Glazing Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust and IUPAT Political Action Committee
Defendant: Hines Interests Limited Partnership, Zuffa, LLC, Wesley Corporation, Kenneth Alber, Tre Builders, LLC, Builders, LLC, County of Clark, Great American Insurance Company, Stout Building Contractors California Inc., Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Ashford Las Vegas, LP, Granite Re, Inc, James Larson, Taylor International Corporation, LV Tower 52, LLC, Shaw-Lundquist Associates, Korte Construction Company, Penta Building Group, Board of Trustees of the Clark County School District, VRCK Holdings, LLC, Charlene Debrouwer, Timberwolff Construction, LLC, Westar Development Corporation, Guarantee Company of North America USA, Aria Resort & Casino, LLC, California Hotel & Casino, Mob Museum, Ramparts, Inc., Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC, SLI Management Corp, J & J Maintenance, Inc., St. Tropez Resort, LLC, Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC, American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, Nesbitt L.V.C.C., LLC, Western Surety Company, Golden Nugget, Inc, Jeffery Ehret, City Hall, LLC, Continental Design Build, Inc., Nabco National, Michael A Lamek, Bentar Development, Inc., Harry Winston, Inc., BPS Harmon, LLC, D.C. Building Group, LLC, Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Scott Conant Management Las Vegas, LLC, SGI Builders, Metroflag Cable, LLC, Prada USA Corp., Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, C & J Clark Retail, Inc., International Fidelity Insurance Company, Forsythe Enterprises, Inc., FB Las Vegas, LLC, Stout Building Contractors, Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC, Yard House Summerlin, LLC, Thor Construction, Inc., Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Victor Debrouwer, New Castle Corp, Shac MT, LLC, Siegel Group Nevada, Inc., M & H Enterprises, Inc., Shangri-LA Construction, LP, Kelly D Marshall, Circus Circus Casinos, Inc., Keroles Construction, Inc., NP Palace, LLC, Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland, Hotspur Resorts Nevada, LTD, Team Construction Management, Inc., Aliante Gaming, LLC, Indetail, LLC, Shangri-LA Contracting Corporation, Victoria Partners, Fashion Show Mall, LLC, Agave Construction, LLC, MGM Resorts International, CBRE, Inc., Swatch Group Les Boutiques (U.S.) Inc., Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Platte River Insurance Company, Bryan Sears, Baker Construction, Inc., Rancho Drive, LLC, Aegis Security Insurance Company, Mason Building Company, Inc., Susan Sears, Marriott International, Inc., NP Red Rock, LLC, Washington International Insurance Company, Blake Anderson, Board of Regents of the University of Nevada, Nevada Property 1, LLC, OCI Contracting, Inc., Julie Larson, Penta Building Group, LLC, Bubba Gump Shrimp Co. Restaurants, Inc., California Shirt Sales Inc, Larson Construction, LLC, Nevada State Contractors Board, Mandalay Corp., Western National Mutual Insurance Company, Crystals City Center, LLC, American Contractors Indemnity Company, Station Casinos, LLC, Old Republic Surety Company, Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company, HRHH Hotel/Casino, LLC, Diamond Resorts Corporation, Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc., Mandalay Resort Group, Navigators Insurance Company, HTW Holdings, LLC, City of Las Vegas, Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC, GNLV, Corp., D.C. Building Group, LLC doing business as Danoski Clutts Building Group, Forsythe Enterprises, Inc. doing business as F.E.I. Construction, Mason Building Company, Inc. doing business as MBCI Construction Management, J & J Maintenance, Inc. doing business as J & J Worldwide Services and M & H Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Martin Harris Construction
Case Number: 2:2013cv01106
Filed: June 21, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Kent J Dawson
Referring Judge: Nancy J Koppe
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1145
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2018. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2018 Filing 204 MANDATE of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #201 USCA Memorandum AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court re #194 Notice of Appeal. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 19, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 203 ORDER and AMENDED OPINION of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #194 Notice of Appeal. ORDER: The petition for rehearing en banc is DENIED. No future petitions shall be entertained. OPINION: AFFIRM. (MR)
March 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to #194 Notice of Appeal. Appellants' motion for an extension of time within which to file a petition for rehearing and/or a petition for rehearing en banc is GRANTED. (MR)
March 21, 2018 Filing 201 OPINION of USCA, Ninth Circuit, AFFIRMING the judgment of the District Court as to #194 Notice of Appeal. (MR)
October 27, 2016 Filing 200 RESPONSE to #198 Writ of Execution as to Defendant Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., filed by Valley Health System, LLC (MMM)
October 14, 2016 Filing 199 SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record as to ACCURACY GLASS & MIRROR COMPANY, INC. by Defendant Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc. (Larson, Zachariah)
September 12, 2016 Filing 198 WRIT OF EXECUTION in favor of Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, et al and against Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc. in the amount of 1,393,803.93. (MMM)
September 7, 2016 Filing 197 MOTION for Writ of Execution; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Writ)(Smith, Wesley)
July 25, 2016 Filing 196 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust re #194 Notice of Appeal,,,. Transcripts are NOT required for this appeal. (Smith, Wesley)
June 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 195 ORDER for Time Schedule as to #194 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 16-16155. (TR)
June 24, 2016 Filing 194 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #190 Order on Stipulation, #181 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,,, Order on Motion for Leave to File,,,,, Order on Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,,,, by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-4174383. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Smith, Wesley)
June 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 193 ORDER Granting #192 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice as to Defendant Western National Mutual Insurance Company. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 2, 2016 Filing 192 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice; filed by Defendant Western National Mutual Insurance Company. (Terry, Brian)
May 26, 2016 Filing 191 CLERK'S JUDGMENT in favor of Shangri-LA Construction, LP, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust against Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc. Signed by Clerk of Court, Lance S. Wilson on 5/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 26, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 190 ORDER Granting #189 Stipulation for Entry of Summary Judgment Against Accuracy Glass and Mirror Company, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter Judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 26, 2016 Filing 189 STIPULATION re #181 Order on Motion for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Addendum A, #2 Addendum B, #3 Exhibit 1 to Addendum B (1 of 3), #4 Exhibit 1 to Addendum B (2 of 3), #5 Exhibit 1 to Addendum B (3 of 3))(Smith, Wesley)
May 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER Granting #187 Motion to Extend Time to file Supplemental Motion. ( Motions due by 5/26/2016.) Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 12, 2016 Filing 187 JOINT MOTION to Extend Time to File Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
