Rimer v. Sandoval et al
Plaintiff: Stanley Rimer
Defendant: Eric Burson, Catherine Cortez-Masto, James G. Cox, Frank Dreesen, C/O Houke, Dr. Lee, Efrain Lona, E.K. McDaniel, Secretary of State Ross Miller, Dwight Neven, Robert Owens, Jamie Rainone, Tatiana S., Brian Sandoval, Harold Wickham and Tela Wilson
Case Number: 2:2013cv01440
Filed: August 9, 2013
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Presiding Judge: George Foley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
July 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER Denying 138 Motion to Set aside the Judgment. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/18/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
March 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 143 JUDGMENT in favor of Doe Insurance Company, Hanf, Brian Sandoval, Cary Leavitt, Catherine Cortez-Masto, Cynthia Sablica, Dwight Neven, E.K. McDaniel, Efrain Lona, Eric Burson, Frank Dreeson, Harold Wickham, James G. Cox, Jamie Rainone, Jane Doe Doni, John Doe Lee, Linda Adams, Richard Bannister, Robert Houke, Robert Owens, Ross Miller, Tatiana Sowell, Tesla Wilson against Stanley Rimer. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 24, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 140 ORDER Granting 136 Motion to Strike 135 Supplemental Argument from the Record. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/24/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
February 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER Granting 81 Motion for Summary Judgment. Defendants are instructed to submit a proposed judgment within 7 days of the issuance of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 133 Motion to File a Sur-reply is DENIED. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER that 112 Motion for Magistrate Judge to Reconsider Magistrate Judge Order is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 111 Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment is hereby stricken. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Response to 81 Motion for Summary Judgment is due by 9/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
August 26, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 110 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 108 Motion to File Opposition is GRANTED. The Clerk of hte Court shall file the Opposition. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 103 Motion for Leave to Oversized Brief is denied as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 107 Motion to Extend Time is denied as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 8/26/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 28, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 102 ORDER that 100 Motion to Strike is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 97 Response to Motion is STRICKEN from the record. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 101 Motion to Extend Time to File Reply is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that plaintiff shall have 30 days from the date of this order to file a response to defendants motion that complies with the page limit provided by the local rules. Defendants shall have 14 days from the date of filing of plaintiffs response to file a reply. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
July 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 95 ORDER granting 94 Motion to Extend Prison Copywork Limit. Plaintiff shall have his copywork limit extended by $50.00. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 7/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
June 1, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER Denying 90 Motion for Leave to File Medical Records Under Seal. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 6/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 29, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 91 ORDER that 73 Motion to Strike re 70 Plaintiff's Judicial NOTICE is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 74 Motion to Strike re 71 Plaintiff's Judicial NOTICE is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 79 Motion for Government Intervention is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
May 12, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 87 ORDER that 80 Motion for Leave to File Medical Records Under Seal is DENIED without prejudice. The exhibit will remain sealed for 14 days from the date of this order. If the Defendants file an amended motion to seal or object to the Courts order, the exhibit shall remain sealed until further order of the Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 5/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER denying without prejudice 61 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 9, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER that Clerk of the Court shall electronically SERVE a copy of this order and a copyof 47 fourth amended complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Notice due from Attorney General within 21 days. Answer due 5/8/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 3/9/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Kat Howe TR)
February 11, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER that the stay is extended through Friday, March 6, 2015. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that on or before Friday, March 6, 2015, Defendants shall file an updated status report. Signed by Magistrate Judge George Foley, Jr on 2/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rimer v. Sandoval et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Burson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Cortez-Masto
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James G. Cox
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank Dreesen
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C/O Houke
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Efrain Lona
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: E.K. McDaniel
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Secretary of State Ross Miller
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert Owens
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Rainone
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tatiana S.
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Sandoval
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Harold Wickham
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tela Wilson
Represented By: Mercedes S. Menendez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Rimer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?