Toliver v. Carlman, et al
Plaintiff: George A Toliver
Defendant: Timothy Carlman and Ramos
Case Number: 2:2017cv00679
Filed: March 6, 2017
Court: US District Court for the District of Nevada
Office: Las Vegas Office
Presiding Judge: Cam Ferenbach
Presiding Judge: James C. Mahan
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
June 15, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER Granting 22 Stipulation of Dismissal with prejudice. Signed by Judge James C. Mahan on 6/15/2018. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - SLD)
April 26, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Granting Plaintiff's 6 Motion to Extend Time to file an Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. Deadline: 5/12/2017. Alternatively, Plaintiff may file the full $400 filing fee for a civil action on or before 5/12/2017. Plaint iff's 7 Motion to Amend Complaint is Granted. Amended Complaint Deadline: 5/12/2017. If Plaintiff fails to file an Amended Complaint, the Court will screen the original 1 -1 Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 4/26/2017. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - prisoner/non prisoner IFP instructions/forms; Complaint instructions/form mailed to Plaintiff - SLD)
March 23, 2017 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER that 4 Application for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED without prejudice to file a new application. The Clerk of the Court SHALL SEND Plaintiff the approved form application to proceed in forma pauperis by a prisoner, as we ll as the document entitled information and instructions for filing an in forma pauperis application. FURTHER ORDERED that within thirty (30) days from the date of this order, Plaintiff shall either file a fully completed ifp application or pay the filing fee. FURTHER ORDERED that the Clerk of the Court shall retain the complaint (ECF No. 1-1), but shall not file it at this time. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cam Ferenbach on 3/23/17. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MMM)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Nevada District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Toliver v. Carlman, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Timothy Carlman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George A Toliver
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?