Certificates of Good Standing are attached to either Verified Petition, as required by LR 10-2. ACTION REQUIRED: Attorney Margaret Foley advised to file two Notices of Corrected Image/Document events under the Notices category and link to #228 VERIFIED PETITION and #229 VERIFIED PETITION to include the entire Verified Petition with a Certificate of Good Standing for each Pro Hac Vice attorney. Questions may be answered by contacting the Help Desk at (702) 464-5555. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing 230
RESPONSE to #215 MOTION to Compel Discovery from County Defendants, filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. Replies due by 10/7/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits A through D)(Foley, Margaret)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing 229
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Tim J. Vanden Heuvel and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Margaret G. Foley (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2977432) filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers . Motion ripe 9/27/2013. (Foley, Margaret) Corrected Image #232 filed on 10/2/13. (ASB)
|
September 27, 2013 |
Filing 228
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kathleen Nelson and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Margaret G. Foley (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2977423) filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers . Motion ripe 9/27/2013. (Foley, Margaret) Corrected Image #233 filed on 10/3/13. (ASB)
|
September 26, 2013 |
Filing 227
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Don Burnette, Sylvia Clark, Clark County, Teresa Cragon, Darrel Ford, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Stacey Scott, Virginia Valentine, Sonya Weathers. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Foley, Margaret)
|
September 24, 2013 |
Filing 226
RESPONSE to #224 Notice (Other), #225 Notice (Other), ; filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Foley, Margaret)
|
September 23, 2013 |
Filing 225
NOTICE OF PARTIAL WITHDRAWAL OF PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY FROM COUNTY DEFENDANTS AND REQUEST TO MAINTAIN HEARING DATE by Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I. re #215 MOTION to Compel Discovery from County Defendants. (Danis, Mark)
|
September 20, 2013 |
Filing 224
NOTICE - PLAINTIFFS' INFORMATIONAL NOTICE REGARDING ORDER ON CUSTODY OF MASON I. by Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
September 19, 2013 |
Filing 223
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry A. Sonya Weathers served on 9/15/2013, answer due 10/6/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
September 19, 2013 |
Filing 222
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry A. Stacey Scott served on 9/15/2013, answer due 10/6/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
September 19, 2013 |
Filing 221
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry A. Teresa Cragon served on 9/15/2013, answer due 10/6/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
September 19, 2013 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #221 , #222 , and #223 Affidavits. CORRECTION: Affidavits filed by attorney Karie Wilson modified as #221 , #222 , and #223 SUMMONS Returned Executed. Because the Amended Complaint is filed under seal, counsel cannot properly file these documents. As such, counsel will continue to file these documents as Affidavits in this case and the Clerk's Office will modify them appropriately. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
September 18, 2013 |
Filing 220
ORDER ON STIPULATION Denying #214 Stipulation for Extension of Discovery Deadlines and Scheduling Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 18, 2013 |
Filing 219
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry A. Darrel Ford served on 9/12/2013, answer due 10/3/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
September 18, 2013 |
Filing 218
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Henry A. . Patricia Martin served on 8/16/2013, answer due 9/6/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
September 18, 2013 |
Filing 217
NOTICE of Hearing on #215 MOTION to Compel Discovery from County Defendants : Motion Hearing set for 10/10/2013 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (no image attached)(TKH)
|
September 18, 2013 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #218 and #219 Affidavits. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Karie Wilson. CORRECTION: Clerk's office modified events as #218 and #219 SUMMONS Returned Executed. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
September 10, 2013 |
Filing 215
MOTION to Compel Discovery from County Defendants by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. Responses due by 9/27/2013. (Danis, Mark)
|
September 10, 2013 |
Filing 214
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) Regarding Discovery Deadlines by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Foley, Margaret)
|
September 5, 2013 |
Filing 213
REPLY to Response to #185 MOTION to Dismiss filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Patricia Martin, Tom Morton, Philomena Osemwengie, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Foley, Margaret)
|
August 29, 2013 |
Filing 212
NOTICE of Non-Opposition by Henry A. re #209 MOTION to Seal 207 Declaration, - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT D OF THE DECLARATION OF AURORA KAISER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO CLARK COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ST. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing 211
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #209 MOTION to Seal 207 Declaration, - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT D OF THE DECLARATION OF AURORA KAISER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO CLARK COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ST, #210 Declaration, by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Delia D., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing 210
DECLARATION of DINAH X. ORTIZ re #209 MOTION to Seal 207 Declaration, - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT D OF THE DECLARATION OF AURORA KAISER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO CLARK COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND ST ; filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Delia D., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing 209
MOTION to Seal 207 Declaration, - PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO SEAL EXHIBIT D OF THE DECLARATION OF AURORA KAISER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS' OPPOSITION TO CLARK COUNTY DEFENDANTS' MOTION TO DISMISS THE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND STATE DEFENDANTS'S JOINDER - by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Delia D., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Mason I.. Motion ripe 8/27/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiffs' Motion to Seal)(Danis, Mark)
|
August 27, 2013 |
Filing 208
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Delia D., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Mason I.. (Danis, Mark)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing 205
Summons Issued as to Yvette Chevalier, Teresa Cragon, Philomena Osemwengie, Stacey Scott. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons)(RFJ)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing 204
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing 203
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing 202
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 15, 2013 |
Filing 201
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing 200
AMENDED STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #185 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing 199
NOTICE: Attorney Action Required #195 , #196 , #197 and #198 to Proposed Summons to be issued: ERROR: Summons not issued due to wrong summons form used. CORRECTION: Attorney Karie N. Wilson advised to download and complete, pursuant to FRCP 4, "AO 440 (Rev. 6/12) Summons in a Civil Action" form from the Court's Website at www.nvd.uscourts.gov and refile using the event "Proposed Summons to be issued" (no image attached)(RFJ)
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing 198
ERROR: Wrong form used. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile using correct summons form, PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Yvette Chevalier, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie) Modified on 8/13/2013 (RFJ).
