Thomas v. Clark County School District Police Department et al

Defendant: Filberto Arroyo, Clark County School District Police Department, Edward Goldman, Loren Johnson, Dwight Jones, James Ketsaa, Christopher Klemp, Brian Nebeker, Darrin Puana, Courtney Purcell, Tom Rodriquez and Ken Young
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas
Case Number: 2:2013cv01743
Filed: September 23, 2013
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Miranda M. Du
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
November 19, 2013 23 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 22 Defendants' Motion to Excuse the Attendance of Defendant James Ketsaa from the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 11/19/2013. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - AC)
April 6, 2015 58 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 57 Stipulation to extend time to respond to 54 Defendants Motion to Dismiss or Alternative Motion for Summary Judgment Filed Under Seal. Responses due by 4/17/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/6/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 20, 2015 60 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER denying 54 Motion to Seal 56 Motion for Summary Judgment, 55 Motion to Dismiss. Defendants are GRANTED LEAVE to file a renewed motion to seal by May 4, 2015. Defendants Motion to Dismiss 55 , Motion for Summary Judgment 56 , and attached exhibits are SEALED pending Defendants renewed motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
April 21, 2015 61 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 59 Stipulation to respond to 55 motion to dismiss or in the alternative motion for summary judgment and 56 motion for summary judgment or in the alternative motion to dismiss. Responses due by 4/27/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 5, 2015 65 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER granting 64 Stipulation to file redacted exhibits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/5/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
May 21, 2015 70 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Granting 66 Stipulation to Extend Time to Reply to 56 Motion for Summary Judgment. Reply due by 5/21/2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/21/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Thomas v. Clark County School District Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Filberto Arroyo
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County School District Police Department
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Edward Goldman
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Loren Johnson
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Jones
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Ketsaa
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Klemp
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Nebeker
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Darrin Puana
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Courtney Purcell
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tom Rodriquez
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Young
Represented By: Mark E Ferrario
Represented By: Kara B. Hendricks
Represented By: Moorea Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Thomas
Represented By: David J. Otto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.