Naviatica International, Inc. v. Napolitano et al
Plaintiff: Naviatica International, Inc.
Defendant: Janet Napolitano and Marilyn Wiles
Case Number: 2:2010cv01999
Filed: November 16, 2010
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert J. Johnston
Presiding Judge: Philip M. Pro
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551 Administrative Procedure Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
November 17, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER Granting 19 Joint Motion to Dismiss Complaint without prejudice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 11/17/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
October 20, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Granting 15 Motion to Permit Appearance of Government Attorney Gisela A. Westwater for US Department of Justice. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 10/20/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
March 2, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Granting 12 Joint Motion to Stay Case until 11/3/11. Signed by Judge Philip M. Pro on 3/2/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
February 18, 2011 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Granting 9 Motion for Leave to Appear as Government Counsel for Attorney Jennifer A. Bowen for Janet Napolitano. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/18/11. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Naviatica International, Inc. v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marilyn Wiles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Naviatica International, Inc.
Represented By: Constantinos G Fountas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?