Torres v. Neven et al
Petitioner: Angel Torres
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada and Dwight Neven
Case Number: 2:2016cv00443
Filed: March 1, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Carl W. Hoffman
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (State)
Jury Demanded By: None

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 59 petitioners motion for voluntary dismissal is granted, and the petition for writ of habeas corpus in this case is dismissed. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court shall enter final judgment accordingly and close this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 2/15/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER Re: 59 Motion. Responses due 10 days of the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/12/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: 30 to P - JM)
December 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER Re: 27 Answer to Habeas Petition. Petitioner shall have until 2/4/19, within which to file a reply to the respondents' answer to the petition in this case.Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 6, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Granting 54 Motion to Extend Time Re: 27 Answer to Habeas Petition. Petitioner shall have up to and including 1/18/19, within which to file a reply to the respondents' answer to the petition in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/6/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
May 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 30 petitioner's motion for leave to amend is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that petitioner shall file any reply to the respondents answer within thirty days of the date of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 5/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR) Modified on 5/23/2018 to correct filing and signature date (ADR).
March 26, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 29 ORDER Granting 28 Motion to Extend Time Re: 27 Answer to Habeas Petition. Petitioner shall have up to and including 5/23/18, within which to file a reply to the respondents' answer to the petition in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 3/26/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 18, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Granting 25 Motion to Extend Time. Respondents shall have up to and including 2/21/2018, within which to file an answer to the petition for writ of habeas corpus in this case. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 1/18/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 21, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Granting in part and Denying in part 10 Motion to Dismiss. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents file an answer to all remaining claims in the petition within thirty (30) days of the date of this order. See order for further deadlines. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/21/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 18, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit Denying 21 Petition for Writ of Mandamus. The petition for a writ of mandamus is denied without prejudice to the filing of a new petition if the district court has not acted on the pending motion to dismiss within 90 days. The motion to proceed informa pauperis is denied as moot. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
September 28, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 14 petitioner's second motion for appointment of counsel and 13 second motion for an evidentiary hearing both are DENIED. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/28/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
December 29, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting in part 17 Motion. The time for petitioner to dispatch a reply to respondents' opposition to his 14 motion for appointment of counsel is extended up to and including twenty-one (21) days from entry of this order. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 12/29/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: Copies Mailed to P pursuant to Order - JM)
September 15, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 1 the application to proceed in forma pauperis is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk shall FILE and ELECTRONICALLY SERVE the petition upon the respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 2 petitioner 9;s motion for the appointment of counsel is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 3 petitioner's motion for an evidentiary hearing is DENIED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court SHALL ADD attorney General Adam Paul Laxalt t o the CM/ECF docket sheet as counsel for respondents. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that respondents shall have forty-five (45) days from the entry of this order within which to answer, or otherwise respond to, the petition. In their answer or other response, respondents shall address all claims presented in the petition. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 9/15/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torres v. Neven et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Dwight Neven
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Angel Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?