Hughes v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Hughes
Defendant: Isidro Baca, Renee Baker, Mrs. Barrett, Debra Brooks, Harry Churchward, Shirley Deipen, Wes Mattice, E.K. McDaniel, Nevada Department of Corrections, Officer Staplin, Officer Vuceta and Lisa Walsh
Case Number: 2:2012cv00660
Filed: April 19, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J. Dawson
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Both

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER DISMISSING CASE Granting 68 STIPULATION of Dismissal. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 1/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER Denying 56 Defendants' Motion to Modify Date and Time. Attorney General shall file answer as ordered by 8/9/2014 unless the parties have reached a settlement that is memorialized in writing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 7/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 12, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER re: Informal Settlement Discussions. The Court finds that the parties will benefit from informal discussions in an effort to settle this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 12/12/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Defense Counsel copy of Complaint - SLD)
April 3, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Granting 24 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages on third amended complaint. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to show cause why the court should not dismiss counts 1, 2, and 3 of the 25 third amended complaint because they are untimely. Plaintiff's 26 Motion for Leave to File fourth amended complaint or request for count 15 to include tort of intentional infliction of emotional distress is DENIED. Plaintiff 9;s 31 Motion to Extend Time to Serve the Third Amended Complaint and the 32 Motion for Issuance of Summons and Extend Time to Serve Third Amended Complaint are DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/3/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 22, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER VACATING 17 Order and 18 Judgment Dismissing the action. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 20 Plaintiff's Motion for Clarification and 21 Motion to Strike 17 Order Dismissing Case are GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 22 Plaintiff's Motion to Extend Time to File Third Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Third Amended Complaint deadline: 12/5/2012. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 10/22/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
October 10, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 18 JUDGMENT in favor of Defendants Barrett, Nevada Department of Corrections, Staplin, Vuceta, Debra Brooks, E.K. McDaniel, Harry Churchward, Isidro Baca, Lisa Walsh, Renee Baker, Shirley Deipen, Wes Mattice and against Plaintiff Michael Ray Hughes with prejudice. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 10/10/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hughes v. Nevada Department of Corrections et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mrs. Barrett
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Debra Brooks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Churchward
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shirley Deipen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wes Mattice
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Department of Corrections
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Staplin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Officer Vuceta
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lisa Walsh
Represented By: Raelene K. Palmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Ray Hughes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?