Jackson v. Lozano et al
Plaintiff: Raymond Jackson
Defendant: Carrillo, Dr. Homes, Alexis Lozano, Dwight Neven and Ronnie Thompson
Case Number: 2:2014cv01922
Filed: November 18, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER denying 26 Motion to Reopen Case; ORDER denying 27 Motion to Enforce; Signed by Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/21/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 2, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/2/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
June 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER Granting 20 Motion to Extend Time to File 90-Day Stay Report. Status Report due by 8/11/2015. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
May 14, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER Denying 12 Motion for TRO. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/14/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
April 30, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER that the Attorney General's Office shall advise the Court within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this order whether it can accept service of process for the named Defendants and enter a general appearance. Defendants shall fil e a response to Plaintiff's 12 Motion for Temporary Restraining Order within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 4/30/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - Order and 12 Motion electronically served to the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jackson v. Lozano et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carrillo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Homes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexis Lozano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronnie Thompson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?