April 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #185 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to File Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Motions due by 5/12/2016. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/28/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 27, 2016 Filing 185 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to File Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
April 14, 2016 Filing 184 FOURTH AMENDED COMPLAINT against Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Western National Mutual Insurance Company, Western Surety Company, filed by Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 7/13/2016. (Smith, Wesley)
April 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #182 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) to File Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment. Motion due by 4/28/2016. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 12, 2016 Filing 182 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) of Deadline for Supplemental Motion for Summary Judgment on Damages by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
March 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 181 ORDER that #161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part;FURTHER ORDERED that Accuracy is liable to the Trusts for all unpaid contributions and that the Plaintiffs file a supplemental motion for summary judgment on damages within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order;FURTHER ORDERED that #173 Motion for Leave to File Brief in Response to New Authority is GRANTED; FURTHER ORDERED that #175 Motion to Reconsider is GRANTED;FURTHER ORDERED that the claims against Lamek and Marshall personally as fiduciaries under ERISA are DISMISSED;FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' demand for relief on bonds against Western National is GRANTED;FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for summary judgment for fees in excess of the value of the Bond is DENIED;FURTHER ORDERED that #176 Motion to Amend is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs file a fourth amended complaint in compliance with the Court's order within fourteen (14) days of the entry of this order. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 15, 2015 Filing 180 REPLY to Response to #176 Motion for Leave to File,, filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2, #2 Exhibit 3)(Smith, Wesley)
October 12, 2015 Filing 179 REPLY to Response to #175 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order, filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
October 5, 2015 Filing 178 RESPONSE to #176 Motion for Leave to File,,, filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. Replies due by 10/15/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Dzarnoski, Mark)
September 30, 2015 Filing 177 RESPONSE to #175 Objections re LR IB 3-1 or Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order,, filed by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Replies due by 10/10/2015. (Smith, Wesley)
September 17, 2015 Filing 176 MOTION for Leave to File FOURTH AMENDED Complaint; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Proposed Amended Complaint)(Smith, Wesley)
September 15, 2015 Filing 175 MOTION for District Judge to Reconsider Order re #142 Order on Motion to Dismiss by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. Responses due by 10/2/2015. (Dzarnoski, Mark) Modified event on 9/15/2015 (EDS).
September 11, 2015 Filing 174 RESPONSE to #173 Motion for Leave to File,,, filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. Replies due by 9/21/2015. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
August 24, 2015 Filing 173 MOTION for Leave to File NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE BRIEF IN RESPONSE by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
August 24, 2015 Filing 172 NOTICE OF NEW AUTHORITY AND PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO FILE BRIEF IN RESPONSE by Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust re #161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,. (Smith, Wesley)
August 13, 2015 Filing 171 EXHIBIT(s) to #161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, ; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 7 A, #2 Exhibit 7 B, #3 Exhibit 7 C, #4 Exhibit 7 D, #5 Exhibit 7 E (Part 1), #6 Exhibit 7 E (Part 2), #7 Exhibit 7 F (Part 1), #8 Exhibit 7 F (Part 2), #9 Exhibit 7 G, #10 Exhibit 7 H (Part 1), #11 Exhibit 7 H (Part 2), #12 Exhibit 7 H (Part 3), #13 Exhibit 7 H (Part 4), #14 Exhibit 7 H (Part 5), #15 Exhibit 7 I (Part 1), #16 Exhibit 7 I (Part 2))(Smith, Wesley)
July 2, 2015 Filing 170 REPLY to Response to #161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,, filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
June 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 169 ORDER Granting #167 Stipulation for Dismissal. Employers Mutual Casualty Company and M & H Enterprises, Inc. terminated. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 23, 2015 Filing 168 RESPONSE to #161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment,,,, filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. Replies due by 7/3/2015. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Declaration of Michael A. Lamek, #2 Exhibit Declaration of Kelly D. Marshall)(Dzarnoski, Mark)
June 19, 2015 Filing 167 STIPULATION for Dismissal of Employers Mutual Casualty Company, and M&H Enterprises, Inc. dba Martin-Harris Construction filed by Defendant M & H Enterprises, Inc.. (Flansburg, Frank)
June 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 166 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #164 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond re #161 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/23/2015. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 11, 2015 Filing 165 NOTICE of Change of Address by Mark S Dzarnoski. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
June 9, 2015 Filing 164 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re Response to #161 filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., J & J Maintenance, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
May 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 163 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #162 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Respond Re #161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Responses due by 6/9/2015. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 5/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 26, 2015 Filing 162 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME Re #161 Motion for Partial Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
May 8, 2015 Filing 161 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Responses due by 5/25/2015. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Debbie Ryan, #2 Declaration Glenn Goodnough, #3 Declaration John Smirk, #4 Declaration Terry Mayfield, #5 Exhibit 1, #6 Exhibit 2, #7 Exhibit 3, #8 Exhibit 4, #9 Exhibit 5, #10 Exhibit 6, #11 Exhibit 7, #12 Exhibit 8, #13 Exhibit 9, #14 Exhibit 10, #15 Exhibit 11, #16 Exhibit 12, #17 Exhibit 13, #18 Exhibit 14, #19 Exhibit 15)(Smith, Wesley)
April 29, 2015 Filing 160 AMENDED ANSWER to #104 Third Amended Complaint; filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (RFJ)
April 29, 2015 Filing 159 NOTICE: of Attorney Action Required to #158 Response - Other: ERROR: Wrong event selected by attorney Mark S Dzarnoski. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to refile pleading as an ANSWER adding the language "AMENDED"and properly link newly filed Amended Answer to #104 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT. (no image attached)(RFJ)
April 27, 2015 Filing 158 ERROR Wrong event selected by attorney. CORRECTION: Attorney is advised to refile document using the correct event. RESPONSE to #104 Amended Complaint; filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Dzarnoski, Mark) Modified on 4/29/2015 (RFJ).
