Hyatt v. United States Patent and Trademark Office et al
Plaintiff: Hyatt, American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc. and Gilbert P. Hyatt
Defendant: United States Patent and Trademark Office and Michelle K Lee
Case Number: 2:2016cv01490
Filed: June 22, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Robert C Jones
Referring Judge: Peggy A Leen
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2019 Filing 36 MANDATE of USCA, Federal Circuit, as to ECF No. #35 USCA Order re ECF No. #30 Notice of Appeal. USCA Fed.Cir. Case No. 17-1722. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KW)
January 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 35 ORDER of USCA, Federal Circuit, as to ECF No. #30 Notice of Appeal: The petition for panel rehearing is denied. The petition for rehearing en banc is denied. The mandate of the court will issue on January 17, 2019. Federal Circuit Case No. 2017-1722. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LH)
September 24, 2018 Filing 34 MEMORANDUM/OPINION of USCA, Federal Circuit, as to ECF No. #30 Notice of Appeal : USDC AFFIRMED-IN-PART AND REVERSED-IN-PART. Federal Circuit Case No. 2017-1722. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
March 8, 2017 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT DESIGNATION by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt re #30 Notice of Appeal,. Transcripts are NOT required for this appeal. (Grossman, Andrew)
March 1, 2017 Filing 32 TRANSMITTAL TO OF APPEAL PACKET TO U.S. COURT OF APPEALS FOR THE FEDERAL CIRCUIT re ECF No. #30 Notice of Appeal (NVD_03.01.2017_16cv1490_NOA). (Attachments: #1 NVD_03.01.2017_16cv1490_docket sheet, #2 NVD_03.01.2017_16cv1490_order, #3 NVD_03.01.2017_16cv1490_judgment) (KW)
March 1, 2017 Filing 31 TRANSMITTAL TO USCA 9th Circuit re ECF No. #30 Notice of Appeal, which has been forwarded electronically to U.S. Court of Appeals for the Federal Circuit for submission. (KW)
March 1, 2017 Filing 30 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #29 Judgment, #28 Order Dismissing Case, by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0978-4500449. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. (Grossman, Andrew) (NEF regenerated to transmit Notice of Appeal to Federal Circuit).
February 17, 2017 Filing 29 JUDGMENT. Signed by Clerk of Court Debra K. Kempi on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 17, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER granting ECF No. #22 Motion for Summary Judgment; denying ECF No. #21 Motion for Summary Judgment; directing Clerk to enter judgment dismissing this action for lack of subject matter jurisdiction and close case. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 2/17/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
February 3, 2017 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to #22 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Defendants Michelle K Lee, United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Silfen, Molly)
January 24, 2017 Filing 26 Unopposed MOTION to Extend Time regarding dispositive matter (First Request) re #24 Response to Motion by Defendants Michelle K Lee, United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Silfen, Molly)
January 12, 2017 Filing 25 REPLY to Response to #21 Motion for Summary Judgment filed by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Grossman, Andrew)
January 12, 2017 Filing 24 RESPONSE to #22 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt. Replies due by 1/26/2017. (Grossman, Andrew)
December 9, 2016 Filing 23 RESPONSE to #21 Motion for Summary Judgment, filed by Defendants Michelle K Lee, United States Patent and Trademark Office. Replies due by 12/23/2016. (Silfen, Molly)
December 9, 2016 Filing 22 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Defendants Michelle K Lee, United States Patent and Trademark Office. Responses due by 12/30/2016. (Silfen, Molly)
November 9, 2016 Filing 21 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt. Responses due by 12/3/2016. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Gilbert P. Hyatt)(Grossman, Andrew)
October 13, 2016 Filing 20 NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.)NOTICE OF GENERAL ORDER 2013-1 AND OPPORTUNITY FOR EXPEDITED TRIAL SETTING: The parties in this action are provided with a link to General Order 2013-1 and the USDC Short Trial Rules on the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov. If the parties agree that this action can be ready for trial within 180 days and that a trial of this matter would take three (3) days or less, the parties should consider participation in the USDC Short Trial Program. If the parties wish to be considered for entry into the Court's Short Trial Program, they should execute and electronically file with USDC Short Trial Form 4(a)(1) or Form 4(a)(2). (no image attached) (DRM)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER on ECF No. #17 Stipulated Scheduling Order. Administrative Record due by 10/11/2016. Ps' Summary Judgment Motion due by 11/9/2016. Ds' Combined Response/Motion for Summary Judgment due by 12/9/2016. Ps' Combined Response and Reply due by 1/12/2017. Ds' Reply due by 1/26/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/12/2016. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
October 11, 2016 Filing 18 NOTICE of filing Administrative Record by Michelle K Lee, United States Patent and Trademark Office. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Administrative Record)(Silfen, Molly)
October 6, 2016 Filing 17 PROPOSED Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order filed by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt . (Grossman, Andrew)
August 25, 2016 Filing 16 ANSWER to #1 Complaint,, filed by Michelle K Lee, United States Patent and Trademark Office. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 10/9/2016.(Silfen, Molly) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.