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing 197
ERROR: Wrong form used. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile using correct summons form, PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Philomena Osemwengie, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie) Modified on 8/13/2013 (RFJ).
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing 196
ERROR: Wrong form used. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile using correct summons form, PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Stacey Scott, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie) Modified on 8/13/2013 (RFJ).
|
August 13, 2013 |
Filing 195
ERROR: Wrong form used. CORRECTION: Attorney advised to refile using correct summons form, PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Teresa Cragon, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie) Modified on 8/13/2013 (RFJ).
|
August 9, 2013 |
Filing 194
JOINDER to #185 MOTION to Dismiss ; State Defendants' Joinder To County's Motion to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion For More Definite Statement filed by Defendants Amber Howell, Michael Willden. (Anderson, Linda)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing 193
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) re #185 MOTION to Dismiss ; by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing 192
Summons Issued as to Sylvia Clark, Darrel Ford, Debbie Mallwitz, Patricia Martin, Thor Martinez, and Sonya Weathers. (ASB)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing 191
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Sonya Weathers, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing 190
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Thor Martinez, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing 189
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Patricia Martin, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing 188
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Debbie Mallwitz, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing 187
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Darrel Ford, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 8, 2013 |
Filing 186
PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued for Sylvia Clark, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 1, 2013 |
Filing 185
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. Responses due by 8/18/2013. (Foley, Margaret)
|
July 22, 2013 |
Filing 184
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Amber Howell, Michael Willden. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Anderson, Linda)
|
July 19, 2013 |
Filing 183
ANSWER to Complaint filed by Amber Howell, Michael Willden. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/29/2013. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 9/2/2013.(Anderson, Linda)
|
July 17, 2013 |
Filing 182
NOTICE of Withdrawal re #180 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentin. (Foley, Margaret)
|
July 16, 2013 |
Filing 181
RESPONSE to #180 Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. Replies due by 7/26/2013. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Karie N. Wilson, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit Danis Declaration Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit Danis Declaration Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit Danis Declaration Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit Danis Declaration Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit Danis Declaration Exhibit 5)(Wilson, Karie)
|
July 16, 2013 |
Filing 180
Emergency MOTION for Protective Order filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. Motion ripe 7/16/2013. (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Foley, Margaret)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 179
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #175 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 1/31/2014. Motions due by 2/12/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 3/27/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 15, 2013 |
Filing 178
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
July 12, 2013 |
Filing 177
ORDER Granting #174 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dinah A. Ortiz and approving Designation of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson for Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I... Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/12/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 11, 2013 |
Filing 175
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) of Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
July 9, 2013 |
Filing 174
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Dinah X. Ortiz and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2880856) filed by Plaintiff Henry A. . Motion ripe 7/9/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
June 21, 2013 |
Filing 173
ORDER Granting #169 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mark W. Danis and approving Designation of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson for Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I... Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/21/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 21, 2013 |
Filing 172
ORDER Granting #168 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Aurora V. Kaiser and approving Designation of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson for Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/21/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 21, 2013 |
Filing 171
ORDER Granting #167 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Sarah N. Davis and approving Designation of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson for Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/21/13. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing 170
NOTICE of Withdrawl of Jeffrey K. Rosenberg as Attorney by Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing 169
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. Danis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2861797) filed by Plaintiff Henry A. . Motion ripe 6/20/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing 168
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Aurora V. Kaiser and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2861789) filed by Plaintiff Henry A. . Motion ripe 6/20/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing 167
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Sarah N. Davis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2861773) filed by Plaintiff Henry A. . Motion ripe 6/20/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
June 20, 2013 |
Filing 166
ORDER granting in part and denying in part #146 Motion for Relief from Order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that #148 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. See Order for Specifics. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BLG)
|
June 18, 2013 |
Filing 165
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Karie)
|
June 18, 2013 |
Filing 164
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Karie)
|
June 18, 2013 |
Filing 163
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilson, Karie)
|
May 28, 2013 |
Filing 162
ORDER that #147 Motion to Intervene is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 160 Motion to Seal is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 5/23/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 21, 2013 |
Filing 161
DECLARATION of William Grimm re: 160 MOTION to File Under Seal; filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wilson, Karie)
|
May 16, 2013 |
Filing 159
STIPULATION and (Proposed) Order by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
April 25, 2013 |
Filing 158
REPLY to Response to #148 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
April 25, 2013 |
Filing 157
REPLY to Response to #147 MOTION to Intervene to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Henry A. Case filed by Intervenor Randal Dock. (MMM) (Additional attachment(s) added on 5/28/2013: #1 main document - REDACTED version) (MMM).