April 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 157 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #154 STIPULATION to filed Amended Answer re #104 Third Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 4/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 22, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Granting #155 Motion to Remove Counsel Anthony L. Martin and Jill Garcia from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 21, 2015 Filing 155 MOTION to Remove counsel from Service List; filed by Defendant Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.. Responses due by 5/8/2015. (Garcia, Jill)
April 17, 2015 Filing 154 STIPULATION to filed Amended Answer; filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Amended Answer)(Dzarnoski, Mark)
April 6, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #152 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Answer/Respond re #149 Counterclaim. Glazing Health and Welfare Fund answer due 4/30/2015; IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund answer due 4/30/2015; IUPAT Political Action Committee answer due 4/30/2015; Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust answer due 4/30/2015; Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund answer due 4/30/2015; Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund answer due 4/30/2015; Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund answer due 4/30/2015; Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust answer due 4/30/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2015 Filing 152 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #149 Answer to Third Amended Complaint and Counterclaim, filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
March 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 151 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #148 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER that #147 Motion to Remove Attorney Rachel Silverstein from Electronic Service List is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 24, 2015 Filing 149 ANSWER to #104 Amended Complaint, COUNTERCLAIM against Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust filed by Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall, Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc..(Dzarnoski, Mark)
March 24, 2015 Filing 148 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
March 24, 2015 Filing 147 Unopposed MOTION to remove attorney(s) Rachel Silverstein from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.. (Silverstein, Rachel)
March 23, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 146 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #143 THIRD STIPULATION to Extend Discovery Deadline. Motions due by 5/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 20, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER Granting #144 Motion to Remove Attorney Rick Roskelley from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 19, 2015 Filing 144 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Rick Roskelley from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC. (Roskelley, Rick)
March 18, 2015 Filing 143 THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 142 ORDER that #113 Motion to Dismiss Third Amended Complaint is DENIED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2015 Defendants Nevada State Contractors Board, CBRE, Inc. and County of Clark terminated pursuant to #141 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
January 29, 2015 Filing 141 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
January 28, 2015 Filing 140 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT* in this action was filed on* 06/26/2014.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*County of Clark and Nevada State Contractors Board.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 2/27/2015. (RFJ)
January 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER Granting #138 Motion to Remove Attorney Sue Trazig Cavaco from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/14/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 13, 2015 Filing 138 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Sue Trazig Cavaco from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendants Indetail, LLC, Stout Building Contractors, Stout Building Contractors California Inc., Western Surety Company. Motion ripe 1/13/2015. (Cavaco, Sue)
January 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER ON STIPULATION re #136 THIRD STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines re: #87 SCHEDULING ORDER. Dispositive Motions due 30 days after entry of an Order on the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 1/9/2015 to reflect correct due dates - nef regenerated (MMM). Modified on 2/6/2015 to reflect correct deadline - nef regenerated (MMM).
January 8, 2015 Filing 136 THIRD STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: #87 SCHEDULING ORDER; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER granting #134 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
December 19, 2014 Filing 134 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Marek P. Bute from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc.. Motion ripe 12/19/2014. (Bute, Marek)
December 6, 2014 Defendant Indetail, LLC terminated pursuant to #133 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
December 5, 2014 Filing 133 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
November 21, 2014 Defendants Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC and Nabco National terminated pursuant to #132 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
November 21, 2014 Filing 132 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
November 21, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 131 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #129 STIPULATION of Dismissal of Certain Claims. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 11/20/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 18, 2014 Defendants Stout Building Contractors and Stout Building Contractors California Inc. dismissed with prejudice per #130 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
November 18, 2014 Filing 130 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
November 18, 2014 Filing 129 STIPULATION of Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
September 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #127 STIPULATION of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendants California Shirt Sales Inc and Continental Design Build, Inc.. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 9/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 24, 2014 Filing 127 STIPULATION to Dismiss; filed by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
September 22, 2014 Filing 126 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Western Surety Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Cavaco, Sue)
September 22, 2014 Filing 125 ANSWER to #104 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; filed by Western Surety Company.(Cavaco, Sue)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #123 SECOND STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines re: #87 SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 12/29/2014. Motions due by 1/28/2015. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/27/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 11, 2014 Filing 123 SECOND STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re: #87 SCHEDULING ORDER; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
September 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 122 ORDER ON STIPULATION Denying #121 STIPULATION to Extend Deadlines. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/8/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 5, 2014 Defendants SLI Management Corp, Shangri-LA Construction, LP, Shangri-LA Contracting Corporation, Shaw-Lundquist Associates, Thor Construction, Inc., Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland and Metroflag Cable, LLC, terminated pursuant to #120 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
September 5, 2014 Filing 121 FIRST STIPULATION to Extend re: #87 SCHEDULING ORDER; filed by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust . (Smith, Wesley)
September 5, 2014 Filing 120 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
August 27, 2014 Filing 119 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. CBRE, Inc. served on 7/8/2014, answer due 7/29/2014; Granite Re, Inc served on 7/10/2014, answer due 7/31/2014; Indetail, LLC served on 7/22/2014, answer due 8/12/2014; SLI Management Corp served on 7/8/2014, answer due 7/29/2014; Shangri-LA Construction, LP served on 7/7/2014, answer due 7/28/2014; Shangri-LA Contracting Corporation served on 7/7/2014, answer due 7/28/2014; Shaw-Lundquist Associates served on 7/8/2014, answer due 7/29/2014; Stout Building Contractors served on 7/8/2014, answer due 7/29/2014; Stout Building Contractors California Inc. served on 7/7/2014, answer due 7/28/2014; Thor Construction, Inc. served on 7/9/2014, answer due 7/30/2014; Western Surety Company served on 8/15/2014, answer due 9/5/2014. (Smith, Wesley)
