Davidson v. Neven et al
Petitioner: Roderick R. Davidson
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Dwight Neven
Case Number: 2:2014cv00551
Filed: April 11, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER. It is therefore ordered that 9 the First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in State Custody Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 2254 is denied. It is further ordered that the Petitioner is denied a certificate of appealability. It is further ordered that, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 25(d), the Clerk of Court is directed to substitute Jerry Howell for Dwight Neven as the Respondent warden on the docket for his case. It is further ordered that the Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/11/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER Granting 45 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 44 Answer to Amended Habeas Petition. Petitioner shall have through May 15, 2017, to file and serve a reply to the answer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 4/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 11, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER that 40 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED. Respondents will have through February 3, 2017, to file and serve an answer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/11/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
November 30, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER Granting 38 Motion to Extend Time re 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents will have through January 4, 2017, to file and serve an answer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 11/30/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER that 35 Motion for Partial Dismissal of Ground Six in the Amended Petition is GRANTED. Ground six of the first amended petition (ECF No. 9 ) is DISMISSED from this action. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to file and serve an answer, which shall comply with Rule 5 of the Rules Governing Section 2254 Cases in the United States District Courts. Petitioner shall have forty-five (45) days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER Granting in Part 20 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have thirty (30) days from the date of entry of this order to file a motion for dismissal without prejudice of the entire petition, for partial dismissal of ground 6, or for other appropriate relief. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/9/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
March 22, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER that 29 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. Respondents shall have through March 28, 2016, to file and serve a reply to petitioner's opposition to 20 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/22/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 25, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that 25 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 20 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED. Responses due by 3/4/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 2/25/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 19, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting 23 Motion to Extend Time to Respond re 20 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 2/19/2016. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/19/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER that 18 Respondents' Motion for Enlargement of Time nunc pro tunc is GRANTED. Respondents will have through October 20, 2015, to file and serve an answer or other response to 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
August 3, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 16 Motion to Extend Time to Answer/Respond re 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is GRANTED. Respondents shall have through September 17, 2015, to file and serve an answer or other response to the amended petition 9 . Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/3/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 17, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER that respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from the date of entry of this order to answer or otherwise respond to 9 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 6/17/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 22, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that 7 Motion to Extend Time to File First Amended Petition is GRANTED. Amended Petition due by 2/13/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 12/19/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
September 12, 2014 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that 2 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED as moot; that 3 Motion to Appoint Counsel is GRANTED. The Federal Public Defender is provisionally appointed to represent petitioner. FURTHER ORDERED that the cle rk shall add Catherine Cortez Masto, AttorneyGeneral for the State of Nevada, as counsel for respondents and electronically serve a copy of this order and 1 the Petition. FURTHER ORDERED that respondents' counsel shall enter a notice of appe arance within 20 days of entry of this order, but no further response shall be required from respondents until further order of the court. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/12/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM) (Main Document 4 replaced on 9/12/2014) (MMM).
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davidson v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Roderick R. Davidson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?