|
April 22, 2013 |
Filing 156
REPLY to Response to #146 MOTION to Amend/Correct #141 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,. or for Reconsideration filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Foley, Margaret)
|
April 15, 2013 |
Filing 155
RESPONSE to #148 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint, filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. Replies due by 4/25/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Foley, Margaret)
|
April 15, 2013 |
Filing 154
JOINDER to #153 Response to #147 MOTION to Intervene to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Henry A. Case filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(Foley, Margaret)
|
April 15, 2013 |
Filing 153
RESPONSE to #147 MOTION to Intervene to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Henry A. Case, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. Replies due by 4/25/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
April 11, 2013 |
Filing 152
RESPONSE to #146 MOTION to Amend/Correct #141 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,. or for Reconsideration, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. Replies due by 4/21/2013. (Wilson, Karie)
|
April 8, 2013 |
Filing 151
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #149 Memorandum, by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
April 5, 2013 |
Filing 149
MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Delia D., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I. re #148 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. (Van Voorhis, Kimberly)
|
April 5, 2013 |
Filing 148
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiffs Henry A., Charles B., Charlotte B., Leo C., Victor C., Delia D., Jonathan D., Maizy D., Linda E., Christine F., Olivia G., Mason I.. Responses due by 4/22/2013. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Van Voorhis, Kimberly)
|
March 28, 2013 |
Filing 147
MOTION to Intervene to File Amicus Curiae Brief in Support of the Henry A. Case by Intervenor Randal Dock. Responses due by 4/14/2013. (MMM)
|
March 25, 2013 |
Filing 146
MOTION to Amend/Correct #141 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,. or for Reconsideration by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. Responses due by 4/11/2013. (Foley, Margaret)
|
March 19, 2013 |
Filing 145
ORDER Granting #143 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney by Daniel J Reed and Bruno Wolfenzon. Plaintiffs shall continue to be represented by their co-counsel of record at Alverson Taylor Mortensen & Sanders and the National Center for Youth Law. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/19/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 15, 2013 |
Filing 144
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #142 Stipulation to Extend Deadlines. Discovery due by 10/28/2013. Motions due by 11/25/2013. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/27/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 3/15/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 15, 2013 |
NOTICE of Docket Correction to #143 NOTICE of Withdrawal. ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Bruno Wolfenzon. CORRECTION: Court modified entry as #143 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney. (no image attached)(ASB)
|
March 14, 2013 |
Filing 143
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Henry A. (Wolfenzon, Bruno)
|
March 11, 2013 |
Filing 142
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Regarding Scheduling Order by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
February 27, 2013 |
Filing 141
ORDER that the Motions to Dismiss #107 and #108 are Granted in part and Denied in part. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/27/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 11, 2013 |
Filing 140
SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 8/27/2013. Motions due by 9/26/2013. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 10/25/2013. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/10/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 4, 2013 |
Filing 139
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 137 Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2012, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/25/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 2/4/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 4/4/2013. (ABB)
|
December 11, 2012 |
Filing 138
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 134 Scheduling Conference,,,,,,,, held on 11-20-12, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Kathy French, 530-913-9213. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 1/1/2013. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 1/11/2013. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 3/11/2013. (KF)
|
December 11, 2012 |
Filing 137
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2012 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Karie Wilson, esq., William Grimm, esq., Daniel Reed, esq., Kimberly Van Voorhis, esq., Erin Liotta, esq.; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, esq., Shannon Richards, esq., Rachel Solow, esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:45:31 - 11:22:12; Time of Hearing: 10:45am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed the County Defendants' Motions to Stay #132 and #133 and the related briefing, and hears Counsels' respective positions on the merits. IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' Motions to Stay #132 and #133 are DENIED without prejudice to the Defendants filing any appropriate Motion for Protective Order as stated in open court. The Court makes findings for the record. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
December 10, 2012 |
Filing 136
REPLY to Response to #132 MOTION to Stay, #133 MOTION to Stay Discovery filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Foley, Margaret)
|
December 3, 2012 |
Filing 135
RESPONSE to #132 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of #107 and #108 Motions to Dismiss and #133 MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of #107 and #108 Motions to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. Replies due by 12/13/2012. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order)(Wilson, Karie)
|
November 20, 2012 |
Filing 134
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Scheduling Conference held on 11/20/2012 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Karie Wilson, Esq., William Grimm, Esq., Kimberly Van Voorhis, Esq.; Def Counsel: Linda Anderson, Esq., Margaret Foley, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 8:33:38 - 8:48:19; Time of Hearing: 8:30am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court has reviewed Counsels' Proposed Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order #130 , and hears representations as to the County Defendants' production of unredacted case files to Plaintiff's Counsel. IT IS ORDERED: County Defendants will have 7 days from today's date to certify they have completed the previously ordered production of documents/files, and shall ensure production of the complete files of the two children who remain in care, to Plaintiff's Counsel. The Court encourages Counsel to meet and confer with each other in the event there is a discrepancy in the production, and informs Counsel that it would be available to conduct a Telephonic Dispute Resolution in Chambers if necessary. The Court notes the filing of Defendants' Motions to Stay Discovery #132 and #133 . Counsel reserve their right to hold oral argument on these Motions once the briefing period expires. The Court and Counsel further discuss the potential Discovery Plan/Schedule in this case. The Court is inclined to defer issuing a formal schedule until after the Motions to Stay #132 and #133 are ruled on, and informs Counsel that that does not preclude them from starting written discovery and document exchanges. Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2012 @ 10:45 AM in LV Courtroom 3C before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Counsel may appear telephonically at these proceedings and shall contact Courtroom Administrator Jeff Miller no later than 12/10 to make arrangements.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing 133
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of #107 and #108 Motions to Dismiss by Defendants Don Burnette, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. Motion ripe 11/19/2012. (Foley, Margaret)
|
November 19, 2012 |
Filing 132
MOTION to Stay Discovery Pending Resolution of #107 and #108 Motions to Dismiss by Defendant Clark County. Motion ripe 11/19/2012. (Foley, Margaret)
|
November 9, 2012 |
Filing 131
NOTICE of Hearing: A Scheduling Conference set is for 11/20/2012, at 08:30 AM, in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, regarding #130 Supplemental Joint FRCP 26(f) Report and Proposed Discovery Plan. Out-of-state counsel may appear telephonically. Those appearing telephonically are instructed to call Jeff Miller, Courtroom Deputy, at (702) 464-5420 before 4:00 p.m., 11/19/2012 to indicate the name of the party participating and a telephone number where that party may be reached. The courtroom deputy will initiate the call for the hearing.(no image attached)(TKH)
|
November 6, 2012 |
Filing 130
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
November 1, 2012 |
Filing 129
ORDER Granting #126 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Jack W. Londen and approving Designation of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/1/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 1, 2012 |
Filing 128
ORDER Granting #125 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Kimberly N. VanVoorhis and approving Designation of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/1/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 1, 2012 |
Filing 127
ORDER Granting #123 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Attorney Erin Liotta and approving Designation of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 11/1/12. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 31, 2012 |
Filing 126
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jack W. Londen and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2584464) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Victor C.. Motion ripe 10/31/2012. (Wilson, Karie)
|
October 31, 2012 |
Filing 125
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Kimberly N. Van Voorhis and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2584444) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Victor C.. Motion ripe 10/31/2012. (Wilson, Karie)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing 124
REPLY to Response to #111 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #108 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #109 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #112 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Foley, Margaret)
|
September 24, 2012 |
Filing 123
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Erin Liotta and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Karie N. Wilson (Filing fee $ 200 receipt number 0978-2532333) filed by Plaintiff Henry A.. Motion ripe 9/24/2012. (Wilson, Karie)
|
September 18, 2012 |
Filing 122
ORDER that County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) ( #109 , #110 , #111 , #112 ) filed with the Court on August 21, 2012 will be consolidated with County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b)(6) #108 for purposes of ruling as the motions appear to be identical. FURTHER ORDERED that the #120 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Reply re #108 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Replies due by 9/24/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 9/18/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 17, 2012 |
Filing 120
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Reply to Response to #108 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, and Virginia Valentine. (Foley, Margaret)
|
September 14, 2012 |
Filing 121
ORDER Granting #118 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Dorothy L. Fernandez is relieved as counsel of record for Plaintiffs. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 9/13/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
September 14, 2012 |
Filing 119
REPLY to Response to #107 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement filed by Defendants Diane Comeaux, Amber Howell, Michael Willden. (Anderson, Linda) .