August 22, 2014 Defendants Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC, Hines Interests Limited Partnership, International Fidelity Insurance Company, Keroles Construction, Inc., MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., Mandalay Resort Group, Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC, Nevada Property 1, LLC, New Castle Corp, Ramparts, Inc., Victoria Partners, Aegis Security Insurance Company and Circus Circus Casinos, Inc. dismissed pursuant to #118 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
August 22, 2014 Filing 118 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
August 11, 2014 Filing 117 REPLY to Response to #113 MOTION to Dismiss re: #104 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
August 8, 2014 Filing 116 NOTICE of Change of Address by Sue T Cavaco. (Cavaco, Sue)
August 1, 2014 Filing 115 RESPONSE to #113 MOTION to Dismiss re: #104 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT, filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Replies due by 8/11/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12)(Smith, Wesley)
July 23, 2014 Filing 114 ANSWER to #104 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc..(Silverstein, Rachel)
July 16, 2014 Filing 113 MOTION to Dismiss re: #104 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT; filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. Responses due by 8/2/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Dzarnoski, Mark)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #110 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Answer/Respond re #104 Third Amended Complaint. Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc. answer due 7/24/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 111 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #109 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME to Answer/Respond re #104 Third Amended Complaint. Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc. answer due 7/16/2014; Michael A Lamek answer due 7/16/2014; Kelly D Marshall answer due 7/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 10, 2014 Filing 110 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #104 THIRD Amended Complaint; filed by Defendant Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.. (Silverstein, Rachel)
July 9, 2014 Filing 109 FIRST STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #104 Amended Complaint; filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
July 8, 2014 Filing 108 Summons Issued as to Indetail, LLC re #104 Amended Complaint. (RFJ)
July 8, 2014 Filing 107 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
July 1, 2014 Filing 106 Summons Issued as to CBRE, Inc., County of Clark, Granite Re, Inc, Nabco National, Nevada State Contractors Board, SLI Management Corp, Shangri-LA Construction, LP, Shangri-LA Contracting Corporation, Shaw-Lundquist Associates, Stout Building Contractors, Stout Building Contractors California Inc., Thor Construction, Inc. re #104 Amended Complaint,,. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons)(RFJ)
June 30, 2014 Filing 105 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Summons, #3 Summons, #4 Summons, #5 Summons, #6 Summons, #7 Summons, #8 Summons, #9 Summons, #10 Summons, #11 Summons, #12 Summons)(Smith, Wesley)
June 26, 2014 Filing 104 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. No changes to parties. Proof of service due by 10/24/2014. (Smith, Wesley)
June 19, 2014 Filing 103 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Aegis Security Insurance Company, Circus Circus Casinos, Inc., Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC, Continental Design Build, Inc., Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Fashion Show Mall, Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland, Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC, Hines Interests Limited Partnership, Keroles Construction, Inc., Michael A Lamek, M & H Enterprises, Inc., MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., Mandalay Resort Group, Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC, Kelly D Marshall, Metroflag Cable, LLC, Nevada Property 1, LLC, New Castle Corp, Ramparts, Inc., Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc., Victoria Partners, Western National Mutual Insurance Company, Western Surety Company, CBRE, Inc., County of Clark, Indetail, LLC, International Fidelity Insurance Companu, Granite Re, Inc, Shaw Lundquist Associates, Shangri-LA Contracting Corporation, Shangri-LA Construction, SLI Management Corp, Nabco National, Nevada State Contractors Board, Stout Building Contractors, Stout Building Contractors California Inc., Thor Construction, California Shirt Sales Inc, filed by Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 10/17/2014. (Smith, Wesley)
June 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER that #17 Motion to Dismiss First Amended Complaint is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs file with the Court a third amended complaint addressing their claims' deficiencies within ten (10) days of the entry of this order. FURTHER ORDERED that #9 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that #63 Motion to Dismiss is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #72 Motion for Default against Aegis Security Insurance Co. is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that #73 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint is GRANTED. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 6/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER Granting #100 Motion to Remove Attorneys Adam K. Bult and Adam R. Fulton from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 11, 2014 Filing 100 MOTION to remove attorney(s) Adam K. Bult, Adam R. Fulton from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendants GNLV, Corp., Golden Nugget, Inc. Motion ripe 6/11/2014. (Fulton, Adam)
June 11, 2014 Filing 99 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
June 6, 2014 Filing 98 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
May 19, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 97 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #96 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC answer due 6/6/2014. NO FURTHER EXTENSIONS WILL BE GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 16, 2014 Filing 96 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Fourth Request) re #13 Amended Complaint,,,,, ; by Defendant Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC, Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Roskelley, Rick)
May 15, 2014 Defendants Hotspur Resorts Nevada, LTD, GNLV, Corp. and Golden Nugget, Inc terminated per #95 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
May 15, 2014 Filing 95 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
April 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 94 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #93 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to #13 Amended Complaint. Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC answer due 5/16/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/25/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
April 24, 2014 Filing 93 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Third Request) re #13 Amended Complaint,,,,, ; by Defendant Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC. (Clark, Dustin)
April 18, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #90 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Circus Circus Casinos, Inc. answer due 5/5/2014; Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC answer due 5/5/2014; Crystals City Center, LLC answer due 5/5/2014; Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland answer due 5/5/2014; MGM Resorts International answer due 5/5/2014; Mandalay Corp. answer due 5/5/2014; Mandalay Resort Group answer due 5/5/2014; Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC answer due 5/5/2014; Nevada Property 1, LLC answer due 5/5/2014; New Castle Corp answer due 5/5/2014; Ramparts, Inc. answer due 5/5/2014; Victoria Partners answer due 5/5/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/18/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Corrected signing judge. NEF Regenerated. (ASB)
April 18, 2014 Filing 91 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Claims & Defendants Only (Smith, Wesley)
