November 19, 2018 |
Filing
178
ORDER granting 177 Stipulation re Settlement re Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
November 7, 2018 |
Filing
176
ORDER re: 175 Status Report. ORDERED that the deadline to file a renewed motion for attorney's fees is extended to November 30, 2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/7/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 17, 2018 |
Filing
174
ORDER that 156 Motion for Attorney's Fees is DENIED without prejudice to re-file it if settlement negotiations fail.FURTHER ORDERED that 173 Stipulation to Stay Briefing is GRANTED. On or before November 1, 2018, the parties shall fil e either a stipulated amount of attorney's fees and costs or a joint report regarding the status of negotiations. FURTHER ORDERED that any deadline that applies to filing the fee motion is tolled throughout the time the motion for fees has been pending through November 16, 2018, unless otherwise modified by the court.Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/17/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 18, 2018 |
Filing
172
ORDER granting 171 Stipulation to Stay Briefing re: 156 Motion for Attorney Fees. Responses due by 9/17/2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 19, 2018 |
Filing
170
ORDER granting 169 Stipulation and Settlement re 153 Plaintiff Center for Biological Diversity's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/19/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 15, 2018 |
Filing
167
ORDER granting 166 Stipulation to Stay Briefing re: 153 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
March 19, 2018 |
Filing
164
ORDER Granting 163 Stipulation and Joint Motion to Stay Briefing re 156 Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
|
March 16, 2018 |
Filing
162
ORDER granting 161 Stipulation to Stay Briefing re: 153 Motion for Attorney Fees until May 18, 2018. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 23, 2018 |
Filing
158
ORDER Granting 157 Stipulation to Defer Briefing for 60 Days re: 156 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/23/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 16, 2018 |
Filing
155
ORDER granting 154 Stipulation to Defer Briefing for 60 Days re: 153 Motion for Attorney Fees. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 23, 2017 |
Filing
136
ORDER that 87 , 93 , 97 , and 99 plaintiffs' Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.FURTHER ORDERED that 107 and 110 defendants' Motions for Summary Judgment are GRANTED in part and DENIED in part.FURTHER ORDERED that the identified issues are remanded to BLM. The clerk of the court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
July 26, 2016 |
Filing
123
ORDER that 122 Motion to Extend Time to file Summary Judgment Replies and for Permission to File a Combined Reply Brief Addressing the Oppositions Filed by All of the Plaintiffs is GRANTED. ORDERED that the summary judgment briefing schedule is modified as follows: Defendants shall file a combined reply brief of up to 70 pages in total supporting their motions for summary judgment in the Center for Biological Diversity and White Pine County cases by August 26, 2016.Defendant-Interv enor shall files its reply briefs to each of the Plaintiffs' summary judgment opposition briefs (Defendant-Intervenor's reply in the Center for Biological Diversity case will be limited to 30 pages, and Defendant-Intervenors reply in the White Pine County case will be limited to 45 pages) by September 9, 2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/26/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 20, 2015 |
Filing
84
ORDER Granting 83 Motion to Withdraw Maureen E Rudolph as Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
August 27, 2015 |
Filing
81
ORDER ON STIPULATION Granting 80 CORRECTED STIPULATION TO EXTEND BRIEFING SCHEDULE re: Joint Case Management Deadlines. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/27/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 24, 2015 |
Filing
62
ORDER that 58 Motion to Reinstate is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 31 Defendants' MOTION to Dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/24/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
February 10, 2015 |
Filing
57
ORDER that 31 Motion to Dismiss the original Complaint is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/10/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 17, 2014 |
Filing
54
ORDER Granting 52 Joint Case Management Statement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
October 15, 2014 |
Filing
48
ORDER Granting 46 Unopposed Motion to Appear by Telephone at the October 23, 2014 Discovery Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/15/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLR)
|
October 7, 2014 |
Filing
44
ORDER that the Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order must be filed by 10/21/2014. FURTHER ORDERED that a Discovery Hearing is set for 10/23/2014 at 03:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/7/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 25, 2014 |
Filing
37
ORDER Accepting 30 Report and Recommendation and 12 MOTION to Intervene as Defendant by Southern Nevada Water Authority is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that Southern Nevada Water Authority's Answer in Intervention is due ten days after entry of this Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/25/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
June 19, 2014 |
Filing
35
ORDER Granting 34 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 31 Partial MOTION to Dismiss. Responses due by 7/14/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
May 9, 2014 |
Filing
14
ORDER Granting 13 Motion to Substitute Attorney. Julie Cavahaugh-Bill is substituted in place and stead of Kelly Craig Brown for The Confederated Tribe of Goshute. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/9/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
April 10, 2014 |
Filing
11
ORDER Granting 10 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond. United States Bureau of Land Management answer due 5/21/2014; United States Department of Interior answer due 5/21/2014. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/10/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|