Canterbury v. Clark County Detention Center et al
Plaintiff: |
Richard Lee Canterbury |
Defendant: |
Clark County Detention Center and Clark County Sheriff Lombardo |
Case Number: |
2:2017cv00212 |
Filed: |
January 23, 2017 |
Court: |
US District Court for the District of Nevada |
Office: |
Las Vegas Office |
Presiding Judge: |
Andrew P. Gordon |
Presiding Judge: |
Nancy J. Koppe |
Nature of Suit: |
Prisoner: Civil Rights |
Cause of Action: |
42 U.S.C. § 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights |
Jury Demanded By: |
Plaintiff |
Available Case Documents
The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:
Date Filed |
Document Text |
January 16, 2018 |
Filing
21
ORDER denying 9 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; ORDER denying 10 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; ORDER denying 11 Motion; ORDER denying 13 Motion for Appointment of Counsel ; ORDER denying 14 Motion; ORDER denying 16 Motion; ORDER denying 17 Motion; ORDER denying 18 Motion; ORDER denying 19 Motion. It is further ordered that Plaintiff shall file no more documents in this case. If he chooses to file any further documents, they should be filed in Case 2:17-cv-00211-MMDNJK. Signed by Judge Andrew P. Gordon on 1/16/2018.; Case dismissed without prejudice, without leave to amend. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - JM)
|
March 3, 2017 |
Filing
8
ORDER denying 5 Motion/Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis.; denying 6 Motion to Amend/Correct.; denying 7 Motion for font size. Within 30 days from date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a full IFP or pay the full filing fee. Clerk shall retain but not file complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/3/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF, cc: IFP to P - JM)
|
January 30, 2017 |
Filing
3
ORDER that the Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as well as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORD ERED that, no later than March 1, 2017, Plaintiff shall either: (1) file a fully complete application to proceed in forma pauperis, on the correct form with complete financial attachments in compliance with 28 U.S.C. § 1915(a); or (2) pay the fu ll $400 fee for filing a civil action (which includes the $350 filing fee and the $50 administrative fee). FURTHER ORDERED that if Plaintiff does not timely comply with this order, dismissal of this action may result. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint (ECF No. 1-1), but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 1/30/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
|
Access additional case information on PACER
Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system.
A subscription to PACER is required.
Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System
Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.
Why Is My Information Online?