|
September 12, 2012 |
Filing 118
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL of Attorney Dorothy L. Fernandez filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., and Victor C. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing 117
RESPONSE to #108 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Victor C.. Replies due by 9/16/2012. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
September 6, 2012 |
Filing 116
RESPONSE to #107 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement, filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Victor C.. Replies due by 9/16/2012. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
August 30, 2012 |
Filing 115
NOTICE of Association of Counsel by Karie N. Wilson on behalf of Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Wilson, Karie)
|
August 27, 2012 |
Filing 114
JOINDER to #107 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement ; filed by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Foley, Margaret)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing 113
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE for #111 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #108 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #109 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #112 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, #110 MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendants Don Burnette, Clark County, Tom Morton, Lisa Ruiz-Lee, Virginia Valentine. (Foley, Margaret)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing 112
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant Virginia Valentine. Responses due by 9/7/2012. (Foley, Margaret)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing 111
MOTION to Dismiss Anended Complaint by Defendant Lisa Ruiz-Lee. Responses due by 9/7/2012. (Foley, Margaret)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing 110
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant Tom Morton. Responses due by 9/7/2012. (Foley, Margaret)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing 109
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint by Defendant Don Burnette. Responses due by 9/7/2012. (Foley, Margaret)
|
August 21, 2012 |
Filing 108
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Clark County. Responses due by 9/7/2012. (Foley, Margaret)
|
August 20, 2012 |
Filing 107
MOTION to Dismiss Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, for More Definite Statement filed by Defendant Michael Willden. Responses due by 9/6/2012. (Anderson, Linda)
|
August 3, 2012 |
Filing 106
ORDER ON STIPULATION re #102 Stipulation for Plaintiffs to File an Amended Complaint and for Defendants to Answer/Respond. Don Burnette answer due 8/20/2012; Clark County answer due 8/20/2012; Diane Comeaux answer due 8/20/2012; Amber Howell answer due 8/20/2012; Tom Morton answer due 8/20/2012; Lisa Ruiz-Lee answer due 8/20/2012; Virginia Valentine answer due 8/20/2012; Michael Willden answer due 8/20/2012. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/3/12. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 25, 2012 |
Filing 105
NOTICE of Disassociation of Certain Counsel filed by Plaintiff Henry A. (Wolfenzon, Bruno)
|
July 20, 2012 |
Filing 104
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Defendants, filed by Olivia G., Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Jonathan D., Leo C., Christine F., Victor C.. Adds and removes parties. Proof of service due by 11/17/2012. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service) (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
June 21, 2012 |
Filing 103
ORDER on Mandate as to #99 USCA Memorandum/Opinion and #100 USCA Mandate AFFIRMING in part, REVERSING in part, and REMANDING the judgment of the District Court re #89 Notice of Appeal, filed by Delia D., Sheldon H., Maizy D., Olivia G., Linda E., Mason I., Christine F., Henry A., Jonathan D., Charles B., Leo C., Victor C., Charlotte B.. Signed by Chief Judge Robert C. Jones on 6/20/12. (MMM)
|
June 20, 2012 |
Filing 102
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order Setting Schedule for Plaintiffs to File an Amended Complaint and for Defendants to File Responses to the Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
June 1, 2012 |
Filing 100
MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #99 USCA Memorandum re #89 Notice of Appeal. REVERSED in part, AFFIRMED in part, and REMANDED. (ECS)
|
May 4, 2012 |
Filing 99
MEMORANDUM/OPINION of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #89 Notice of Appeal. We REVERSE the dismissal of Counts One, Two, Three, Eight, and Eleven; AFFIRM the dismissal of Counts Nine and Ten; and REMAND for further proceedings. On remand, the district court should allow Plaintiffs leave to amend their substantive due process claims, and Plaintiffs can seek further leave to amend if they wish to add a claim under the IDEAs express cause of action. Plaintiffs shall recover their costs on appeal. REVERSED in part, AFFIRMED in part, and REMANDED. (ECS)
|
April 27, 2012 |
Filing 98
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #89 Notice of Appeal. Appellants unopposed request for judicial notice, filed May 4, 2011, is GRANTED. (ECS)
|
November 2, 2011 |
Filing 97
CERTIFICATE OF RECORD on #89 Notice of Appeal. The record on appeal, consisting of the reporter's transcripts and the United States District Court clerk's record is ready for the purpose of the appeal. This file exists in electronic format and is accessible via CM/ECF - PACER. The documents comprising the United States District Court clerk's record have been numbered in conformance with Rule 11(b) of the Federal Rules of Appellate Procedure. These document numbers are reflected on the United States District Court's docket sheet and should be used for reference purposes in the briefs. Appeals in Habeas Corpus and 28 USC 2255 Motion to Vacate Sentence cases are treated as civil appeals in the Court of Appeals. Criminal appeals briefing schedules will be issued upon the filing of this document. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (no image attached) (ASB)
|
December 22, 2010 |
Filing 96
TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C. re #89 Notice of Appeal, 83 Motion Hearing,,,,,, #84 Transcript,,. Designation of Transcripts to be Used in Record on Appeal (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
December 16, 2010 |
Filing 95
COSTS TAXED in the amount of $0.00 and included in the judgment re #88 Bill of Costs. (MJZ)
|
December 3, 2010 |
Filing 94
ORDER for Time Schedule as to #89 Notice of Appeal, filed by Delia D., Sheldon H., Maizy D., Olivia G., Linda E., Mason I., Christine F., Henry A., Jonathan D., Charles B., Leo C., Victor C., Charlotte B.. USCA Case Number 10-17680. (JAG)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 93
Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for #89 Notice of Appeal,. The forms may also be obtained on the Court's website at #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. (JAG)
|
November 29, 2010 |
Filing 92
USCA Appeal Fees received $455 receipt number 0978-1805337 re #89 Notice of Appeal, filed by Delia D., Sheldon H., Maizy D., Olivia G., Linda E., Mason I., Christine F., Henry A., Jonathan D., Charles B., Leo C., Victor C., Charlotte B.. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (JAG)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 91
ERRATA to #90 Objection to Bill of Costs ; Corrected Proof of Service filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 90
OBJECTION to #88 Bill of Costs ; filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
|
November 24, 2010 |
Filing 89
NOTICE OF APPEAL by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Filing fee $ 455, receipt number 0978-1805337. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
|
November 11, 2010 |
Filing 88
BILL OF COSTS by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. Tax or object to Bill of Costs by 11/29/2010. (Sturman, Gloria)
|
October 28, 2010 |
Filing 87
