Agavo v. Neven et al

Petitioner: Reynaldo Agavo
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Dwight Neven
Case Number: 2:2013cv01741
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
September 23, 2015 43 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 28 Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Petition is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 34 Motion to Stay and Abeyance is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that the grant of a stay is conditioned upon petitioner filing a state post-conviction petiti on or other appropriate proceeding in state court within forty-five (45) days from the entry of this order and returning to federal court with a motion to reopen within forty-five (45) days of issuance of the remittitur by the Nevada Supreme Court at the conclusion of the state court proceedings. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSE this action, until such time as the court grants a motion to reopen the matter. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/23/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
April 28, 2015 37 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 36 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 28 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 4/30/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 4/28/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 16, 2015 32 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 31 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 28 MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED. Responses due by 4/13/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/16/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 27, 2015 30 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 29 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 28 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/12/2015. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 26, 2014 14 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 13 Motion to Extend Time to File an Amended Petition is GRANTED. The amended petition shall be filed on or before October 6, 2014. No further extensions shall be granted absent a showing of extraordinary circumstances. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/26/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
July 21, 2014 12 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that 11 Motion to Extend Time to File First Amended Petition is GRANTED. Amended Petition due by 9/22/2014. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 7/21/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2014 7 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that the Clerk shall serve respondents with a copy of this order. Respondents' counsel SHALL ENTER a notice of appearance herein within twenty (20) days of entry of this order. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 1/22/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 17, 2013 4 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER that Petitioner's motion for appointment of counsel [1-2] is GRANTED. The Office of the Federal Public Defender is appointed to represent petitioner. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall electronically serve FPD with a co py of this order, together with a copy of the petition and its attachments. FPD shall have 30 days from the date of entry of this order to undertake direct representation of petitioner or indicate to the court its inability to represent. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall send a copy of this order to the court's CJA coordinator. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 12/17/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: FPD and CJA - EDS)
September 27, 2013 2 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Denying 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Petitioner shall have 30 days from the date of this order in which to have $5.00 filing fee sent to the clerk of court. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of cour t SHALL SEND petitioner two copies of this order. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk of court shall RETAIN the petition but not file it at this time. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 9/27/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - EDS)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Agavo v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Reynaldo Agavo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?