Edwards v. Clark County et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie Edwards
Defendant: Clark County, Doug Gilipise, Hightower, Katrina, Mitchell, Dr. Mondora, Naphcare, Reyes and Scott
Case Number: 2:2013cv01316
Filed: July 24, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Robert C. Jones
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights (Prison Condition)
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER Denying Plaintiff's 174 Motion to Stay/Objection. Edwards must post a $6,172.84 supersedeas bond to stay enforcement proceedings pending appeal. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/29/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 7, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 183 ORDER that 182 Motion for Enforcement of Order is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 21, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER denying ECF Nos. 161 and 163 Motion for Attorney Fees; and denying ECF No. 166 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/21/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
March 2, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 158 ORDER that 115 and 117 Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 140 Motion to Semi-Combine Exhibits is GRANTED; and 145 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint and 154 Motion for Leave to File a Surreply/Motion to Strike are DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to enter judgment for defendants and against plaintiff and CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/2/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER that 119 Motion to Compel Discovery is denied; that 120 Motion for Emergency Hearing for Motion to Compel is denied as moot; that 135 Motion for Reconsideration of Document 123 is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 9/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 136 ORDER that 91 Motion for Reconsideration is DENIED; that 94 Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint is DENIED without prejudice; that 121 FRCP 56(d) Motion is DENIED without prejudice to plaintiff's ability to reassertion of any FRCP 56(d) arguments into his response to the motions for summary judgment; and that 122 Motion to Extend Time to Respond is GRANTED. Plaintiff's deadline to respond to defendants' motions for summary judgment is extended to September 22, 2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER that 101 Motion for Reconsideration is denied; 104 Motion to Extend Discovery is denied; 111 Motion for Leave of Court to Supplement Doc. #104 is denied as moot; 106 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum is denied; 109 Notice of Concern is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 15, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 112 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER re 110 STIPULATION re Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 6/15/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 8, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER that 61 Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum is denied without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that 65 Amended Motion for Subpoena Duces Tecum is construed as a Motion to Supplement doc. 61 , and is granted on that basis. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall strike doc. # 93 from the record. FURTHER ORDERED that 77 Motion of Concern is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that 83 Motion Opposing Deposition is denied. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff will be subject to sanctions if he continues to ex cessively file discovery-related motions on the record without first meeting and conferring with Defendants to resolve issues. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/8/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) Modified on 5/8/2015 to include striking of #93 - nef regenerated (MMM).
April 21, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER that 88 Emergency Motion to Compel Copies is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 81 ORDER that 79 Motion to Extend Prison Copywork Limit is denied. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 4/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 25, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 72 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER Granting 71 STIPULATION for Protective Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/25/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 18, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER that 68 Motion of Concern is Granted in part and Denied as moot in part. Plaintiff's request that defendants resend their responses is denied as moot. However, plaintiff's request for the Court to extend the reply deadlines is granted. Plaintiff shall have until April 6, 2015 to file his replies. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/18/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 24, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER that 57 Motion to Appoint Counsel is DENIED; that 58 Motion to Extend Time to Effectuate Service is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part; that 59 Motion for Amendments to the Scheduling Order is DENIED without prejudice; and that 60 Motion for Additional Interrogatories is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER that 52 LVMPD's Motion to Amend/Correct an Order is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall, no later than February 20, 2015, provide the full name and address for Mitchell in a motion requesting issuance of summons, if plaintiff wishes this defendant to be served. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 1/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER that the Clerk of Court shall issue Summons to Dr. Raymond Allen Mondora and Katrina Simeon, R.N. Service must be accomplished within 120 days from the date this order is entered. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/22/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: USM and Petitioner with required documents - SLR)
December 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that 24 Motion for Issuance of Subpoena Duces Tecum is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. The Clerk of Court shall issue new Summons to Defendants Hightower, Reyes, Mitchell, and Scott as set forth in this order. The Clerk shall issue a su bpoena duces tecum to Non-Party Naphcare, Inc. and deliver a copy of the Subpoena and this order to the United States Marshal for personal service on Naphcare, Inc.'s registered agent for service of process and file a return with the Court. FUR THER ORDERED that the deadline for service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(m) is extended sixty (60) days from the date of this Order. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motions 25 and 34 are DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 12/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 9, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER that the Clerk shall issue a subpoena duces tecum to the custodian of records at CCDC and deliver the subpoena, the summons, complaint and a copy of this order to the USMS for service. Within 20 days after receiving the information from CCDC, the USMS shall use the information provided by CCDC to attempt to serve the summonses and complaint on defendants Mondora, Simeon, Hightower, Reyes, Mitchell, and Scott. The USMS shall provide Edwards with Forms USM-285 (listing these defendants' ; first and last names, and not listing their addresses) indicating whether service was effected. Edwards shall file the USM-285 forms within 10 days after receiving them from theUSMS. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Edwards v. Clark County et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Doug Gilipise
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hightower
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Katrina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mitchell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Mondora
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naphcare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reyes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?