Zamorra Del Castillo v. Napolitano et al
Defendant: Eric Holder and Janet Napolitano
Petitioner: Gustavo Zamorra Del Castillo
Case Number: 2:2012cv01359
Filed: July 31, 2012
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 8:1105(a) Aliens: Habeas Corpus to Release INS Det
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 2, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER Granting 12 Motion to Withdraw petition for a writ of habeas corpus and complaint for injunctive relief. This Action is Dimissed Voluntarily without prejudice. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/2/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
November 15, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER Granting 5 Motion for Leave to Appear for Attorney Gisela A. Westwater for Janet Napolitano. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 11/15/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
September 28, 2012 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that the Clerk shall send a copy of this order and 1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus upon respondents. Answer due within 20 days. Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/2012. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Zamorra Del Castillo v. Napolitano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Holder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Napolitano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Gustavo Zamorra Del Castillo
Represented By: Jon E Garde
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?