Turner v. Arresting Officer 5-30-2016 et al

Plaintiff: John Turner
Defendant: Arresting Officer 5-30-2016, Bonner, Clark County Detention Center, Clark County ex rel, Clark County Sheriff Office, D Del, M Gove, Greg Hader, Judge Goodman, LVMPD, Nevada Parole Probation Dept, Dena Rinetti and State of Nevada Ex Rel
Case Number: 2:2016cv02413
Filed: October 14, 2016
Court: Nevada District Court
Office: Las Vegas Office
Referring Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: Richard F. Boulware
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed#Document Text
July 3, 2017 40 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that 33 Plaintiff John Turner's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. Pursuant to the Courts prior rulings, Turner may file a 4th Amended Complaint attempting to cure the defic iencies in Counts II or III previously noted 14 . The 4th Amended Complaint must be filed on or before 8/4/17. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that if Turner files a 4th Amended Complaint, the Clerk of the Court is directed NOT to issue summons on the 4th Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 7/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
April 3, 2017 20 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER Adopting Report and Recommendations re 14 Report and Recommendation. The Clerk of Court is directed to serve a copy of this Order upon Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 4/3/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - ADR)
January 26, 2017 3 Opinion or Order of the Court ORDER REGARDING REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS Accepting and Adopting 2 Report and Recommendation. Clark County ex rel, Clark County Sheriff Office, Judge Goodman, LVMPD, Nevada Parole Probation Dept, Dena Rinetti, State of Nevada Ex Rel, Arresting Officer 5-30-2016 and Clark County Detention Center terminated., Amended Complaint deadline: 2/27/2017. Clerk of Court is not to issue summons on the Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Richard F. Boulware, II on 1/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Turner v. Arresting Officer 5-30-2016 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arresting Officer 5-30-2016
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bonner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County Detention Center
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Clark County ex rel, Clark County Sheriff Office
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D Del
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Gove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greg Hader
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LVMPD
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nevada Parole Probation Dept
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dena Rinetti
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Nevada Ex Rel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?