March 7, 2019 |
Filing
156
ORDER granting 139 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 146 Motion for Leave to File Document; ORDER adopting 154 Report and Recommendation; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/6/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
February 13, 2019 |
Filing
154
ORDER denying 144 Motion; REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION Recommending to deny 146 Motion for Leave to File Document. Objections to R&R due by 2/27/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/13/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
July 30, 2018 |
Filing
142
ORDER granting 141 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 139 Motion for Summary Judgment, Responses due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Filing
135
ORDER that defendants' 113 motion for judgment on the pleadings is DENIED. The Clerk of Court is directed to REOPEN THIS CASE and remove the gavel from 124 ; Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
July 14, 2017 |
Filing
133
ORDER denying 132 Motion to Extend Time. Answering brief due by 8/4/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/14/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
June 20, 2016 |
Filing
118
ORDER granting ECF No. 113 motion for judgment on the pleadings; denying as moot ECF Nos. 109 , 110 , 111 , 112 , 114 , and 117 motions; and directing Clerk to enter judgment in favor of defendants and close case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JC)
|
May 11, 2016 |
Filing
115
ORDER that the parties shall file a status report in this case no later than May 23, 2016 Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/11/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing
100
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part 94 , 95 , and 99 Motions. Claims no longer exist against defendants Johal, Behrens, Snowden, Bonko, Coker, or Hem; Clerk of court to terminte these parties. Motions due by 8/28/2015. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
May 12, 2015 |
Filing
93
ORDER Denying 86 Motion Objecting to U.S. Magistrates Denial of Screening His Amended Complaint. It Is Further Ordered that 87 and 89 Motions to Dismiss are Granted. Defendants Henson, Neighbors, Bisset, and Durante are Dismissed from this case. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 5/12/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
May 4, 2015 |
Filing
91
ORDER Denying 80 and 81 Motions to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 5/4/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
February 19, 2015 |
Filing
76
PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/19/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
February 6, 2015 |
Filing
74
ORDER granting 72 Motion for Protective Order. Submission of Proposed Protective Order due by 2/20/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 2/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
October 9, 2014 |
Filing
59
ORDER that 57 Motion to Give Judicial Notice is DENIED without prejudice. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall serve a copy of this order on the United States Marshal Service. FURTHER ORDERED that the United States Marshal Service shall submit, under seal, the response provided to the original subpoena duces tecum from the custodian of records at the Clark County Detention Center. The submission is due on or before Friday, October 31, 2014. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 10/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF: cc USM - MMM)
|
August 4, 2014 |
Filing
52
ORDER Denying without prejudice 43 Motion to Give Judicial Notice. Denying without prejudice 44 Motion to Give Judicial Notice. Denying without prejudice 49 Motion for the Court to Issue Subpoena Duces Tecum. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 8/4/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
July 21, 2014 |
Filing
51
ORDER Denying 23 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and 24 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 7/21/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
June 10, 2014 |
Filing
36
AMENDED ORDER Issuing Subpoena Duces Tecum. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk shall issue a subpoena duces tecum to the custodian of records at CCDC directing the custodian to provide the first and last names and last-known addresses of the corrections officers identified in 9 Plaintiff's Complaint as: O'Barr, Snowden, Wooden, Hem, and Coker. The Clerk shall deliver the subpoena duces tecum, the 10 Summons, 9 Complaint, and a copy of this order to t he USMS. The USMS shall serve a subpoena duces tecum and a copy of this order on the custodian of records at CCDC. The custodian of records shall respond to the subpoena duces tecum within 14 days of receipt. Proof of service due within 120 days. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 06/10/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CC: USMS - AC)
|
March 31, 2014 |
Filing
25
ORDER Granting 22 Motion for Copy of the Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Carl W. Hoffman on 3/31/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF; CC: Plaintiff with Required Copies and Forms - SLR)
|