August 17, 2016 Filing 15 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. All Defendants. (Grossman, Andrew)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER approving ECF No. #12 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew M. Grossman for Gilbert P. Hyatt and AAET, and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/5/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
August 5, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER approving ECF No. #11 Verified Petition for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. DeLaquil for Gilbert P. Hyatt and AAET, and approving Designation of Local Counsel. Signed by Judge Robert C. Jones on 8/5/2016. Any Attorney not yet registered with the Court's CM/ECF System shall submit a Registration Form on the Court's website #www.nvd.uscourts.gov (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - KR)
July 18, 2016 Filing 12 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Andrew M. Grossman and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert T. Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4202931) filed by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt . (Stewart, Robert)
July 18, 2016 Filing 11 VERIFIED PETITION for Permission to Practice Pro Hac Vice by Mark W. DeLaquil and DESIGNATION of Local Counsel Robert T. Stewart (Filing fee $ 250 receipt number 0978-4202921) filed by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt . (Stewart, Robert)
June 24, 2016 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro, on 6/24/2016. IT IS ORDERED that this case is reassigned to Judge Robert C. Jones for all further proceedings. All further documents must bear the correct case number 2:16-cv-01490-RCJ-PAL. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DKJ) Modified verbiage on 6/24/2016 (DKJ).
June 24, 2016 Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon, on 6/24/2016. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Judge Andrew P. Gordon recuses himself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - CS)
June 23, 2016 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Michelle K Lee, United States Patent and Trademark Office. (JM)
June 23, 2016 Filing 6 EXHIBIT(s) to #1 Complaint,, ; filed by Plaintiffs American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Stewart, Robert)
June 23, 2016 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc., Gilbert P. Hyatt. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Stewart, Robert)
June 23, 2016 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney General, Nevada Attorney General. (JM)
June 22, 2016 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IA 11-2. Counsel Andrew M. Grossman and Mark W. DeLaquil to comply with completion and electronic filing of the Designation of Local Counsel and Verified Petition. For your convenience, click on the following link to obtain the form from the Court's website - #www.nvd.uscourts.gov/Forms.aspx. Upon approval of the Verified Petition, counsel is required to register for the Court's Case Management and Electronic Case Filing (CM/ECF) system and the electronic service of pleadings. Please visit the Court's website www.nvd.uscourts.gov to register Attorney(s). Verified Petition due by 8/6/2016. (no image attached) (JM)
June 22, 2016 Case assigned to Judge Andrew P. Gordon and Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen. (JM)
June 22, 2016 Filing 3 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Loretta E. Lynch, filed by Plaintiff Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Stewart, Robert)
June 22, 2016 Filing 2 PROPOSED SUMMONS to be issued Daniel Bogden, filed by Plaintiff Gilbert P. Hyatt. (Stewart, Robert)
June 22, 2016 Filing 1 COMPLAINT FOR DECLARATORY AND INJUNCTIVE RELIEF against Michelle K Lee, United States Patent and Trademark Office (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0978-4171686), filed by Gilbert P. Hyatt. Proof of service due by 9/20/2016.(Stewart, Robert) NOTICE of Certificate of Interested Parties requirement: Under Local Rule 7.1-1, a party must immediately file its disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hyatt v. United States Patent and Trademark Office et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Hyatt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Association for Equitable Treatment, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Represented By: Robert T. Stewart
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gilbert P. Hyatt
Represented By: Mark Wendell DeLaquil
Represented By: Robert T. Stewart
Represented By: Mark A. Hutchison
Represented By: Andrew Michael Grossman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Patent and Trademark Office
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Represented By: Molly R Silfen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michelle K Lee
Represented By: Patrick A Rose
Represented By: Molly R Silfen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?