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen, on 10/28/2010. Due to this case being CLOSED on October 26, 2010, the status hearing, currently scheduled for November 2, 2010 at 2:00 p.m. is VACATED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TKH)
|
October 27, 2010 |
Filing 86
CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Clark County, Diane Comeaux, Michael Willden, Tom Morton, and Virginia Valentine and against Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., and Victor C. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/27/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing 85
ORDER Granting #20 and #21 Motions to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/26/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
October 26, 2010 |
Filing 84
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 10/19/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Margaret Griener, 775-329-9980. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website < before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/16/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/26/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/24/2011. (MG)
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing 82
SUPPLEMENT CLARK K. BRIEFS FILED IN NINTH CIRCUIT COURT OF APPEALS REQUESTED BY JUDGE JONES by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Sturman, Gloria)
|
October 21, 2010 |
Filing 81
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 80 Status Conference held on 10/19/2010, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 11/11/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/21/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/19/2011. (ABB)
|
October 20, 2010 |
Filing 79
ORDER that the Clark County Defendants Motion for Protective Order #54 is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/20/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing 83
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Motion Hearing RE: #20 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement, #21 MOTION to Dismiss, held on 10/19/2010 before Judge Robert C. Jones. Crtrm Administrator: Lesa Ettinger; Pla Counsel: Gregory Schulman, Jeffery Rosenberg, William Grimm, Dorothy Fernandez and Harold McElhinny on behalf of Lori Schechter; Def Counsel: Gloria Sturman, Margaret Foley and Linda Anderson; Court Reporter/FTR #: Margaret Griener; Time of Hearing: 8:38 - 9:43 AM; Courtroom: 7D; Preliminarily, the Court hears arguments of counsel with respect to #73 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Harold J. McElhinny. IT IS ORDERED that #73 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Harold J. McElhinny is DENIED. Mr. McElhinny's request to appear on behalf of Lori A. Schechter for purpose of this proceeding is granted.Next, the Court hears arguments of counsel with regard to the motions at issue. Counsel shall supplement the record with copies of their briefs filed in the Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals, as directed by the Court. The Court takes this matter under submission. Written ruling of the Court will issue.IT IS ORDERED that any similar lawsuits filed in this District asserting class allegations, shall be assigned to Judge Robert C. Jones.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing 80
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 10/19/2010 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Melissa Jaime; Pla Counsel: Gregory Schulman, Jeffrey Rosenberg, William Grimm, Dorothy Fernandez; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Wade Gochnour; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:05 - 10:57 a.m.; Time of Hearing: 10:00 am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court makes an inquiry of counsel, as to the influence, the rulings made on the dispositive motions will have on the current discovery deadlines. Discussions are held between the Court, Mr. Rosenberg and Ms. Foley regarding three issues in relation to the Courts inquiry, the production of documents from Clark K., and the Countys failure to produce unredacted case documents and list of electronic discovery search terms. The Court next hears from Counsel concerning their progress regarding Electronically Stored Information (ESI). At this time the Court is going to require counsel to met and confer immediately after this hearing to attempt to reach a resolution. IT IS ORDERED: that a further status conference is set for 11/2/2010 @ 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. The parties may appear telephonically by dialing 702-868-4907, and entering code "123456" when prompted. FURTHER ORDERED the parties are to file a status report by 12:00 p.m. (Noon) on 10/29/2010. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MAJ)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing 78
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Robert C. Jones, on 10/19/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Michael Zadina. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that #73 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Harold J. McElhinny is DENIED and #77 Order is STRICKEN.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
October 19, 2010 |
Filing 77
STRICKEN per 78 Minute Order. (MJZ) ORDER granting #73 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Harold J. McElhinny for Plaintiffs and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 10/19/2010. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
October 18, 2010 |
Filing 76
NOTICE of Hearing Location: Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2010 08:30 AM in LV will be conducted in Courtroom 7D before Judge Robert C. Jones. (no image attached)(LE)
|
October 17, 2010 |
Filing 75
REPLY to #74 Response - Other ; PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE TO OPPOSITION TO THE VERIFIED PETITION FOR PERMISSION TO PRACTICE ON BEHALF OF HAROLD J. MCELHINNY filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez in Support of Plaintiffs' Response to Opposition to the Verified Petition for Permission to Practice on Behalf of Harold J. McElhinny)(Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
October 15, 2010 |
Filing 74
RESPONSE /Opposition to the Verified Petition for Permission to Practice on behalf of Harold J. McElhinny filed by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. (Sturman, Gloria)
|
October 12, 2010 |
Filing 73
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Harold J. McElhinny and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bruno Wolfenzon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1762418) by Plaintiff Henry A.. Motion ripe 10/12/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit in Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Rosenberg, Jeffrey)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing 72
ORDER GRANTING #70 Stipulated Protective Order. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/5/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ECS)
|
October 5, 2010 |
Filing 71
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 69 Order on Motion to Stay, Order on Motion for Protective Order, Status Conference, held on Thursday, September 16, 2010, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 10/26/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/5/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/3/2011. (SLR)
|
October 1, 2010 |
Filing 70
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Protective Order by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
September 16, 2010 |
Filing 69
