United States et al v. Guarantee Company of North America USA
Plaintiff: Sequoia Electric, LLC
Defendant: Guarantee Company of North America USA
415) 744-6576 (fax: United States
Case Number: 2:2014cv02045
Filed: December 5, 2014
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 40:270 Miller Act
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, and DECREED that 47 defendant's motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 54 defendant's stipulation for extension of time to file a reply in support of its motion for summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. The clerk shall enter judgment accordingly and close the case. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 3/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
August 8, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 55 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 47 Motion for Summary Judgment (Second Request). Replies due by 8/14/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 8/8/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting 49 Stipulation for Extension of Time re 47 Motion for Summary Judgment (First Request). Responses due by 7/10/2017. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
February 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that 22 defendant's motion for partial summary judgment be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. See Order for details. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 2/1/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER Granting 24 Stipulation re 22 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment. Replies due by 6/23/2016. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States et al v. Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guarantee Company of North America USA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sequoia Electric, LLC
Represented By: John Henry Wright
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
415) 744-6576 (fax: United States
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?