Rocha-Garcia v. Walgreen Co.
Plaintiff: Maria Rocha-Garcia
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Case Number: 2:2017cv00465
Filed: February 13, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Jennifer A. Dorsey
Presiding Judge: Nancy J. Koppe
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Jury Demanded By: Defendant

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER. Based on 26 the parties' stipulation and good cause appearing with no cause to delay, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED, AND DECREED that THIS ACTION IS DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE, each party to bear its own fees and costs. The Clerk of Court is directed to CLOSE THIS CASE. Signed by Judge Jennifer A. Dorsey on 9/18/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
July 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER. IT IS ORDERED that counsel shall comply with the requirements of Local Rule IA 10-5, the Ninth Circuit's decision in Kamakana, 447 F.3d 1172, and the procedures outlined above, with respect to any documents filed under seal. To the extent any aspect of the stipulated protective order may conflict with this order or Local Rule IA 10-5, that aspect of the stipulated protective order is hereby superseded with this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 7/26/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
June 5, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER. The Court hereby ORDERS the parties to submit a joint interim status report that complies with the Local Rules, no later than 6/12/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 6/5/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
March 31, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER. The Court hereby DENIES 10 the parties' stipulated proposed discovery plan and scheduling order. The parties shall file a new stipulated proposed discovery plan and scheduling order that complies with the Local Rules, no later than 4/5/2017. Signed by Magistrate Judge Nancy J. Koppe on 3/31/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MR)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rocha-Garcia v. Walgreen Co.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Rocha-Garcia
Represented By: Lawrence M. Ruiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walgreen Co.
Represented By: James F Holtz
Represented By: Cory R. Lacy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?