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 9/16/2010 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Gregory M. Scholman, Esq., Jeffrey K. Rosenberg, Esq., William Grimm, Esq., Dorothy Fernandez, Esq.; Def Counsel: Gloria Sturman, Esq., Margaret Foley, Esq., Linda Anderson, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 2:04:09 - 2:40:18; Time of Hearing: 2:00pm; Courtroom: 3B; The Court hears the arguments of Counsel concerning Defendants' Motions to Stay #53 and for Protective Order #54 . After hearing representations, IT IS ORDERED: Defendants' Motion to Stay... #53 is GRANTED; IT IS FURTHER ORDERED:Defendants' Motion for Protective Order... #54 is DENIED. Counsel are directed to meet and confer further regarding terms, as directed in open court, and to submit them at their earliest convenience. Counsel are informed that they will be closely scrutinized by the Court. A SEPARATE WRITTEN ORDER SHALL ISSUE. The Court next hears from Counsel concerning their progress regarding Electronically Stored Information (ESI) as well as discovery related issues regarding production of the Clark K. materials. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED:Status Conference set for 10/19/2010 @ 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
September 15, 2010 |
Filing 68
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Gloria J Sturman on behalf of Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. By Margaret G. Foley (Sturman, Gloria)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing 67
ORDER GRANTING #65 Stipulation to Continue Oral Argument. IT IS ORDERED that oral argument RE: #20 Motion to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement and #21 Motion to Dismiss currently scheduled for 9/16/10 1:00 p.m. is RESCHEDULED to Tuesday, 10/19/2010 08:30 AM in LV Courtroom TBD before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 09/14/2010. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LE)
|
September 14, 2010 |
Filing 66
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
September 8, 2010 |
Filing 65
STIPULATION and [Proposed] Order for Continuance of Oral Argument re: Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, Second Requested Extension by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
September 7, 2010 |
Filing 64
NOTICE of Hearing on #54 MOTION for Protective Order SEEKING TO REDACT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED TO PLAINTIFFS, #53 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS VIRGINA VALENTINE AND TOM MORTONS MOTION FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF Motion to Dismiss : Motion Hearing set for 9/16/2010 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. These motions shall be heard in conjunction with the status conference currently scheduled for the same date and time. (no image attached)(TKH)
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing 63
REPLY to Response to #54 MOTION for Protective Order SEEKING TO REDACT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED TO PLAINTIFFS ; filed by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. (Sturman, Gloria)
|
August 26, 2010 |
Filing 62
REPLY to Response to #53 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS VIRGINA VALENTINE AND TOM MORTONS MOTION FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Defendants Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Sturman, Gloria)
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing 61
DECLARATION of Jeffrey K. Rosenberg re #54 MOTION for Protective Order SEEKING TO REDACT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED TO PLAINTIFFS ; filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Jeffrey K. Rosenberg's Declaration In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to County's Motion for Protective Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing 60
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Denying County Defendants' Motion for Protective Order Seeking to Redact Confidential Information in Documents Produced to Plaintiffs (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing 59
RESPONSE to #54 MOTION for Protective Order SEEKING TO REDACT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED TO PLAINTIFFS, filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Replies due by 8/26/2010. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing 58
DECLARATION of Dorothy L. Fernandez re #53 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS VIRGINA VALENTINE AND TOM MORTONS MOTION FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF Motion to Dismiss ; filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Declaration of Dorothy L. Fernandez In Support of Plaintiffs' Opposition to Motion for Stay (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E)(Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing 57
Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #56 Response to Motion, ; filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
August 16, 2010 |
Filing 56
RESPONSE to #53 MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS VIRGINA VALENTINE AND TOM MORTONS MOTION FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF Motion to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Replies due by 8/26/2010. (Fernandez, Dorothy)
|
August 2, 2010 |
Filing 55
NOTICE of Corrected Image/Document re #54 MOTION for Protective Order SEEKING TO REDACT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED TO PLAINTIFFS by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. (Service of corrected image is attached). (Sturman, Gloria)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 54
MOTION for Protective Order SEEKING TO REDACT CONFIDENTIAL INFORMATION IN DOCUMENTS PRODUCED TO PLAINTIFFS by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. Motion ripe 7/30/2010. (Sturman, Gloria) #55 Corrected image filed on 8/2/2010. (MJZ)
|
July 30, 2010 |
Filing 53
MOTION to Stay DEFENDANTS VIRGINA VALENTINE AND TOM MORTONS MOTION FOR STAY OF DISCOVERY PENDING RESOLUTION OF Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. Motion ripe 7/30/2010. (Sturman, Gloria)
|
July 29, 2010 |
Filing 52
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 48 Status Conference held on 7/20/2010, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/19/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/29/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/27/2010. (DXS)
|
July 23, 2010 |
Filing 51
ORDER Status Conference Hearing and Various Deadlines. Joint Status Report due by 9/14/2010. Status Conference set for 9/16/2010 02:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 50
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #43 Stipulation for Continuance of Oral Argument re #20 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement. Motion Hearing reset for 9/16/2010 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom TBA before Judge Robert C. Jones. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/21/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 22, 2010 |
Filing 49
ORDER Granting #45 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Dorothy L. Fernandez approving Attorney Bruno Wolfenzon as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 7/21/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
July 20, 2010 |
Filing 48
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Status Conference held on 7/20/2010 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Mary F. Hansbury, Esq., Gregory M. Schulman, Esq., William Grimm, Esq.; Def Counsel: Margaret Foley, Esq., Gloria Sturman, Esq., Linda Anderson, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:04:46 - 10:26:54; Time of Hearing: 10:00am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court advises counsel to follow up with U.S. District Judge Robert Jones's Chambers regarding their Proposed Stipulation #43 or, in the alternative, be prepared for oral arguments are they are currently scheduled on 8/13/2010 @ 9:00am. The Court next hears from counsel regarding their efforts with ESI. Counsel indicate that they agree to have their I.T. specialists communicate with one another directly, and Defense counsel agrees to complete their initial customer lists and keyword filter search lists. The Court next hears counsels' arguments concerning the form of a proposed protective order. IT IS ORDERED: Defendant will have until 7/31/2010 to file their Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiffs' counsel will have 15 days from the date of filing to file their opposition, and reply will be due 10 days later. If Defendants file a Motion to Stay, parties will adhere to the same deadlines and briefing schedule as set forth for Defendants' Motion for Protective Order. Plaintiffs are granted permission to file a joint response to both motions, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: The parties will have their respective IT specialists meet and confer no later than 8/06/2010, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: Defendant will produce their customer lists and keyword filter search lists no later than 8/06/2010, and Plaintiffs will have ten days from service to accept/reject/file any counter proposal, IT IS FURTHER ORDERED: Defense counsel are directed to exercise their best good faith efforts to produce the index of, or a status report concerning, the Clark K. materials by 8/06/2010 as directed in open court. The Court will set these matters for hearing after the oral argument schedule before U.S. District Judge Robert Jones is clarified.(no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
