Tagle v. State of Nevada et al
Plaintiff: Victor Tagle
Defendant: Lieutenant Bean, Rebecca Boyd, Greg Cox, Sherryl Foster, NDOC, Jennifer Nash, W.D. Nevan, Lieutenant Olive, Guard Owens, Michael Oxborraw, Guard Provancal, State of Nevada and Guard Wing
Case Number: 2:2015cv01402
Filed: July 23, 2015
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 218 ORDER denying 170 Motion to Dismiss; ORDER granting 171 Motion for Summary Judgment; ORDER denying 183 Motion to Change Venue; ORDER overruling 207 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1; ORDER granting 208 Motio n to Extend Time; ORDER denying 210 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 212 Motion to Strike; ORDER denying 216 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default. This action is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 2/7/2019.; Case terminated. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Main Document 218 replaced on 2/8/2019 per chambers) (DC).
November 14, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 202 ORDER denying 182 Motion; ORDER denying 184 Motion for Hearing; ORDER denying 185 Motion; ORDER granting 192 Motion to Strike; ORDER granting 198 Motion to Strike; ORDER granting 199 Motion to Strike; Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/14/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 16, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER granting 187 Motion to Extend Time; Re: 183 Motion to Change Venue, 184 Motion for Hearing Before Magistrate Judge, 182 Motion. Responses due by 10/22/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/16/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 3, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 165 DISCOVERY PLAN AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Discovery due by 11/5/2018. Motions due by 12/5/2018. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 1/4/2019. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the stay is lifted. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that appearing defendants must file an answer or response to the complaint, on or before 7/18/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/3/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
May 4, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 156 ORDER Plaintiff Victor Tagle must file a notice of change of contact information on or before June 4, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/4/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Addresses pursuant to Order - JM)
October 20, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 152 ORDER denying 121 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order.; denying 136 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/20/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
October 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER striking 142 Motion; granting 145 Motion for Leave to File; granting 146 Motion to Strike 143 Affidavit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 10/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 141 ORDER re 140 Status Report. Status Hearing set for 1/4/2018 at 01:00 PM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. FURTHER ORDERED that the instant case is stayed until 1/3/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/5/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
July 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER that an updated Status Report due by 9/1/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 6, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 126 ORDER denying 95 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying 113 Motion to Strike. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/6/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
June 1, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER denying 116 Motion for Issue of Summonses; granting 117 Motion to Strike 100 Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/1/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
May 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 120 ORDER denying 96 Motion to Intervene.; denying 107 Motion for Increase Copy Work.; denying 108 Motion for Review.; denying 109 Motion for Hearing.; granting 114 Motion to Strike 99 .; granting 115 Motion to Strike 102 and 103 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 5/18/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM) (Main Document 120 replaced on 5/18/2017) (JM).
March 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 92 ORDER that 82 , 83 , and 90 Tagle's Motions are DENIED without prejudice to their re- filing once the stay in this case is lifted. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 3/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 78 ORDER denying without prejudice 61 Motion to Correct Wrongful Court's decision and denying without prejudice 77 Answer to Letter. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 1/12/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DC)
November 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Tagle's motions 63 ; 65 ; 67 and 69 are DENIED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 11/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
October 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 57 ORDER denying without prejudice 38 Motion for District Judge to Reconsider Order.; denying without prejudice 49 Motion.; denying without prejudice 51 Motion.; denying without prejudice 54 Motion.; denying without prejudice 55 Motion for Default Judgment. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 10/5/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
September 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER denying as moot 48 Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
August 18, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER Granting 1 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The NV Dept. of Corrections shall pay to the Clerk, 20% of the preceding month's deposits to Plaintiff's Account, until fee paid. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/18/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF and Pursuant to Order - JM)
August 17, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER Denying 10 Motion for TRO.; Denying 11 Motion for Sanctions; Denying 13 Motion for Default Judgment; Denying 22 Motion ; Denying 24 Motion. FURTHER ORDERED that defendants must file their updated status report in compliance with 6/10/2016 order [ECF No. 8] by 8/19/2016. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 8/17/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tagle v. State of Nevada et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Bean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rebecca Boyd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Cox
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sherryl Foster
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NDOC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jennifer Nash
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: W.D. Nevan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lieutenant Olive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Owens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Oxborraw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Provancal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Guard Wing
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Tagle
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?