Pathak v. Exotic Meat Market, Inc.
Plaintiff: Anshu Pathak
Defendant: Exotic Meat Market, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv00368
Filed: February 23, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:44 Trademark Infringement
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
October 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 82 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 10/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
September 12, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 79 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION. IT IS RECOMMENDED that case 2:16-cv-00368-JAD-VCF be DISMISSED. IT IS FURTHER RECOMMENDED that 21 the United States Patent and Trademark Office's motion to dismiss in case 2:16-cv-02096-RFB-VCF be GRANTED and the case be DISMISSED. Objections to R&R due by 9/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 9/12/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 77 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the settlement conference is rescheduled to 10:00 AM, 9/12/17. All else as stated in the Order scheduling the settlement conference remains unchanged. (2:16-cv-00368-JAD-VCF, ECF No. 71, 2:16-cv-02096-RFB-VCF, EC F No. 19). IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Sunil Bhasin must submit on or before 8/16/17, in camera to chambers (United States District Court, Attn: U.S. Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach, 333 Las Vegas Boulevard South, Suite 3005, Las Vegas, Nevada 89101), documentation from his treating physician verifying the details of his illness. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
July 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 74 MINUTE ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 73 Nerry Pathal's Request to Attend Settlement Conference as Corporate Officer of Exotic Meat Market Inc. is GRANTED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 13, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 68 ORDER that a Status Hearing is set for 6/28/2017 at 10:00 AM in LV Courtroom 3D before Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach. The date for the settlement conference will be set at the status hearing. An officer, director or managing agent of Exotic Meat, Inc., Anshu Pathak and Sunil Bhasin must attend the hearing in person. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 6/13/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 4, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 56 Bhasin'smotion to dismiss or, alternatively, to transfer venue is DENIED withoutprejudice. If Bhasin wants to reurge his motion, he must do so by 4/11/17. Bhasin must also SERVE a copy of the motion on Pathak in the manner authorized under FRCP 5(b)(2) and FILE by 4/14/17, a certificate with the court indicating how service was accomplished. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 4/4/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
September 20, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 55 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Clerk of Court is directed to STRIKE 19 Anshu Pathak's First Amended Complaint and to SET ASIDE 38 39 the default judgments that have been entered against Primerose Financial Group, Inc., Allied Globa l Care, Capital Finance and Investment Trust, and Alternative Global Health, Inc. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 41 Anshu Pathak's motions for entry of default judgment against Primerose Financial Group, Inc., 42 Allied Global Care, 43 Capital Finance and Investment Trust, and 44 Alternative Global Health, Inc are DENIED as moot. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 52 Sunil Bhasin's motion to dismiss the first amended complaint and 53 related request for judicial notice are DENIED as moot; 48 Anshu Pathak's objections to the magistrate judge's order granting Bhasin's motion to intervene are OVERRULED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 31 40 Anshu Pathak's motions for entry of default judgment a gainst Exotic Meat Market, Inc. are DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 54 the minute order setting the briefing schedule on Sunil Bhasin's motion to dismiss is VACATED. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/20/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
August 9, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 47 MINUTE ORDER Granting 33 Motion to Intervene. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 8/9/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
June 6, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 13 Motion for Entry of Clerks Default is DENIED without prejudice. Proof of service due by 6/27/2016. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 15 Objections are overruled. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 6/6/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - TR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pathak v. Exotic Meat Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Exotic Meat Market, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anshu Pathak
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?