Lane, III v. Neven et al
Petitioner: |
Charles Lane, III |
Respondent: |
Attorney General State of Nevada and Dwight Neven |
Case Number: |
2:2014cv00794 |
Filed: |
May 20, 2014 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Peggy A. Leen |
Nature of Suit: |
Habeas Corpus (General) |
Cause of Action: |
28 U.S.C. § 2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State) |
Jury Demanded By: |
None |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
August 21, 2017 |
Filing
34
ORDER that the 12 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus is Denied. The Clerk shall enter judgment accordingly. A certificate of appealability is Denied. All pending 27 , 29 , and 30 Motions for Extension of Time are Granted nunc pro tunc as of their respective filing dates. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
May 8, 2017 |
Filing
32
ORDER Granting 31 Motion to Extend Time to Reply re 28 Answer to Amended Habeas Petition. Replies due by 5/11/2017. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 5/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
September 13, 2016 |
Filing
26
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Respondents' 16 Motion to Dismiss the 12 First Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas. Ground One of the amended petition relates back and shall proceed. Ground Two relates back and may pro ceed based on technical exhaustion to the extent discussed supra. Ground Three is dismissed as procedurally defaulted.Respondents shall file and serve an answer to all remaining grounds of the petition within 45 days from the entry of this order. Petitioner shall file and serve a reply to the answer within 30 days after being served the answer. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/13/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 27, 2015 |
Filing
14
ORDER re 12 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Respondents shall file response within 90 days of the date of this order. Petitioner has 30 days from service to file a reply or opposition. The hard copy of any additional state court rec ord exhibits shall be forwarded to the staff attorneys in Reno. Petitioner's 11 Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File an Amended Petition is Granted nunc pro tunc as of 5/13/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/27/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
March 17, 2015 |
Filing
10
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 9 Motion to Extend Time. Amended Petition for a Writ of Habeas Corpus due by 5/15/2015. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/17/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 29, 2014 |
Filing
3
ORDER Granting Petitioner's 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The clerk of the court shall file the petition for a writ of habeas corpus. Petitioner's 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is Granted. The Federal Public Defender is provisionally appointed to represent petitioner. Respondents' counsel shall enter a notice of appearance within 20 days of entry of this order. The hard copy of any additional state court record exhibits shall be forwarded for this case to the staff attorneys in Las Vegas. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 9/29/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - electronically served this Order and Petition to the Attorney General - SLD)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?