Johnson v. Lopez et al
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Defendant: Isidro Baca, Baker, Renee Baker, Julio Calderon, James Cox, Michael Koehn, Kurner, Brandon Lawrence, Luis Lopez, Dwight Neven, Andrew Silverstein, J. Taylor and Nissel Young
Case Number: 2:2015cv00884
Filed: May 11, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 ORDER granting 167 STIPULATION to Amend 147 Joint Pre-Trial Order. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/22/2020, nunc pro tunc to February 19, 2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRS)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER to Produce Lausteveion Johnson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 150 ORDER to Produce Lausteveion Johnson. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 143 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 140 Motion to Withdraw 137 and 138 Motions to Withdraw Counsel. Plaintiff's motions to withdraw counsel are deemed WITHDRAWN. The hearing set for 10/31/2019 at 10:99 a.m. is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/16/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
July 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 130 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part Defendants' 128 Motion. Plaintiff's 129 Motion to Extend Time is Granted. The parties must file a joint proposed pretrial order no later than 8/7/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER Setting Status Hearing. Status Hearing set for 6/18/2019 at 11:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe. All counsel for all parties must be present in the courtroom for the hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/31/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
December 27, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER ADOPTING in part 118 Report and Recommendation. The Clerk of Court is directed to ENTER DEFAULT against defendant Brandon Lawrence. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 12/27/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
December 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 119 ORDER that this case is referred to the Pilot Pro Bono Program for appointment of counsel for the purposes identified herein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Pro Bono Liaison - SLD)
June 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 112 ORDER Denying 111 Motion to Withdraw Attorney as to Defendant Lawrence. Counsel shall promptly provide notice of this order to Defendant Lawrence using the currently-available contact information and shall file a proof of service by 6/14/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/12/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 30, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 104 ORDER that Defendants' 49 motion to dismiss is CONSTRUED as a motion to strike under FRCP 12(f) and is GRANTED. All claims against Nissel Young or N. Young are STRICKEN from Johnsons second-amended complaint. Defendants' 55 motion to dismiss is GRANTED in part and DENIED in in all other respects. The motion is also CONSTRUED in part as a motion to strike under FRCP 12(f) and is GRANTED. Johnson's 66 motion to quash the information or demurrer is DENIED. Defend ants' 72 motion for leave to file excess pages is GRANTED.Johnson's 103 motion for oral argument is DENIED.Defendants' 85 motion for partial summary judgment on Count I is GRANTED in part and DENIED in all other respec ts.Defendants' 84 motion for summary judgment on Count II is GRANTED in part and DENIED in all other respects. Johnson's 60 and 78 motions for summary judgment on Count II are DENIED.Defendants' 82 motion for summar y judgment on Count V is GRANTED.Johnson's 90 motion for summary judgment on Count V is DENIED.Defendants' 83 motion for summary judgment on Count VI is GRANTED. This matter is referred to a magistrate judge for a mandatory settlement conference. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/30/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
August 3, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 ORDER Granting Defendants' 73 Third Motion to Extend Time. Motions due by 10/3/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 11/2/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 8/2/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER Granting 63 Second Motion to Extend Time re Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 8/2/2017. Motions due by 8/19/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER Granting Defendants' 50 Motion for Clarification. Discovery due by 5/19/2017. Motions due by 6/19/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/19/2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER granting 39 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint. The Clerk of Court is directed to FILE the second amended complaint 39 -1. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED respondents must respond to the second amended complaint by April 21, 2017. Summary-judgment motions are due by May 19, 2017, and the proposed joint pretrial order is due June 19, 2017. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/31/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
March 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER Granting Defendants' 43 Motion to Extend Time Discovery Deadlines. Discovery due by 5/19/2017. Motions due by 6/19/2017. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 7/19/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
October 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER that Plaintiff's 5 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is Granted. Plaintiff shall not be required to pay an initial installment of the filing fee but if the action is dismissed the full filing fee must still b e paid. The Clerk shall electronically serve a copy of this Order and the 9 Amended Complaint on the Office of the Attorney General of the State of Nevada, attention Kat Howe. Within 21 days of the date of entry of this Order the Attorney Genera l's Office shall file a notice advising the Court and Plaintiff re names of Defendants whom it does/does not accept service for. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 10/17/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: Finance Dept and copy mailed to Chief of Inmate Services - SLD)
September 23, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting Defendants' 22 Motion to Extend Litigation Stay. The stay is extended through 10/14/2016. Defendants shall file their updated status report on or before 10/14/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 9/23/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
May 3, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER that 16 Second Motion to Extend Stay is GRANTED. The stay is extended through September 19, 2016. FURTHER ORDERED that the Office of the Attorney General shall file an updated status report on or before September 19, 2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/3/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
March 10, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Granting Defendants' 14 Motion to Extend the Stay. The stay is extended through 6/20/2016. The Office of the Attorney General shall file an updated status report on or before 6/20/2016. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/10/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
June 4, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER that 3 Motion to Extend Time is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that, no later than June 30, 2015, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, on the correct form with complete financial attachment s in compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a); or (2) pay the full $400 fee for filing a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee). FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/4/15. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
May 13, 2015 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER that Plaintiff shall either file a complete Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis or pay the full $400 filing fee by 6/12/2015. The Clerk of the Court shall retain the 1 Complaint but not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 5/13/2015. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - IFP form/instructions mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Johnson v. Lopez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Isidro Baca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Renee Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Julio Calderon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Koehn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kurner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandon Lawrence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Luis Lopez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Silverstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Taylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissel Young
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lausteveion Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?