May 24, 2023 |
Filing
89
ORDER Granting 88 Motion to Extend Time. Attorney General State of Nevada and Dwight Neven answer due 7/7/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/24/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JQC)
|
March 23, 2023 |
Filing
87
ORDER Granting 86 Motion to Extend Time to file answer to complaint. Attorney General State of Nevada answer due 5/23/2023; Dwight Neven answer due 5/23/2023. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
January 23, 2023 |
Filing
85
ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 69 Motion to Dismiss. Grounds 3, 4, 5, and 6 of Petitioner's second amended habeas petition 44 are dismissed. Ground 7 is limited to the Court's consideration of Grounds 1 and 2. IT IS FUR THER ORDERED that Respondents have 60 days from the date of entry of this order to file an answer to the remaining grounds for relief in the petition. Petitioner shall have 60 days from the date on which the answer is served on him to file and serve a reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/23/2023. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
June 28, 2022 |
Filing
81
ORDER Granting 80 Motion to Extend Time to file reply re 69 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 8/3/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/28/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
May 16, 2022 |
Filing
79
ORDER Granting 77 Motion to Extend Time to file reply re 69 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 6/27/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LOE)
|
March 16, 2022 |
Filing
76
ORDER Granting 75 Motion to Extend Time Re: 69 Motion to Dismiss. Replies due by 5/13/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 3/16/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KF)
|
February 23, 2022 |
Filing
73
ORDER Granting 66 Motion to Seal and 72 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 69 Motion to Dismiss. Responses due by 3/8/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/23/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
February 8, 2022 |
Filing
71
ORDER granting 70 Motion to Extend Time Re: 69 Motion to Dismiss - Responses due by 2/22/2022. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/8/2022. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
October 21, 2021 |
Filing
59
ORDER granting 58 Motion to Extend Time 44 Second Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Responses/Answers due 12/6/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 10/21/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
September 7, 2021 |
Filing
57
ORDER granting 56 Motion to Extend Time Re: 44 Amended Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus. Answers are due 10/22/2021. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/4/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
|
February 22, 2019 |
Filing
42
ORDER Granting 41 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 33 Motion for Reconsideration. Petitioner's Replies due by 4/8/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 2/22/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 24, 2019 |
Filing
37
ORDER granting 32 Motion to Strike. The clerk of the court shall STRIKE petitioner's proper-person notification (ECF No. 30 ). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/24/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
December 12, 2018 |
Filing
36
ORDER Granting Respondents' 35 Unopposed Motion to Extend Time Re: 33 Motion for Reconsideration and 34 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Petition. Responses due by 2/19/2019. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
September 27, 2018 |
Filing
29
ORDER that respondents' 25 Motion to Dismiss is GRANTED in part with respect to grounds 3-5, 8, 9, 11-15, and 17. Petitioner has 90 day deadline to inform the Court how he wants to proceed. Petitioner's 27 Motion for Relief fr om Judgment is DENIED. The Court reconsiders Petitioner's 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel and GRANTS it. The Federal Public Defender is provisionally appointed to represent petitioner. The Federal Public Defender has 30 days from th e date that this order is entered to undertake direct representation of petitioner or to indicate to the Court his inability to represent petitioner in these proceedings. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
January 9, 2018 |
Filing
24
ORDER that grounds 16, 24, and 26 of the 22 amended petition are DISMISSED. Respondents have 45 days from the date of entry of this order to answer or otherwise respond to the amended petition. Petitioner has 45 days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/9/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
June 7, 2017 |
Filing
18
ORDER that respondents shall have 45 days from the date of entry of this order to answer or otherwise respond to the 14 petition. Petitioner shall have 45 days from the date on which the answer is served to file a reply. If respondents file a motion then the briefing schedule of Local Rule LR 7-2 shall apply. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/7/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
July 20, 2015 |
Filing
13
ORDER that 10 Motion for Reconsideration is GRANTED. This action is REINSTATED. FURTHER ORDERED that 2 Motion for Appointment of Counsel is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 3 Motion for Evidentiary Hearing is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that the c lerk shall file the petition. FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall have thirty (60) days from the date of entry of this order to show cause why the court should not dismiss this action as untimely. FURTHER ORDERED that the clerk shall add Adam Paul Laxalt as counsel for respondents and electronically serve upon respondents a copy of the petition and this order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/20/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
January 25, 2015 |
Filing
9
ORDER Denying Petitioner's 8 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider 6 Order. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/23/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|
December 23, 2014 |
Filing
6
ORDER that this action is Dismissed without prejudice for petitioner's failure to pay the filing fee. The clerk of the court shall enter judgment accordingly. FURTHER ORDERED that a certificate of appealability is Denied. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/23/2014. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
|