April 17, 2014 Filing 90 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) to File Responsive Pleading by Defendant MGM Resorts International. (Bute, Marek)
April 7, 2014 Defendants SGI Builders, Bryan Sears, Susan Sears, Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC and Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company terminated per #88 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
April 7, 2014 Filing 89 RESPONSE to #63 MOTION to Dismiss, filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Replies due by 4/17/2014. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit)(Smith, Wesley)
April 7, 2014 Filing 88 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 87 SCHEDULING ORDER re #85 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order,,. Discovery due by 9/29/2014. Motions due by 10/29/2014. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 12/1/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 4, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 86 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #84 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC answer due 4/25/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/4/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 3, 2014 Filing 85 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust . (Smith, Wesley)
April 3, 2014 Filing 84 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #13 Amended Complaint,,,,, ; by Defendant Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC. (Clark, Dustin)
April 2, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 83 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #81 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respnod. GNLV, Corp. answer due 4/23/2014; Golden Nugget, Inc answer due 4/23/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/2/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 1, 2014 Filing 82 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe, on 4/1/2014. The parties were ordered to submit a proposed discovery plan no later than March 31, 2014. Docket No. 36. Plaintiffs have filed a notice indicating that the parties were unable to do so by that date. Docket No. 80. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to submit a joint proposed discovery plan no later than April 3, 2014. IT IS SO ORDERED. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TM)
April 1, 2014 Filing 81 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (Second Request) re #13 Amended Complaint,,,,, ; by Defendants GNLV, Corp., Golden Nugget, Inc. (Fulton, Adam)
March 31, 2014 Filing 80 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiff Glazing Health and Welfare Fund Plaintiffs' Case Conference Report. (Smith, Wesley)
March 31, 2014 Filing 79 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Keroles Construction, Inc. re #71 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default. (MMM)
March 31, 2014 Filing 78 Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Hines Interests Limited Partnership re #70 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default. (MMM)
March 28, 2014 Defendants Platte River Insurance Company; Tre Builders, LLC; The Builders, LLC; and D.C. Building Group, LLC terminated per #74 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
March 28, 2014 Filing 77 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Aegis Security Insurance Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. . (Faux, Kurt)
March 28, 2014 Filing 76 First ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Aegis Security Insurance Company.(Faux, Kurt)
March 28, 2014 Filing 75 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. Metroflag Cable, LLC served on 3/25/2014, answer due 4/15/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Wesley)
March 28, 2014 Filing 74 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Defendants and Claims Only (Smith, Wesley)
March 28, 2014 Filing 73 MOTION for Leave to File by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Motion ripe 3/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Second Amended Complaint)(Smith, Wesley)
March 28, 2014 Filing 72 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Aegis by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Motion ripe 3/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Clerk's Default)(Smith, Wesley)
March 28, 2014 Filing 71 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Keroles by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Motion ripe 3/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Clerk's Default)(Smith, Wesley)
March 28, 2014 Filing 70 MOTION for Entry of Clerks Default Hines by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Motion ripe 3/28/2014. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Clerk's Default)(Smith, Wesley)
March 26, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER Granting #67 Motion to Remove Attorney from Electronic Service List. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #66 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re #13 Amended Complaint. Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC answer due 4/21/2014; Aria Resort & Casino, LLC answer due 4/21/2014; Circus Circus Casinos, Inc. answer due 4/21/2014; Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC answer due 4/21/2014; Crystals City Center, LLC answer due 4/21/2014; Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland answer due 4/21/2014; MGM Resorts International answer due 4/21/2014; Mandalay Corp. answer due 4/21/2014; Mandalay Resort Group answer due 4/21/2014; Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC answer due 4/21/2014; Nevada Property 1, LLC answer due 4/21/2014; New Castle Corp answer due 4/21/2014; Ramparts, Inc. answer due 4/21/2014; Victoria Partners answer due 4/21/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2014 Filing 67 MOTION to remove attorney(s) William D. Schuller; Alan J. Lefebvre from the Electronic Service List in this case, by Defendant Board of Trustees of the Clark County School District. Motion ripe 3/25/2014. (Schuller, William)
March 24, 2014 Filing 66 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) FOR RESPONSE TO COMPLAINT by Defendant MGM Resorts International. (Bute, Marek)
March 24, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER ON STIPULATION Denying without prejudice #62 Stipulation to Extend Deadline to Answer/Respond. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/24/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 21, 2014 Filing 64 DECLARATION of Michael A. Lamek re #63 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Noall, William)
March 21, 2014 Filing 63 MOTION to Dismiss; filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. Responses due by 4/7/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Noall, William)
March 21, 2014 Filing 62 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #13 Amended Complaint; filed by Defendants Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC, Aria Resort & Casino, LLC, Circus Circus Casinos, Inc., Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC, Crystals City Center, LLC, Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland, MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., Mandalay Resort Group, Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC, Nevada Property 1, LLC, New Castle Corp, Ramparts, Inc., Victoria Partners. (Bute, Marek)
March 21, 2014 Filing 61 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint; filed filed by Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.. (Martin, Anthony)
March 20, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #59 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond to the Amended Complaint. Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC answer due 4/4/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/20/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
March 20, 2014 Filing 59 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME re #13 Amended Complaint; filed by Defendant Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC. (Clark, Dustin)
March 18, 2014 Defendants California Hotel & Casino and Rancho Drive, LLC terminated per #58 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
March 18, 2014 Filing 58 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER that #52 Motion to Enlarge Time for Service and Permit Service by Alternate Means. Proof of service due by 5/29/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 14, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #53 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. GNLV, Corp. answer due 4/2/2014; Golden Nugget, Inc answer due 4/2/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/14/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 13, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #45 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice as to Defendant Board of Trustees of the Clark County School District and Withdrawal of #38 MOTION for More Definite Statement. Signed by Judge Kent J. Dawson on 3/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 13, 2014 Filing 54 Submission of PROPOSED ORDER on #52 MOTION to Enlarge Time for Service of Process and to Permit Service by Alternative Means ; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust . (Smith, Wesley)
