Ferguson v. Baker et al
Plaintiff: Christopher Edward Ferguson
Defendant: Chad Baker, City of Las Vegas Nevada, Fast Tow Inc, Las Vegas City Attorneys Office, Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department, McKenzie, Mulligan and State of Nevada
Case Number: 2:2016cv01525
Filed: June 27, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Andrew P. Gordon
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
March 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDERED that plaintiff Christopher Ferguson's 98 motion for joinder of claims and 99 motion re: fraud on the court are DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 104 plaintiff's motion for leave to file a surreply is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that [ 114] defendant LVMPD's motion to strike is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 112 plaintiff's "More Definite Statement on motion for judgment as a matter of law" is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 116 defendant LVMPD's motion to strike is GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 123 plaintiff's motion for leave to file request for judicial notice is DENIED.FURTHER ORDERED that 124 defendant LVMPD's motion to strike is DENIED as moot. FURTHER ORDERED that 97 plaintiff& #039;s motion for summary judgment is DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that 92 defendant LVMPD's motion for summary judgment and 94 defendant City of Las Vegas's joinder are GRANTED. FURTHER ORDERED that 136 plaintiff's motion to strike is GRANTED. The clerk of court shall STRIKE 134 the notice of manual filing. FURTHER ORDERED that by April 16, 2021, plaintiff Christopher Ferguson shall show cause why his claims against defendants Chad Baker and Sergeant Garcia should not be dismissed without prejudice for failure to timely serve. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/24/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR) Modified text on 3/24/2021 - nef regenerated (MMM).
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 135 ORDER Directing Defendant LVMPD to Manually File Exhibits. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 3/22/2021. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER Denying 77 Request for Judicial Notice. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/11/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER Regarding Briefing Schedule For Discovery Motions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/31/2020. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re 41 Motion to Extend Time. Defendants must file a response by noon on 12/19/2019. No reply will be allowed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 12/18/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
October 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER Granting 30 , 31 Motions for Extension of Time re 28 Order. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 10/9/2019. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USM - MR)
August 28, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 District Court's Response to Ninth Circuit's Referral Notice. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 8/28/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - cc: USCA - MR)
July 20, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that 14 the Report and Recommendation is accepted, and 10 Ferguson's second amended complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that 16 Ferguson's motion for pretrial conference is DENIED as moot. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 7/20/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER. The 12 motion for pretrial conference is DENIED as premature. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
January 24, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the 6 Amended Complaint is Dismissed with leave to Amend. Amended Complaint deadline: 2/23/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/24/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ferguson v. Baker et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chad Baker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Las Vegas Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fast Tow Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas City Attorneys Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Las Vegas Metropolitan Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: McKenzie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mulligan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Edward Ferguson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?