Buckley v. Pinnacle Community Services Limited Partnership et al
Plaintiff: Laura Buckley
Defendant: Gary Bowers, Canterbury Holdings LLC, Diamondback Management Services, Ltd., Pinnacle Community Services Limited Partnership and Silvercloud Holdings, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2016cv02326
Filed: October 5, 2016
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Peggy A. Leen
Presiding Judge: Gloria M. Navarro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 15:2(a) Fair Labor Standards Act
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 29, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER that 19 Report and Recommendation is ACCEPTED and ADOPTED in full. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff Laura Buckley's case be DISMISSED. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order (ECF No. 6 ) granting the parties'Stipulation (ECF No. 5 ) to arbitrate remains in full force and effect.The Clerk of Court shall close this case and enter judgment accordingly. Signed by Chief Judge Gloria M. Navarro on 6/29/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
January 22, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER re: 13 Status Report. ORDERED that the parties' request to file the next joint status report on or before July 27, 2018, is DENIED. The next joint status report shall be filed on or before March 19, 2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 1/22/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
June 2, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER that the next Status Report is due on or before 1/19/2018. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 6/2/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
February 10, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER that the parties shall exercise best good-faith efforts to select an arbitrator and schedule arbitration before the next status report. Failure to timely comply will result in an order to show cause why the stay should not be lifted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 2/10/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
October 12, 2016 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Granting 5 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings Pending Outcome of Mediation and Arbitration. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Counsel shall file a joint status report every 60 days beginning 12/12/16 advising the court of the status of mediation and/or arbitration proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Peggy A. Leen on 10/12/16. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Buckley v. Pinnacle Community Services Limited Partnership et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gary Bowers
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Canterbury Holdings LLC
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Diamondback Management Services, Ltd.
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pinnacle Community Services Limited Partnership
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Silvercloud Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Scott M. Mahoney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Buckley
Represented By: James P. Kemp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?