March 13, 2014 Filing 53 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) with Proposed Order by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
March 11, 2014 Filing 52 MOTION to Enlarge Time for Service of Process and to Permit Service by Alternative Means by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Motion ripe 3/11/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Smith, Wesley) Removed duplicate wording. (ASB)
March 10, 2014 Filing 51 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company.(Faux, Kurt)
March 10, 2014 Filing 50 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; GNLV, Corp. served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Golden Nugget, Inc served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc. served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Wesley)
March 7, 2014 Filing 49 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
March 4, 2014 Filing 48 NOTICE of intent to dismiss pursuant to FRCP 4(m). The * Amended Complaint* in this action was filed on* 10/31/13.* To date no proper proof of service has been filed as to*Mason Building Company, Inc., Golden Nugget, Inc., GNLV, Corp., Prada USA Corp., Crystals City Center, LLC, Rancho Drive, LLC, Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC, Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc., Aliante Gaming, LLC, California Hotel & Casino, City of Las Vegas, Guarantee Company of North America USA, Victor Debrouwer, Charlene Debrouwer, Safeco Insurance Company Of America, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Washington International Insurance Company, Bryan Sears, Susan Sears, American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, and Navigators Insurance Company.* FRCP 4(m) dismissal deadline set for 4/3/2014. (ASB)
March 3, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting #44 Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. Old Republic Surety Company answer due 3/28/2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/3/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 28, 2014 Defendant Great American Insurance Company terminated per #43 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
February 28, 2014 Filing 46 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. American Contractors Indemnity Company served on 2/20/2014, answer due 3/13/2014; Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Aria Resort & Casino, LLC served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Builders, LLC served on 2/8/2014, answer due 3/1/2014; Circus Circus Casinos, Inc. served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Crystals City Center, LLC served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland served on 2/20/2014, answer due 3/13/2014; Forsythe Enterprises, Inc. served on 2/23/2014, answer due 3/16/2014; M & H Enterprises, Inc. served on 2/11/2014, answer due 3/4/2014; MGM Resorts International served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Mandalay Corp. served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Mandalay Resort Group served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Nevada Property 1, LLC served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; New Castle Corp served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Ramparts, Inc. served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014; Shac MT, LLC served on 2/26/2014, answer due 3/19/2014; Team Construction Management, Inc. served on 2/20/2014, answer due 3/13/2014; Timberwolff Construction, LLC served on 2/6/2014, answer due 2/27/2014; Victoria Partners served on 2/28/2014, answer due 3/21/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Wesley)
February 28, 2014 Filing 45 STIPULATION of Dismissal with Proposed Order by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 28, 2014 Filing 44 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) with Proposed Order by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 28, 2014 Filing 43 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 21, 2014 Filing 42 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Board of Trustees of the Clark County School District. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Schuller, William)
February 21, 2014 Filing 41 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 21, 2014 Filing 40 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Western Surety Company that identifies all parties that have an interest in the outcome of this case. Corporate Parent CNA Financial Corporation for Western Surety Company added. . (Cavaco, Sue)
February 21, 2014 Filing 39 ANSWER to #13 Amended Complaint,,,,, filed by Western Surety Company.(Cavaco, Sue)
February 20, 2014 Filing 38 WITHDRAWN per #55 ORDER (MMM) MOTION for More Definite Statement by Defendant Board of Trustees of the Clark County School District. Responses due by 3/9/2014. (Schuller, William)
February 12, 2014 Defendants Board of Regents of the University of Nevada, J & J Maintenance, Inc., Baker Construction, Inc. and Bentar Development, Inc. terminated per #37 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
February 11, 2014 Filing 37 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. of Certain Defendants and Claims Only (Smith, Wesley)
February 10, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER that Plaintiffs, Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A. Lamek, Kelly D. Marshall, and Employers Mutual Casualty Company to exchange initial disclosures no later than February 28, 2014. The Court otherwise DEFERS setting any of the deadlines proposed by the parties. Instead, Plaintiffs and all Defendants who have appeared as of March 25, 2014, shall confer and submit a revised proposed discovery plan no later than March 31, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 7, 2014 Filing 35 SUMMONS Returned Executed by IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. Aegis Security Insurance Company served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; Ashford Las Vegas, LP served on 1/29/2014, answer due 2/19/2014; Board of Trustees of the Clark County School District served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; C & J Clark Retail, Inc. served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014; Continental Design Build, Inc. served on 2/3/2014, answer due 2/24/2014; Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; D.C. Building Group, LLC served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014; Fashion Show Mall served on 1/29/2014, answer due 2/19/2014; Great American Insurance Company served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; Hines Interests Limited Partnership served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014; Hotspur Resorts Nevada, LTD served on 1/29/2014, answer due 2/19/2014; J & J Maintenance, Inc. served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014; Keroles Construction, Inc. served on 1/31/2014, answer due 2/21/2014; Nesbitt L.V.C.C., LLC served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014; Old Republic Surety Company served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; Platte River Insurance Company served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; SGI Builders served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; Tre Builders, LLC served on 2/3/2014, answer due 2/24/2014; Westar Development Corporation served on 1/28/2014, answer due 2/18/2014; Western National Mutual Insurance Company served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014; Western Surety Company served on 1/30/2014, answer due 2/20/2014. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Wesley)
February 7, 2014 Filing 34 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust Renewed Stipulated. (Smith, Wesley)
February 5, 2014 Defendants Bubba Gump Shrimp Co. Restaurants, Inc., Diamond Resorts Corporation, FB Las Vegas, LLC, Korte Construction Company, Marriott International, Inc., NP Palace, LLC, NP Red Rock, LLC, Scott Conant Management Las Vegas, LLC, Station Casinos, LLC, Swatch Group Les Boutiques (U.S.) Inc., Taylor International Corporation, VRCK Holdings, LLC, Wesley Corporation, Yard House Summerlin, LLC, Agave Construction, LLC and BPS Harmon, LLC terminated per #33 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM) Modified on 2/6/2014 (MMM).