July 16, 2010 |
Filing 47
Joint STATUS REPORT by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hansbury, Mary)
|
July 14, 2010 |
Filing 46
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings, 44 Scheduling Conference held on 6/22/2010, before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Exceptional Reporting Services, Inc., 361-949-2988. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber using the court's "Transcript Order" form available on our website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER Redaction Request due 8/4/2010. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/14/2010. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/12/2010. (ABB)
|
July 1, 2010 |
Filing 45
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Dorothy L. Fernandez and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bruno Wolfenzon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1662785) by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Motion ripe 7/1/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Affidavit In Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hansbury, Mary)
|
June 22, 2010 |
Filing 44
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Scheduling Conference held on 6/22/2010 before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Crtrm Administrator: Jeff Miller; Pla Counsel: Mary F. Hansbury, Esq., Gregory Schulman, Esq., William Grimm, Esq., Camille L. Roberts, Esq.; Def Counsel: Gabriel Lither, Esq., Gloria Sturman, Esq., Margaret Foley, Esq.; Court Reporter/FTR #: 10:16:23 - 10:55:16; Time of Hearing: 10:15am; Courtroom: 3B; The Court scheduled this matter after reviewing counsels' Status Report/Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order #37 . After hearing counsels's representations concerning the status of discovery as well as counsels' discovery requests concerning placing a limitation on document production and individual discovery, IT IS ORDERED: Parties are directed to meet and confer regarding electronically stored information, the form of Proposed Protective Order that is being sought, and the scope of discovery sought from the individual Defendants. Status Conference set for 7/20/2010 @ 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. Joint Status Report due by 7/16/2010, and shall be filed as directed in open court. The Court informs counsel that it is candidly inclined to treat the individually names Plaintiffs as individuals as both sides have indicated that there are Plaintiff specific issues to consider, and also admonishes counsel that they should not send duplicate sets of discovery asking for the same information. To the extent that it is truly individualized, individualized discovery will be provided. Otherwise counsel are expected to consolidate and ask for common sets of discovery rather than overlapping. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JAM)
|
June 16, 2010 |
Filing 43
STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order For Continuance Of Oral Argument Re: Defendants Motion To Dismiss by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Schechter, Lori)
|
June 11, 2010 |
Filing 42
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Robert C. Jones, United States District Judge on 6/11/2010, by Carrie Lipparelli, Judicial Assistant. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that ORAL ARGUMENT RE: #20 Clark County Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or, in the Alternative, Motion for a More Definite Statement, #21 State Defendants' Motion to Dismiss, or in the Alternative, Motion for More Definite Statement is set for 08/13/2010 09:00 AM in LV Courtroom TBD, before Judge Robert C. Jones. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed Judge Robert C. Jones. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CL)
|
June 9, 2010 |
Filing 41
REPLY to Response to #20 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement ; filed by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sturman, Gloria)
|
June 8, 2010 |
Filing 40
NOTICE of Hearing: Scheduling Conference set for 6/22/2010 10:15 AM in LV Courtroom 3B before Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen re: #37 Joint Report and Proposed Discovery Plan.(no image attached)(TKH)
|
June 7, 2010 |
Filing 39
REPLY to Response to #21 MOTION to Dismiss ; filed by Defendants Diane Comeaux, Michael Willden. (Anderson, Linda)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing 38
STIPULATION and Order Extend Time File Reply re Mtn Dismiss by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. (Sturman, Gloria)
|
June 4, 2010 |
Filing 37
PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C. JOINT FRCP 26(f) REPORT AND PROPOSED DISCOVERY PLAN. (Hansbury, Mary)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing 36
RESPONSE to #21 MOTION to Dismiss, #20 MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement, filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. PLAINTIFFS CONSOLIDATED OPPOSITION TO STATE AND CLARK COUNTY DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS, OR, IN THE ALTERNATIVE, MOTIONS FOR A MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT Replies due by 6/6/2010. (Schechter, Lori)
|
May 27, 2010 |
Filing 35
JOINDER to #20 #21 Motion to Dismiss; filed by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. (Sturman, Gloria) Docket entry relationship added on 6/1/2010. (MJZ)
|
May 26, 2010 |
Filing 34
STIPULATION AND [PROPOSED] ORDER PERMITTING PLAINTIFFS TO FILE CONSOLIDATED RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SEPARATE MOTIONS TO DISMISS by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Hansbury, Mary)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 33
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #22 Stipulation Regarding Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismissal of Causes of Action VI and VII. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 32
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #23 Stipulation to Extend Time for Plaintiffs to File a Reponse to #20 and #21 Motions to Dismiss. Responses due 5/27/10. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 31
ORDER Granting #13 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Leecia Welch and approving Attorney Bruno Wolfenzon as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 30
ORDER Granting #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Camille Louise Roberts and approving Attorney Bruno Wolfenzon as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 29
ORDER Granting #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Bryn Martyna and approving Attorney Bruno Wolfenzon as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 28
ORDER Granting #10 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney William Grimm and approving Attorney Bruno Wolfenzon as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 27
