September 30, 2017 |
Filing
307
ORDER granting Defendant's 297 Motion for Summary Judgment. The Clerk of Court is directed to enter judgment in favor of Defendants and close this case. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/29/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - BEL)
|
July 5, 2017 |
Filing
304
ORDER to Produce Peter J. Helfrich. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF -cc: USM - ADR)
|
September 20, 2016 |
Filing
295
ORDER Denying 293 Motion For A Speedy Trial and 294 Motion for Judical Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
July 27, 2016 |
Filing
275
ORDER To Produce Documents. (See Order for details). Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/27/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DL)
|
June 27, 2016 |
Filing
263
ORDER to Produce Peter J. Helfrich. IT IS ORDERED that the Warden of High Desert State Prison, or his designee, shall transport and produce PETER J. HELFRICH, #111875, to the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard, South, in Las Vegas, Nevada, on or about July 25, 2016, at the hour of 10:00 a.m. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/27/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: copy placed in USM's box - TR)
|
January 13, 2016 |
Filing
225
ORDER Granting 208 Motion to Strike 201 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/13/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
September 15, 2015 |
Filing
177
ORDER Granting 174 Motion to Extend Time to respond to 166 Motion for Special Reconsideration for Appointment of Counsel. Response due by 9/18/2015. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/15/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
|
September 11, 2015 |
Filing
173
ORDER to Produce Peter J. Helfrich. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Warden of Lovelock Correctional Center, or his designee, shall transport and produce PETER J. HELFRICH, #111875, to the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Bou levard, South, in Las Vegas, Nevada, on or about Monday, October 5, 2015, at the hour of 9:30 a.m., to attend a calendar call hearing Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 9/11/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - TR)
|
August 6, 2015 |
Filing
163
ORDER that 135 Motion to Compel is DENIED as moot; 136 Motion to Compel is DENIED; and 155 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED in part and DENIED in part. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/6/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
July 13, 2015 |
Filing
154
ORDER Granting 150 Stipulated Motion to Withdraw. Plaintiff and the Defendants stipulate to withdraw 140 Motion for an Indigent Set of Copies, 141 Motion for Reconsideration, 146 Motion to Compel Interrogatories, and 147 Motion to Compel Production of Documents. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 7/13/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
June 22, 2015 |
Filing
149
ORDER that 86 Motion for a Court Order is DENIED as moot. Plaintiffs motion to appoint expert dental and medical witnesses 91 is hereby DENIED. Plaintiffs motion to amend the scheduling order 108 is hereby GRANTED. Discovery due 9/4/15. Pl aintiffs motions for copies 137 and 140 are hereby DENIED without prejudice, except for his request regarding the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Docket No. 137, at 2, is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/22/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
June 2, 2015 |
Filing
139
ORDER Denying 4 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 22 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 25 Motion for Preliminary injunction, 26 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, 41 Emergency Secondary Motion for Temporary Restraining Or der, 42 Emergency Secondary Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 89 Emergency Motion for Preliminary Injunction, 90 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order, 96 Motion for Temporary Restraining order, 105 Motion for Preliminary Injunction, [106 ] Motion for Temporary Restraining order. IT IS ORDERED that 30 Motion to Strike, 47 Motion to Strike, 51 Motion to Strike, 58 Motion to Strike, 61 Motion to Strike, 121 Motion for Leave to File Supplement, 133 Motion for Leave to F ile Supplement are DENIED as MOOT. IT IS ORDERED that 15 Motion for Leave to File Supplemental Exhibits, 43 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint and Secondary TRO and Preliminary Injunction, 85 Motion to Amend/Correct, 97 Motion for Preliminary Injunction are GRANTED in PART and DENIED in PART. See order for details. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 6/2/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
May 1, 2015 |
Filing
112
ORDER that 94 Order to Produce is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Warden of High Desert State Prison, or his designee, shall transport and produce PETER J. HELFRICH, #111875, to the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard, South, in Las Vegas, Nevada, on or about Tuesday, May 26, 2015, at the hour of 2:00 p.m., to attend a hearing in the instant matter, and arrange for his appearance on said date as ordered and directed by the Court entitled above. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 5/1/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM TR)
|
April 30, 2015 |
Filing
111
ORDER Denying 101 Motion to Waive Filing Fees for Writ of Mandamus and finding as moot 107 Motion for Copy of Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/30/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 29, 2015 |
Filing
110
ORDER denying 76 Motion to Extend Prison Copy Work Limits. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/29/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 21, 2015 |
Filing
94
ORDER to produce Peter J. Helfrich. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Warden of High Desert State Prison, or his designee, shall transport and produce PETER J. HELFRICH, #111875, to the Lloyd D. George United States Courthouse, 333 Las Vegas Bouleva rd, South, in Las Vegas, Nevada, on or about Monday, May 4, 2015, at the hour of 2:00 p.m., to attend a hearing in the instant matter, and arrange for his appearance on said date. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/21/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
April 20, 2015 |
Filing
92
ORDER granting 88 Motion to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order to the deadline for submission of motions for summary judgment for 60 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 4/20/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ)
|
March 5, 2015 |
Filing
70
ORDER that 16 Motion for Order to Extend Prison Copy Work Limits is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 59 Motion for Order to Extend Prison Copy Work Limits is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Nevada Department of Corrections shall increase Plaintiff's copy work limit so that he is allotted an additional $10 worth of copy privileges. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
February 12, 2015 |
Filing
62
ORDER Striking Filed Documents re 56 Plaintiff's Interrogatories and Request for Production of Documents, 57 Plaintiff's Request for Admissions. Because the request for admissions, the interrogatories, and request for product ion of documents were filed in violation of Local Rule 26-8, they shall be STRICKEN by the Clerk. The Court ORDERS the parties and counsel to cease filing discovery documents on the docket in compliance with Local Rule 26-8. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/12/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
February 5, 2015 |
Filing
55
ORDER that 48 Motion for a Speedy Trial is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 52 Motion for Judicial Notice is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 53 Motion for Submission is DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 2/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
January 5, 2015 |
Filing
34
ORDER For Typed Dental Report. Defendants are hereby ORDERED to file under seal by Jan. 9, 2015, a typed and legible version of the Dental Report. It is FURTHER OREDERED that Defendants shall produce a copy of the typed Dental Report to Plaintiff Helfrich by Jan. 9, 2015. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/5/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|
December 17, 2014 |
Filing
29
ORDER for Status Report that Defendant Dr. Hanson is hereby ORDERED to file with the Court, by Dec. 29, 2014, a status report indicating if and when Plaintiff Helfrich was seen by an outside oral surgeon/specialist and attach, under seal, the out side oral surgeon/specialists report. It is FURTHER ORDERED that Defendant Dr. Hanson shall produce a copy of the outside oral surgeon/specialists report, by Dec. 29, 2014, to Plaintiff Helfrich. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 12/17/14. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
|