February 5, 2014 Filing 33 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
February 5, 2014 Filing 32 Summons Issued as to Circus Circus Casinos, Inc. NOTE: Proposed summons for party New Castle Corp. not issued as the party was voluntarily dismissed per #21 . (ASB)
February 5, 2014 Filing 31 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Smith, Wesley)
January 15, 2014 Filing 30 Summons Issued as to Aegis Security Insurance Company, Agave Construction, LLC, Aliante Gaming, LLC, American Contractors Indemnity Company, American Safety Casualty Insurance Company, Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC, Aria Resort & Casino, LLC, Ashford Las Vegas, LP, BPS Harmon, LLC, Baker Construction, Inc., Bentar Development, Inc., Board of Regents of the University of Nevada, Board of Trustees of the Clark County School District, Bubba Gump Shrimp Co. Restaurants, Inc., Builders, LLC, C & J Clark Retail, Inc., California Hotel & Casino, Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC, Continental Design Build, Inc., Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company, Crystals City Center, LLC, D.C. Building Group, LLC, Charlene Debrouwer, Victor Debrouwer, FB Las Vegas, LLC, Fashion Show Mall, Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland, Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC, Forsythe Enterprises, Inc., GNLV, Corp., Golden Nugget, Inc, Great American Insurance Company, Guarantee Company of North America USA, Hines Interests Limited Partnership, Hotspur Resorts Nevada, LTD, J & J Maintenance, Inc., Keroles Construction, Inc., Korte Construction Company, M & H Enterprises, Inc., MGM Resorts International, Mandalay Corp., Mandalay Resort Group, Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC, Marriott International, Inc., Mason Building Company, Inc., Metroflag Cable, LLC, NP Palace, LLC, NP Red Rock, LLC, Navigators Insurance Company, Nesbitt L.V.C.C., LLC, Nevada Property 1, LLC, Old Republic Surety Company, Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company, Platte River Insurance Company, Prada USA Corp., Ramparts, Inc., Rancho Drive, LLC, SGI Builders, Scott Conant Management Las Vegas, LLC, Bryan Sears, Susan Sears, Shac MT, LLC, Station Casinos, LLC, Swatch Group Les Boutiques (U.S.) Inc., Taylor International Corporation, Team Construction Management, Inc., Timberwolff Construction, LLC, Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America, Tre Builders, LLC, Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc., VRCK Holdings, LLC, Victoria Partners, Washington International Insurance Company, Wesley Corporation, Westar Development Corporation, Western National Mutual Insurance Company, Western Surety Company, Yard House Summerlin, LLC. (ASB)
January 14, 2014 Filing 29 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
January 6, 2014 Parties City Hall, LLC, Jeffery Ehret, HTW Holdings, LLC, LV Tower 52, LLC, OCI Contracting, Inc., Penta Building Group, Penta Building Group, LLC, Kenneth Alber and Blake Anderson DISMISSED with prejudice; Parties James Larson, Julie Larson, Larson Construction, LLC DISMISSED without prejudice; pursuant to #28 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (MMM)
January 6, 2014 Filing 28 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
December 16, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER that discovery in this matter shall be STAYED until 2/14/2014. In all other respects #26 Proposed Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order is DENIED without prejudice. No later than 2/7/14, Plaintiffs and all appearing Defendants are ORDERED to file a renewed joint proposed discovery plan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/16/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 13, 2013 Filing 26 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust . (Smith, Wesley)
December 10, 2013 Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 12/10/2013. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Kent J. Dawson for all further proceedings. Judge Andrew P. Gordon no longer assigned to case. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:13-cv-01106-KJD-NJK. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
December 10, 2013 Filing 24 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 12/10/2013. By Judicial Assistant: Cathy Stuchell. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
December 9, 2013 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Plaintiffs counsel and all counsel for appearing Defendants for whom a stipulated dismissal has not been filed are hereby ORDERED to show cause in writing, no later than December 16, 2013, why they failed to comply with the Local Rules as outlined in this order. Alternatively, the filing of a joint proposed discovery plan prior to that date will suffice to discharge this order to show cause. To the extent Plaintiffs and the appearing Defendants believe the circumstances warrant an extension to the deadline to file a discovery plan, they must file a stipulation seeking such relief. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/9/13. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)
December 5, 2013 Filing 22 REPLY to Response to #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. (Dzarnoski, Mark)
December 3, 2013 Party Mob Museum, New Castle Corp, Siegel Group Nevada, Inc., St. Tropez Resort, LLC, Zuffa, LLC, HRHH Hotel/Casino, LLC and Harry Winston, Inc. terminated per #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. (EDS)
December 3, 2013 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
November 25, 2013 Filing 20 RESPONSE to #9 MOTION to Dismiss 'Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A. Lamek and Kelly D. Marshall's Motion to Dismiss', #17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint, filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. Replies due by 12/5/2013. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Smith, Wesley)
November 19, 2013 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Rancho Drive, LLC. (ASB)
November 19, 2013 Filing 18 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Rancho Drive, LLC, filed by Plaintiffs Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
November 14, 2013 Filing 17 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. Responses due by 12/1/2013. (Dzarnoski, Mark) Removed duplicate wording. (ASB)
November 12, 2013 Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Robert C. Jones, on 11/12/2013. By Deputy Clerk: Aaron Blazevich. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:13-cv-01106-APG-NJK. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ASB)
November 12, 2013 Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman, on 11/12/2013. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MW)
November 1, 2013 Filing 14 ERRATA to #13 Amended Complaint,,,,, ; filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
October 31, 2013 Filing 13 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Western National Mutual Insurance Company, M & H Enterprises, Inc., Bentar Development, Inc., Agave Construction, LLC, Tre Builders, LLC, Timberwolff Construction, LLC, Larson Construction, LLC, OCI Contracting, Inc., Mason Building Company, Inc., The Penta Building Group, The Penta Building Group, LLC, Baker Construction, Inc., Team Management, Inc., D.C. Building Group, LLC, SGI Builders, Keroles Construction, Inc., The Builders, LLC, Westar Development Corporation, Korte Construction Company, Ramparts, Inc., MGM Resorts International, Golden Nugget, Inc, GNLV, Corp., Station Casinos, LLC, NP Red Rock, LLC, Prada USA Corp., Crystals City Center, LLC, New Castle Corp, Rancho Drive, LLC, C & J Clark Retail, Inc., Fashion Show Mall, Mandalay Resort Group, Mandalay Corp., VRCK Holdings, LLC, Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC, filed by Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund. Adds new parties. Proof of service due by 2/28/2014. (Smith, Wesley)
October 24, 2013 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Dzarnoski, Mark)
October 22, 2013 Filing 11 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Faux, Leland)
October 22, 2013 Filing 10 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,,, filed by Employers Mutual Casualty Company.(Faux, Leland)
October 14, 2013 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss by Defendants Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Michael A Lamek, Kelly D Marshall. Responses due by 10/31/2013. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/24/2013. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/28/2013. (Dzarnoski, Mark) Duplicate wording removed. (ASB)
October 3, 2013 Filing 8 NOTICE filed by Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Smith, Wesley)
September 27, 2013 Filing 7 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc. waiver sent on 9/27/2013, answer due 11/26/2013; Michael A Lamek waiver sent on 9/27/2013, answer due 11/26/2013; Kelly D Marshall waiver sent on 9/27/2013, answer due 11/26/2013. (Smith, Wesley)
July 3, 2013 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case . (Smith, Wesley)
June 25, 2013 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc., Employers Mutual Casualty Company, Michael A Lamek, and Kelly D Marshall. (ASB)
June 24, 2013 Filing 4 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued , filed by Plaintiffs Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust. (Attachments: #1 Summons Kelly D. Marshall, #2 Summons Michael A. Lamek, #3 Summons Employers Mutual Casualty Company)(Smith, Wesley)
June 24, 2013 Filing 3 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service. (no image attached) (MAJ)
June 24, 2013 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman. (MAJ)
June 21, 2013 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET re #1 Complaint,,,, filed by Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and journeyman Training Trust, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. Related document: #1 Complaint,,, filed by Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and journeyman Training Trust, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund. (Smith, Wesley)
June 21, 2013 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-2863446), filed by Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and journeyman Training Trust, IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund, Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund, Glazing Health and Welfare Fund, Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund, IUPAT Political Action Committee. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/1/2013. Proof of service due by 10/19/2013. (Smith, Wesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Glazing Health and Welfare Fund et al v. Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hines Interests Limited Partnership
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zuffa, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wesley Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth Alber
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tre Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Builders, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Great American Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stout Building Contractors California Inc.