ORDER Granting #5 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Mary F. Hansbury and approving Attorney Bruno Wolfenson as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 26
ORDER Granting #3 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jeffrey K. Rosenberg and approving Attorney Bruno Wolfenson as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 24, 2010 |
Filing 25
ORDER Granting #2 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Lori A. Schechter and approving Attorney Bruno Wolfenson as Designation of Local Counsel for Plaintiffs. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 5/24/10. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing 24
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Linda C. Anderson on behalf of Defendant Diane Comeaux. (Anderson, Linda)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing 23
STIPULATION And [Proposed] Order Extending Time For Plaintiffs To File A Response to Defendants' Motion to Dismiss by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Schulman, Gregory)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing 22
STIPULATION Regarding Plaintiffs' Voluntary Dismissal of Causes of Action VI and VII by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. (Schulman, Gregory)
|
May 10, 2010 |
Filing 21
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Michael Willden. Responses due by 5/27/2010. (Anderson, Linda)
|
May 7, 2010 |
Filing 20
MOTION to Dismiss or in the Alternative Motion for a More Definite Statement by Defendants Clark County, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine. Responses due by 5/24/2010. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Sturman, Gloria)
|
April 29, 2010 |
Filing 19
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Olivia G., Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Christine F., Victor C.. Michael Willden served on 4/20/2010, answer due 5/11/2010. (Schulman, Gregory)
|
April 29, 2010 |
Filing 18
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Olivia G., Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Christine F., Victor C.. Diane Comeaux served on 4/20/2010, answer due 5/11/2010. (Schulman, Gregory)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing 17
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Olivia G., Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Christine F., Victor C.. Virginia Valentine served on 4/16/2010, answer due 5/7/2010. (Schulman, Gregory)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing 16
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Olivia G., Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Christine F., Victor C.. Tom Morton served on 4/16/2010, answer due 5/7/2010. (Schulman, Gregory)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing 15
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Olivia G., Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Christine F., Victor C.. Clark County served on 4/16/2010, answer due 5/7/2010. (Schulman, Gregory)
|
April 26, 2010 |
Filing 14
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt, on 4/26/2010. By Deputy Clerk: Michael Zadina. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings as district judge. Judge Howard D. McKibben no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:10-cv-00528-RCJ-PAL. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MJZ)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing 13
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Leecia Welch and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Wolfenzon Schulman & Rolle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1582974) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Motion ripe 4/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hansbury, Mary)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing 12
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Camille Roberts and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Wolfenzon Schulman & Rolle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1582949) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Motion ripe 4/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hansbury, Mary)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing 11
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Bryn Martyna and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Wolfenzon Schulman & Rolle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1582930) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Motion ripe 4/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hansbury, Mary)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing 10
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by William Grimm and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Wolfenzon Schulman & Rolle (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1582876) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Motion ripe 4/19/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hansbury, Mary)
|
April 19, 2010 |
Filing 9
ORDER OF RECUSAL. This action is referred to Chief Judge Roger L. Hunt for reassignment. Signed by Judge Howard D. McKibben on 4/19/10. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AXM)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 8
Summons Issued as to Clark County, Diane Comeaux, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine, Michael Willden. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons)(AXM)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 7
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (no image attached) (AXM)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 6
NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 10-2. Counsel to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Counsel is also required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 5/29/2010.(no image attached) (AXM)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 5
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mary F. Hansbury and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bruno Wolfenzon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1577655) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Motion ripe 4/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Hansbury, Mary)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 4
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case. (Schechter, Lori)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Filing 3
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Jeffrey K. Rosenberg and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bruno Wolfenzon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1577652) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Motion ripe 4/14/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Schechter, Lori)
|
April 14, 2010 |
Case assigned to Judge Howard D. McKibben and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (AXM)
|
April 13, 2010 |
Filing 2
VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Lori A. Schechter and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Bruno Wolfenzon (Filing fee $ 175 receipt number 0978-1577651) filed by Plaintiffs Charles B., Charlotte B., Christine F., Delia D., Henry A., Jonathan D., Leo C., Linda E., Maizy D., Mason I., Olivia G., Sheldon H., Victor C.. Motion ripe 4/13/2010. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit In Support of Petition for Pro Hac Vice Admission)(Schechter, Lori)
|
April 13, 2010 |
Filing 1
COMPLAINT against Clark County, Diane Comeaux, DOES I-XX, Tom Morton, Virginia Valentine, Michael Willden (Filing fee $ 350 receipt number 0978-1577649), filed by Olivia G., Maizy D., Charles B., Henry A., Mason I., Delia D., Charlotte B., Linda E., Sheldon H., Jonathan D., Leo C., Christine F., Victor C.. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 4/23/2010. Proof of service due by 8/11/2010. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summons Michael Willden, #3 Summons Diane Comeaux, #4 Summons Virginia Valentine, #5 Summons Clark County, #6 Summons Tom Morton)(Schechter, Lori)
|