Represented By: Sue Trazig Cavaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Employers Mutual Casualty Company
Represented By: Leland Kurt Faux
Represented By: Kurt C Faux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ashford Las Vegas, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Granite Re, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Taylor International Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LV Tower 52, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shaw-Lundquist Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Korte Construction Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penta Building Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Trustees of the Clark County School District
Represented By: William D. Schuller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VRCK Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charlene Debrouwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timberwolff Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westar Development Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aria Resort & Casino, LLC
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Hotel & Casino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mob Museum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramparts, Inc.
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandarin Oriental Las Vegas, LLC
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SLI Management Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Maintenance, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Dzarnoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Tropez Resort, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aria Resort & Casino Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Safety Casualty Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nesbitt L.V.C.C., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Surety Company
Represented By: Sue Trazig Cavaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden Nugget, Inc
Represented By: Adam K. Bult
Represented By: Adam Ross Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffery Ehret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Hall, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Continental Design Build, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nabco National
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Lamek
Represented By: Mark Dzarnoski
Represented By: William M. Noall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bentar Development, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harry Winston, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BPS Harmon, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. Building Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Safeco Insurance Company Of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Conant Management Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SGI Builders
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metroflag Cable, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Prada USA Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travelers Casualty & Surety Company of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C & J Clark Retail, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: International Fidelity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forsythe Enterprises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FB Las Vegas, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stout Building Contractors
Represented By: Sue Trazig Cavaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flamingo Las Vegas Operating Company, LLC
Represented By: Dustin L. Clark
Represented By: Rick D Roskelley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yard House Summerlin, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thor Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Accuracy Glass & Mirror Company, Inc.
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Represented By: Mark Dzarnoski
Represented By: William M. Noall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victor Debrouwer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: New Castle Corp
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shac MT, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Siegel Group Nevada, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & H Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Frank M Flansburg, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shangri-LA Construction, LP
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly D Marshall
Represented By: Mark Dzarnoski
Represented By: William M. Noall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Circus Circus Casinos, Inc.
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keroles Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Palace, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fidelity & Deposit Company Of Maryland
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hotspur Resorts Nevada, LTD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Team Construction Management, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aliante Gaming, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indetail, LLC
Represented By: Sue Trazig Cavaco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shangri-LA Contracting Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Victoria Partners
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fashion Show Mall, LLC
Represented By: Paul T. Trimmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Agave Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MGM Resorts International
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBRE, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Swatch Group Les Boutiques (U.S.) Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Philadelphia Indemnity Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Platte River Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bryan Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker Construction, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rancho Drive, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Aegis Security Insurance Company
Represented By: Kurt C Faux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Building Company, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Susan Sears
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marriott International, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NP Red Rock, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Washington International Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Blake Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Board of Regents of the University of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Property 1, LLC
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: OCI Contracting, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julie Larson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Penta Building Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bubba Gump Shrimp Co. Restaurants, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: California Shirt Sales Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Larson Construction, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada State Contractors Board
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandalay Corp.
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western National Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Alexandra B McLeod
Represented By: Brian K Terry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crystals City Center, LLC
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Contractors Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Station Casinos, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Old Republic Surety Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Contractors Bonding & Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HRHH Hotel/Casino, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamond Resorts Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tropicana Las Vegas, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony L. Martin
Represented By: Jill Garcia
Represented By: Rachel Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mandalay Resort Group
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Navigators Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HTW Holdings, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citycenter Boutique Hotel Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Marek P. Bute
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GNLV, Corp.
Represented By: Adam K. Bult
Represented By: Adam Ross Fulton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D.C. Building Group, LLC doing business as Danoski Clutts Building Group
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Forsythe Enterprises, Inc. doing business as F.E.I. Construction
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mason Building Company, Inc. doing business as MBCI Construction Management
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & J Maintenance, Inc. doing business as J & J Worldwide Services
Represented By: Mark Dzarnoski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M & H Enterprises, Inc. doing business as Martin Harris Construction
Represented By: Frank M Flansburg, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IUPAT Industry Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Nevada Glaziers and Fabricators Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Glazing Health and Welfare Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Safety Training Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern California, Arizona, Colorado and Southern Nevada Glaziers, Architectural Metal and Glass Workers Pension Trust Fund
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Southern Nevada Painters and Decorators and Glaziers Labor-Management Cooperation Committee Trust
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Painters, Glaziers and Floorcoverers Joint Apprenticeship and Journeyman Training Trust
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: IUPAT Political Action Committee
Represented By: Wesley J Smith
Represented By: Kevin B Christensen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?